RRW Legacy Management Group, Inc. v. Walker
Plaintiff: RRW Legacy Management Group, Inc.
Defendant: Campbell Walker
Counter_claimant: Campbell Walker
Counter_defendant: RRW Legacy Management Group, Inc.
Thirdparty_defendant: Antoinette R Walker, R. Angus Walker and Victoria Walker Counsell
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Campbell Walker
Case Number: 2:2014cv00326
Filed: March 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF CAMPBELL INVESTMENT COMPANY'S SECOND MOTION FOR CONTEMPT re 257 Motion for Contempt. The request for further sanctions against Defendant for his ongoing failure to comply with the orders of this Court regarding his post-ju dgment obligations is GRANTED; an order for the arrest of Defendant will issue and upon his apprehension he will remain incarcerated for such period of time as is necessary to secure both his appearance at a deposition to be conducted by Plain tiffs and his compliance with Plaintiff's Requests for Production of Documents related to the judgment against him. The request for a finding of contempt as regards to Defendant's counsel is DENIED. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: USMO
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER granting Plaintiff CIC's 241 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Plaintiff CIC is awarded against Defendant Campbell Walker the sum of $13,517.50; granting Plaintiff CIC's 251 Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Purs uant to Order on Motion for Sanctions and Bond. Plaintiff CIC is awarded against Defendant Campbell Walker the sum of $17,515.50. Defendant Campbell Walker is directed to pay these sums to Plaintiff CIC, in care of McNaul Ebel Nawrot & Helgren PLLC, within five (5) days of the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff Campbell Investment Company's 245 Motion for Sanctions and for Bond. CIC to submit its motion for attorney's fees and costs within 14 days. Defendant to be assessed $1000 per day from the date of this order until he (1) provides responses to the post-judgment discovery requests propounded by CIC and (2) appears for and satisfactorily concludes a post-judgment deposition/examination. Plaintiff is not entitled to a bond on appeal in any amount and that portion of its motion is denied. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: financial deputy
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 228 SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND NON-TAXABLE COSTS by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 203 JUDGMENT by Judge Marsha J. Pechman ordering that Plaintiff CIC is awarded judgment against Defendant Campbell Walker in the principal amount of $4,537,085.00. Additionally, Plaintiff CIC is awarded pre-judgment interest in the amount of $1,734,560.68, for a total judgment amount of $6,271,645.68. Post-judgment interest on the judgment sum shall accrue at the rate of 0.55 percent per annum from the date of entry hereof. (PM)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 171 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Plaintiffs are ordered to prepare and submit a proposed judgment within 14 days of the filing of these findings. (PM)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Marsha J. Pechman, granting plaintiff RRW's 92 Motion for Summary Judgment on its request for declaratory relief; granting summary judgment to plaintiff RRW and dismissing defendant's count erclaims against it; granting plaintiff CIC's 114 motion to strike; granting plaintiff CIC's 96 Motion for Summary Judgment on its claim of breach of fiduciary duty; denying defendant Campbell M Walker's 98 Motion for Summary Judgment re claim of defense under laches. (PM)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER denying 47 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; granting 57 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend. Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying dft's 9 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RRW Legacy Management Group, Inc. v. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RRW Legacy Management Group, Inc.
Represented By: Malaika M Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell Walker
Represented By: James Harlan Corning
Represented By: Bradley R Duncan
Represented By: Hugh R McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Campbell Walker
Represented By: James Harlan Corning
Represented By: Bradley R Duncan
Represented By: Hugh R McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: RRW Legacy Management Group, Inc.
Represented By: Malaika M Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Antoinette R Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: R. Angus Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Victoria Walker Counsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Campbell Walker
Represented By: James Harlan Corning
Represented By: Bradley R Duncan
Represented By: Hugh R McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?