Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Arch Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Lloyd's Syndicate Nos. 2987, 2000 and 382 and Wuerttembergische Versicherung A.G. 202388900007
Case Number: 2:2014cv00545
Filed: April 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 213 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing this action with prejudice re parties' 212 Stipulated Motion, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 197 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding resetting certain discovery and mediation deadlines re parties' 195 Stipulated Motion : Jury Trial (10-15 days) is set for 6/4/2018 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports und er FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 2/23/2018, Discovery completed by 2/28/2018, Dispositive motions due by 3/23/2018, Motions in Limine due by 5/7/2018, Pretrial Order due by 5/23/2018, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 3/9/2018, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 3/1/2018, Trial briefs to be submitted by 5/30/2018, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 5/30/2018, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER striking Defendant Arch Insurance Company's 187 Notice of Motion for Reconsideration; denying Defendant Arch Insurance Company's 188 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying Defendants Lloyd's Syndicate Nos. 2987, 2000 and 382, Wuerttembergische Versicherung A.G. 202388900007 190 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company's 191 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants Lloyd's Syndicate Nos. 2987, 2000 and 382, Wuerttembergische Versicherung A.G. 202388900007's 120 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying FDIC's 174 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting 182 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 1/20/2018, Expert depositions completed by 2/20/2018; Settlement conference to be held by 2/28/2018, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; RE-NOTING 120 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 118 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; Noting Date 6/16/2017, plaintiff's response due 5/22/17, replies due 6/16/17 by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 133 Motion for Protective Order against National Union's 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting defendants' 102 Motion to Seal Exhibits in Support of Arch's Motion for Summary Judgment, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 150 Motion to File Over-Length Consolidated Brief, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 93 Motion for Leave to Take More Than Ten Depositions, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting in part Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation's 67 Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Documents, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING 89 STIPULATED MOTION MODIFYING CASE SCHEDULE, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. The modifications impact only dates by which the parties must complete their fact and expert discovery. (KERR)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting 82 Motion for Leave to File a Ten Page Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel Production of Documents, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Arch Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Stephen J Kennedy
Represented By: Brenda S Molner
Represented By: Joseph B Prater(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Barry S. Rosen
Represented By: Duane F. Sigelko(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Denise M Ware(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd's Syndicate Nos. 2987, 2000 and 382
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wuerttembergische Versicherung A.G. 202388900007
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?