Huge v. The Boeing Company

Plaintiff: J. Kathleen Huge
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Case Number: 2:2014cv00857
Filed: June 12, 2014
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2016 86 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AND ORDER by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (AD)
October 30, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 28 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part dft's 31 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
October 21, 2015 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Compel by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Plaintiff's request to strike Dr. Brown is DENIED. Plaintiff's motion to compel is GRANTED IN PART. Defendant shall respond to the identified discovery requests no later than November 2, 2015.(SSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huge v. The Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Kathleen Huge
Represented By: Matthew J Bean(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Lauren Guicheteau(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Higgins(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Represented By: Charles N Eberhardt(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Tobias Piering(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?