Warshawer et al v. Tarnutzer et al

Plaintiff: Robert Warshawer, Kim Warshawer and Glenn Butler
Defendant: Rick Tarnutzer and Nancy Tarnutzer
Case Number: 2:2014cv01042
Filed: July 10, 2014
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2016 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' 124 Motion to Dismiss and denying as moot Plaintiffs' 126 Motion for Sanctions by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
April 15, 2016 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING SANCTIONS IN PART AND PROVIDING NOTICE TO COUNSEL; granting defendants' 110 Motion to strike order; defendants to file a response to court's proposed sanctions on defense counsel within 10 days striking plaintiff's 112 Motion for Attorney Fees by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
June 12, 2015 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf Glenn Butler's 46 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
June 9, 2015 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Nancy Tarnutzer's 41 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warshawer et al v. Tarnutzer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Warshawer
Represented By: Spencer Hall, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Warshawer
Represented By: Spencer Hall, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Butler
Represented By: Randall Paul Beighle(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Daniel Adam Kittle(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Tarnutzer
Represented By: Kevin P. Sullivan(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Tarnutzer
Represented By: Kevin P. Sullivan(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?