January 2, 2018 |
Pursuant to the parties' 570 Stipulated MOTION to Provisionally Seal Transcripts, the trial transcripts in this matter have been provisionally sealed in their entirety pending the Court's review of the parties' proposed redactions. (VE)
|
January 2, 2018 |
Pursuant to the parties' #570 Stipulated MOTION to Provisionally Seal Transcripts, the trial transcripts in this matter have been provisionally sealed in their entirety pending the Court's review of the parties' proposed redactions. (VE)
|
January 2, 2018 |
Pursuant to the parties' #571 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE, all claims which have been or could have been asserted in this action are dismissed with prejudice and without costs to any party. The Court retains jurisdiction to address sealing issues. (VE)
|
January 2, 2018 |
Pursuant to the parties' 571 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE, all claims which have been or could have been asserted in this action are dismissed with prejudice and without costs to any party. The Court retains jurisdiction to address sealing issues. (VE)
|
December 22, 2017 |
Filing 571
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by parties (Cordell, Franklin)
|
December 22, 2017 |
Filing 570
Stipulated MOTION to Provisionally Seal Transcripts, filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. Noting Date 12/22/2017, (Cordell, Franklin)
|
December 4, 2017 |
Filing 566
NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Michael E Kipling of #553 , #559 , #554 , #555 , #558 , #556 , #552 , #560 , #561 , #551 , #563 , #550 , #557 Electronic Transcript (Kipling, Michael)
|
December 1, 2017 |
Filing 569
SEALED TRANSCRIPT OF HEARING HELD 5/11/17, before the Honorable Richard A. Jones. (SG) Modified on 1/2/2018 to seal the transcript pursuant to the parties' #570 Stipulated MOTION to Provisionally Seal Transcripts pending the Court's review of the parties' proposed redactions. (VE)
|
December 1, 2017 |
Filing 568
SEALED TRANSCRIPT OF HEARING held 5/10/17, before the Honorable Richard A. Jones (SG) Modified on 1/2/2018 to seal the transcript pursuant to the parties' #570 Stipulated MOTION to Provisionally Seal Transcripts pending the Court's review of the parties' proposed redactions. (VE)
|
December 1, 2017 |
Filing 567
SEALED TRANSCRIPT OF HEARING HELD on 5/5/17 before Honorable Richard A. Jones. (SG) Modified on 1/2/2018 to seal the transcript pursuant to the parties' #570 Stipulated MOTION to Provisionally Seal Transcripts pending the Court's review of the parties' proposed redactions. (VE)
|
December 1, 2017 |
Pursuant to the parties' 565 Stipulated MOTION TO STAY FURTHER PROCEEDINGS, in order to maintain the status quo during settlement negotiations, this matter is stayed. This stay will expire on 1/2/2018 absent further action by the parties. (VE)
|
December 1, 2017 |
Pursuant to the parties' #565 Stipulated MOTION TO STAY FURTHER PROCEEDINGS, in order to maintain the status quo during settlement negotiations, this matter is stayed. This stay will expire on 1/2/2018 absent further action by the parties. (VE)
|
November 30, 2017 |
Filing 565
Stipulated MOTION TO STAY FURTHER PROCEEDINGS, filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. Noting Date 11/30/2017, (Kipling, Michael)
|
November 30, 2017 |
Filing 564
SEALED NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Verdict held on 5/17/2017 before Judge Richard A. Jones.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Debbie Zurn, debbie_zurn@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8504. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2018, (DZ) Modified on 1/2/2018 to seal the transcript pursuant to the parties' #570 Stipulated MOTION to Provisionally Seal Transcripts pending the Court's review of the parties' proposed redactions. (VE)
|
November 30, 2017 |
Filing 563
SEALED NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial - Day 14 held on 5/15/2017 before Judge Richard A. Jones.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Andrea Ramirez, andrea_ramirez@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8509. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2018, (DZ) Modified on 1/2/2018 to seal the transcript pursuant to the parties' #570 Stipulated MOTION to Provisionally Seal Transcripts pending the Court's review of the parties' proposed redactions. (VE)
|
November 30, 2017 |
Filing 562
SEALED NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial - Day 13 held on 5/12/2017 before Judge Richard A. Jones.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Andrea Ramirez, andrea_ramirez@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8509. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2018, (DZ) Modified on 1/2/2018 to seal the transcript pursuant to the parties' #570 Stipulated MOTION to Provisionally Seal Transcripts pending the Court's review of the parties' proposed redactions. (VE)
|
November 30, 2017 |
Filing 561
SEALED NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial - Day 12 **REDACTED** held on 5/11/2017 before Judge Richard A. Jones.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Andrea Ramirez, andrea_ramirez@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8509. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2018, (DZ) Modified on 1/2/2018 to seal the transcript pursuant to the parties' #570 Stipulated MOTION to Provisionally Seal Transcripts pending the Court's review of the parties' proposed redactions. (VE)
|
November 30, 2017 |
Filing 560
SEALED NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial - Day 11 **REDACTED** held on 5/10/2017 before Judge Richard A. Jones.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Andrea Ramirez, andrea_ramirez@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8509. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2018, (DZ) Modified on 1/2/2018 to seal the transcript pursuant to the parties' #570 Stipulated MOTION to Provisionally Seal Transcripts pending the Court's review of the parties' proposed redactions. (VE)
