Kaseburg et al v. Port of Seattle et al

Plaintiff: Scott Kaseburg, Kathryn Kaseburg, Martin Fedigan, Barbara Bergstrom, Kim Kaiser, Pamela Kaiser, David Komendat, Kelli Komendat, William Blokker, Susan Blokker, David Mccray, Sally Mccray, John Lorge III, Nancy Lorge, John Howell, Molly Howell, Darius Richards, Vicki Richards, George Johnston, Nancy Johnston, Gregory Piantanida, Sherre Piantanida, Paul Fergen, Christine Fergen, Kevin Iden, Tom Easton, Karen Easton, Paul Pasquier, Karyn Pasquier, John Houtz, Terence Block, Kari Block, Larry Kolesar, Susan Kolesar, John Laughlin, Rebecca Laughlin, Jeffrey Riley, Tami Riley, Nancy Manz, Donald Dana, Patricia Dana, Christie Mueller, Denise Harris, Walter Moore, Tom Dahlby, Kathy Dahlby, Harry Dursch, Kirsten Lemke, Richard Vaughn, Richard S Howell, Lois Howell, Donald Lockner, Patricia Lockner, Marjorie Grundhaus, William Keppler, Debra Keppler, Curtis Dickerson, Julie Dickerson, Gregory Lasek, Patricia Lasek, Yongtao Chen, Qin Li, Robert Taylor, Alison Taylor, Edmund Jones, Donald Miller, Susan Miner, Ronald Jones, Carol Jones, Steve Smolinske, Sherri Smolinske, Joseph Ioppolo, Richard Kaner, Lynn Kaner, Bradley R Elfers, Gregory P Elfers, Paul Remington, John Burroughs, Elizabeth Mann, Bruce Erikson, Mary Erikson, Timothy Riley, Virginia Riley, James Sather, Kelly Sather, Julian Limited Partnership, Steven Brace, Kristen Brace, Charles Billow, Courtni Billow, Harold A Bruce, Pierre Thiry, Cristi Thiry, Michael Franceshina, Michael Oldham, Gina Oldham, Stephen Porter, Nancy Porter, Robert Laris, Janis Laris, Michael Russell, Elana Russell, Uma Shenoy, Larry Peterson, Susan Peterson, Joseph Peterson, Kristin Peterson, John Patrick Heily, Sunday Kyrkos, Paul Gibbons, Tracy Gibbons, Dayton Dennison, Marilynn Dennison, Gregory Nick, Diversity Assets LLC, James Johnson, David Williamson, Kristi Sunderland, Claudia Mansfield, Kevin Lindahl, Rebecca Lindahl, Kevin Tran, Jeanne Demund, Lou Xu, Kathy Haggart, Dawn Lawson, Marlene Winter, Jie Ao, Xin Zhou, Pacific Holdings LLC, James Tasca, Michael Chan, Amanda Chan, Gary Weil, Dale Mitchell, Marla Mitchell, Frederick Miller and Susan Miller
Defendant: Port of Seattle, Puget Sound Energy Inc and King County
Counter_claimant: King County and Puget Sound Energy Inc
Counter_defendant: Jie Ao, Barbara Bergstrom, Charles Billow, Courtni Billow, Kari Block, Terence Block, Susan Blokker, William Blokker, Kristen Brace, Steven Brace, Harold A Bruce, John Burroughs, Amanda Chan, Michael Chan, Yongtao Chen, Kathy Dahlby, Tom Dahlby, Donald Dana, Patricia Dana, Jeanne Demund, Dayton Dennison, Marilynn Dennison, Curtis Dickerson, Julie Dickerson, Diversity Assets LLC, Harry Dursch, Karen Easton, Tom Easton, Bradley R Elfers, Gregory P Elfers, Bruce Erikson, Mary Erikson, Martin Fedigan, Christine Fergen, Paul Fergen, Michael Franceshina, Paul Gibbons, Tracy Gibbons, Marjorie Grundhaus, Kathy Haggart, Denise Harris, John Patrick Heily, John Houtz, John Howell, Lois Howell, Molly Howell, Richard S Howell, Kevin Iden, Joseph Ioppolo, James Johnson, George Johnston, Nancy Johnston, Carol Jones, Edmund Jones, Ronald Jones, Julian Limited Partnership, Kim Kaiser, Pamela Kaiser, Lynn Kaner, Richard Kaner, Kathryn Kaseburg, Scott Kaseburg, Debra Keppler, William Keppler, Larry Kolesar, Susan Kolesar, David Komendat, Kelli Komendat, Sunday Kyrkos, Janis Laris, Robert Laris, Gregory Lasek, Patricia Lasek, John Laughlin, Rebecca Laughlin, Dawn Lawson, Kirsten Lemke, Qin Li, Kevin Lindahl, Rebecca Lindahl, Donald Lockner, Patricia Lockner, Nancy Lorge, John Lorge III, Elizabeth Mann, Claudia Mansfield, Nancy Manz, David Mccray, Sally Mccray, Donald Miller, Frederick Miller, Susan Miller, Susan Miner, Dale Mitchell, Marla Mitchell, Walter Moore, Christie Mueller, Gregory Nick, Gina Oldham, Michael Oldham, Pacific Holdings LLC, Karyn Pasquier, Paul Pasquier, Joseph Peterson, Kristin Peterson, Larry Peterson, Susan Peterson, Gregory Piantanida, Sherre Piantanida, Nancy Porter, Stephen Porter, Paul Remington, Darius Richards, Vicki Richards, Jeffrey Riley, Tami Riley, Timothy Riley, Virginia Riley, Elana Russell, Michael Russell, James Sather, Kelly Sather, Uma Shenoy, Sherri Smolinske, Steve Smolinske, Kristi Sunderland, James Tasca, Alison Taylor, Robert Taylor, Cristi Thiry, Pierre Thiry, Kevin Tran, Richard Vaughn, Gary Weil, David Williamson, Marlene Winter, Lou Xu and Xin Zhou
Case Number: 2:2014cv00784
Filed: May 27, 2014
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2016 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour granting defendant Puget Sound Energy's 143 Motion for Summary Judgment and granting defendant King County's 151 Petition for Attorney Fees. (PM)
November 10, 2015 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting dft Sound Transit's 119 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
October 23, 2015 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment 124 is GRANTED, Plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment 113 is DENIED, King County's motion to compel 105 is GRANTED, and D efendants' motion to continue and strike 114 is MOOTED. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to respond to each of King County's discovery requests and interrogatories on or before 11/13/2015; Plaintiffs are further ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE as to why they did not respond to King County's discovery requests and should not be required to pay its attorney fees. Plaintiffs must file a brief of no more than three (3) pages responding to this Order on or before 11/16/2015. (PM)
July 24, 2015 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour re Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. No. 95) is GRANTED. By its terms, the Trails Act preserves railroad easements in railbanked corridors by preempting abandonment of those easements. When a railroad corridor is railbanked pursuant to the Trails Act, the railroad easements are preserved and trail use becomes a new interim authorized use. BNSFs railbanking of the Eastside Rail Corridor preserved BNSFs railroad easements and allowed interim use of the corridor as a trail.(PP)
December 5, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendants' 36 Motion to Dismiss, by Judge John C Coughenour.(TM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaseburg et al v. Port of Seattle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Kaseburg
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Kaseburg
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Fedigan
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Bergstrom
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Kaiser
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Kaiser
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Komendat
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelli Komendat
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Blokker
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Blokker
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Mccray
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Mccray
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lorge III
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Lorge
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Howell
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molly Howell
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darius Richards
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Richards
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Johnston
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Johnston
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Piantanida
