Weiss-Jenkins IV LLC v. Utrecht Manufacturing Corporation

Plaintiff: Weiss-Jenkins IV LLC
Defendant: Utrecht Manufacturing Corporation
Case Number: 2:2014cv00954
Filed: June 27, 2014
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2016 105 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (AD)
June 8, 2016 90 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Weiss-Jenkins IV LLC against Dick Blick Holdings, Inc., Utrecht Manufacturing Corporation by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (AD)
May 24, 2016 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Robert S. Lasnik granting in part plaintiff's 72 Motion for final judgment. Plaintiff to file an amended proposed judgment within 7 days of this Order. (PM)
September 14, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part pltf's 26 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weiss-Jenkins IV LLC v. Utrecht Manufacturing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weiss-Jenkins IV LLC
Represented By: Rhys M Farren(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utrecht Manufacturing Corporation
Represented By: Gary Ryan Solomon(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Stephen C Willey(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?