|
November 30, 2017 |
Filing 559
SEALED NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial - Day 10 held on 5/9/2017 before Judge Richard A. Jones.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Andrea Ramirez, andrea_ramirez@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8509. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2018, (DZ) Modified on 1/2/2018 to seal the transcript pursuant to the parties' #570 Stipulated MOTION to Provisionally Seal Transcripts pending the Court's review of the parties' proposed redactions. (VE)
|
November 30, 2017 |
Filing 558
SEALED NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial - Day 9 held on 5/8/2017 before Judge Richard A. Jones.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Andrea Ramirez, andrea_ramirez@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8509. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2018, (DZ) Modified on 1/2/2018 to seal the transcript pursuant to the parties' #570 Stipulated MOTION to Provisionally Seal Transcripts pending the Court's review of the parties' proposed redactions. (VE)
|
November 30, 2017 |
Filing 557
SEALED NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial - Day 4 **REDACTED** held on 4/28/2017 before Judge Richard A. Jones.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Andrea Ramirez, andrea_ramirez@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8509. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2018, (DZ) Modified on 1/2/2018 to seal the transcript pursuant to the parties' #570 Stipulated MOTION to Provisionally Seal Transcripts pending the Court's review of the parties' proposed redactions. (VE)
|
November 30, 2017 |
Filing 556
SEALED NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial - Day 8 **REDACTED** held on 5/5/2017 before Judge Richard A. Jones.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Andrea Ramirez, andrea_ramirez@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8509. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2018, (DZ) Modified on 1/2/2018 to seal the transcript pursuant to the parties' #570 Stipulated MOTION to Provisionally Seal Transcripts pending the Court's review of the parties' proposed redactions. (VE)
|
November 30, 2017 |
Filing 555
SEALED NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial - Day 7 held on 5/4/2017 before Judge Richard A. Jones.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Andrea Ramirez, andrea_ramirez@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8509. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2018, (DZ) Modified on 1/2/2018 to seal the transcript pursuant to the parties' #570 Stipulated MOTION to Provisionally Seal Transcripts pending the Court's review of the parties' proposed redactions. (VE)
|
November 30, 2017 |
Filing 554
SEALED NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial - Day 6 held on 5/3/2017 before Judge Richard A. Jones.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Debbie Zurn, debbie_zurn@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8504. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2018, (DZ) Modified on 1/2/2018 to seal the transcript pursuant to the parties' #570 Stipulated MOTION to Provisionally Seal Transcripts pending the Court's review of the parties' proposed redactions. (VE)
|
November 30, 2017 |
Filing 553
SEALED NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial - Day 5 held on 5/2/2017 before Judge Richard A. Jones.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Andrea Ramirez, andrea_ramirez@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8509. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2018, (DZ) Modified on 1/2/2018 to seal the transcript pursuant to the parties' #570 Stipulated MOTION to Provisionally Seal Transcripts pending the Court's review of the parties' proposed redactions. (VE)
|
November 30, 2017 |
Filing 552
SEALED NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial - Day 4 held on 4/28/2017 before Judge Richard A. Jones.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Andrea Ramirez, andrea_ramirez@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8509. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2018, (DZ) Modified on 11/30/2017 DO NOT OPEN TRANSCRIPT. **SEALED HEARING**(SG). Modified on 1/2/2018 to seal the transcript pursuant to the parties' #570 Stipulated MOTION to Provisionally Seal Transcripts pending the Court's review of the parties' proposed redactions. (VE)
|
November 30, 2017 |
Filing 551
SEALED NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial - Day 3 held on 4/27/2017 before Judge Richard A. Jones.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Andrea Ramirez, andrea_ramirez@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8509. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2018, (DZ) Modified on 1/2/2018 to seal the transcript pursuant to the parties' #570 Stipulated MOTION to Provisionally Seal Transcripts pending the Court's review of the parties' proposed redactions. (VE)
|
November 30, 2017 |
Filing 550
SEALED NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial - Day 2 held on 4/26/2017 before Judge Richard A. Jones.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Andrea Ramirez, andrea_ramirez@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8509. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2018, (DZ) Modified on 1/2/2018 to seal the transcript pursuant to the parties' #570 Stipulated MOTION to Provisionally Seal Transcripts pending the Court's review of the parties' proposed redactions. (VE)