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherre Piantanida
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Fergen
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Fergen
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Iden
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Easton
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Easton
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Pasquier
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karyn Pasquier
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Houtz
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terence Block
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kari Block
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Kolesar
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Kolesar
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Laughlin
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Laughlin
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Riley
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tami Riley
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Manz
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Dana
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Dana
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christie Mueller
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Harris
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Moore
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Dahlby
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Dahlby
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Dursch
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirsten Lemke
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Vaughn
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard S Howell
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois Howell
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Lockner
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Lockner
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie Grundhaus
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Keppler
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Keppler
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Dickerson
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Dickerson
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Lasek
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Lasek
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yongtao Chen
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qin Li
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Taylor
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alison Taylor
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmund Jones
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Miller
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Miner
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Jones
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Jones
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Smolinske
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Smolinske
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Ioppolo
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Kaner
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Kaner
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley R Elfers
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory P Elfers
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Remington
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Burroughs
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Mann
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Erikson
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Erikson
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Riley
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Riley
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Sather
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Sather
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Limited Partnership
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Brace
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Brace
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Billow
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtni Billow
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold A Bruce
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pierre Thiry
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristi Thiry
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Franceshina
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Oldham
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Oldham
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Porter
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Porter
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Laris
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janis Laris
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Russell
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elana Russell
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uma Shenoy
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Peterson
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Peterson
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Peterson
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Peterson
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Patrick Heily
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunday Kyrkos
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Gibbons
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Gibbons
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dayton Dennison
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilynn Dennison
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Nick
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diversity Assets LLC
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Johnson
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Williamson
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristi Sunderland
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Mansfield
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Lindahl
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Lindahl
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Tran
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Demund
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lou Xu
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Haggart
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Lawson
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Winter
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jie Ao
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xin Zhou
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Holdings LLC
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Tasca
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Chan
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Chan
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Weil
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Mitchell
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marla Mitchell
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Miller
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Miller
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Port of Seattle
Represented By: Kristin Elizabeth Ballinger(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Timothy G Leyh(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Randall Thor Thomsen(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puget Sound Energy Inc
Represented By: James Erik Breitenbucher
Represented By: Bryan J. Case(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Courtney L Seim(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Gavin Williams Skok(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County
Represented By: David JW Hackett
Represented By: Andrew W Marcuse(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: King County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Puget Sound Energy Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Jie Ao
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Barbara Bergstrom
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Charles Billow
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Courtni Billow
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Kari Block
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Terence Block
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Susan Blokker
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: William Blokker
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Kristen Brace
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Steven Brace
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Harold A Bruce
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: John Burroughs
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Amanda Chan
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Michael Chan
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Yongtao Chen
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Kathy Dahlby
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Tom Dahlby
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Donald Dana
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Patricia Dana
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Jeanne Demund
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Dayton Dennison
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Marilynn Dennison
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Curtis Dickerson
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Julie Dickerson
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Diversity Assets LLC
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Harry Dursch
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Karen Easton
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Tom Easton
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Bradley R Elfers
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Gregory P Elfers
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Bruce Erikson
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Mary Erikson
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Martin Fedigan
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Christine Fergen
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Paul Fergen
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Michael Franceshina
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Paul Gibbons
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Tracy Gibbons
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Marjorie Grundhaus
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Kathy Haggart
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Denise Harris
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: John Patrick Heily
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: John Houtz
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: John Howell
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Lois Howell
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Molly Howell
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Richard S Howell
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Kevin Iden
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Joseph Ioppolo
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: James Johnson
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: George Johnston
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Nancy Johnston
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Carol Jones
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Edmund Jones
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Ronald Jones
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Julian Limited Partnership
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Kim Kaiser
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Pamela Kaiser
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Lynn Kaner
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Richard Kaner
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Kathryn Kaseburg
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Scott Kaseburg
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Debra Keppler
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: William Keppler
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Larry Kolesar
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Susan Kolesar
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: David Komendat
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Kelli Komendat
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Sunday Kyrkos
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Janis Laris
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Robert Laris
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Gregory Lasek
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Patricia Lasek
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: John Laughlin
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Rebecca Laughlin
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Dawn Lawson
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Kirsten Lemke
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Qin Li
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Kevin Lindahl
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Rebecca Lindahl
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Donald Lockner
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Patricia Lockner
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Nancy Lorge
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: John Lorge III
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Elizabeth Mann
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Claudia Mansfield
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Nancy Manz
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: David Mccray
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Sally Mccray
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Donald Miller
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Frederick Miller
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Susan Miller
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Susan Miner
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Dale Mitchell
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Marla Mitchell
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Walter Moore
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Christie Mueller
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Gregory Nick
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Gina Oldham
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Michael Oldham
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Pacific Holdings LLC
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Karyn Pasquier
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Paul Pasquier
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Joseph Peterson
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Kristin Peterson
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Larry Peterson
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Elizabeth G McCulley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: J. Richard Aramburu(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey M Eustis(Designation Retained)