|
November 30, 2017 |
Filing 549
SEALED NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial - Day 1 held on 4/25/2017 before Judge Richard A. Jones.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Andrea Ramirez, andrea_ramirez@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8509. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2018, (DZ) Modified on 1/2/2018 to seal the transcript pursuant to the parties' #570 Stipulated MOTION to Provisionally Seal Transcripts pending the Court's review of the parties' proposed redactions. (VE)
|
July 11, 2017 |
Filing 548
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS - STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP, NORTHERN CALIFORNIA OFFICE ; filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. (Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
July 7, 2017 |
Filing 547
REPLY, filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc, TO RESPONSE to #516 MOTION for Judgment Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law Under FRCP 50(b) (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
July 7, 2017 |
Filing 546
REPLY, filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, TO RESPONSE to #514 MOTION for New Trial (Mishra, Sourabh)
|
July 6, 2017 |
Filing 545
ORDER granting parties' #521 Stipulated Motion to Seal Huawei's Renewed Motion for Judgment as Matter of Law Under FRCP 50(b) ; As previously indicated by the Court, information that qualifies as a trade secret will remain under seal indefinitely, signed by Judge Richard A Jones.(SWT) (cc: OptoFidelity, LLC via USPS)
|
July 3, 2017 |
Filing 544
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, to #516 MOTION for Judgment Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law Under FRCP 50(b). (Mishra, Sourabh)
|
July 3, 2017 |
Filing 543
DECLARATION of Jessica I. Rothschild In Support Of Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Opposition To T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Motion For A New Trial Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 59, #542 Response, by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #514 MOTION for New Trial (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Rothschild, Jessica)
|
July 3, 2017 |
Filing 542
RESPONSE, by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc, to #514 MOTION for New Trial . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rothschild, Jessica)
|
June 30, 2017 |
Filing 541
REPLY, filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, TO RESPONSE to #509 MOTION FOR BILL OF COSTS Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54 (Li, Xinlin)
|
June 30, 2017 |
Filing 540
Supplemental DECLARATION of David J. Burman ISO Reply filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #501 SEALED MOTION to for Recovery of Attorneys' Fees; re #499 Stipulated MOTION to Seal ; (Li, Xinlin)
|
June 30, 2017 |
Filing 539
DECLARATION of Ellen Blanchard ISO Reply filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #501 SEALED MOTION to for Recovery of Attorneys' Fees; re #499 Stipulated MOTION to Seal ; (Li, Xinlin)
|
June 30, 2017 |
Filing 538
DECLARATION of Michael A.M. Davies ISO Reply filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #501 SEALED MOTION to for Recovery of Attorneys' Fees; re #499 Stipulated MOTION to Seal ; (Li, Xinlin)
|
June 30, 2017 |
Filing 537
Supplemental DECLARATION of Steven N. Feldman ISO Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #501 SEALED MOTION to for Recovery of Attorneys' Fees; re #499 Stipulated MOTION to Seal ; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Li, Xinlin)
|
June 30, 2017 |
Filing 536
REPLY, filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, TO RESPONSE to #501 SEALED MOTION to for Recovery of Attorneys' Fees; re #499 Stipulated MOTION to Seal ; (Li, Xinlin)
|
June 28, 2017 |
Filing 535
ORDER granting #528 Stipulated Motion to file under seal certain portions of Huawei Device USA Inc's opposition to T-Mobile's motions for attorneys' fees and costs signed by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS) Modified on 6/28/2017/ cc OptoFidelity, LLC (RS).
|
June 28, 2017 |
Filing 534
ORDER granting #517 Stipulated Motion to file under seal signed by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS) Modified on 6/28/2017/ cc OptoFidelity, LLC (RS).
|
June 26, 2017 |
Filing 533
SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration Of Jessica I. Rothschild In Support Of Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.s Opposition To T-Mobile USA, Inc.s Fee Motion #524 and In Support Of Huawei Device USA, Inc.s Opposition To T-Mobile USA, Inc.s Motion To Recover Costs #523 by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #528 Stipulated MOTION to Seal Stipulated Motion To File Under Seal Certain Portions Of Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Opposition To T-Mobile's Motions For Attorneys' Fees And Costs; Huawei's Supporting Declarations and Exhibits 1-10, 12-21, #527 Declaration,, #530 Sealed Document,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit 15, #15 Exhibit 16, #16 Exhibit 17, #17 Exhibit 18, #18 Exhibit 19, #19 Exhibit 20, #20 Exhibit 21)(Rothschild, Jessica)
|
June 26, 2017 |
Filing 532
SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Bradley S. Keller In Support of Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.s Opposition To T-Mobiles Motion For Recovery Of Attorneys' Fees by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #528 Stipulated MOTION to Seal Stipulated Motion To File Under Seal Certain Portions Of Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Opposition To T-Mobile's Motions For Attorneys' Fees And Costs; Huawei's Supporting Declarations and Exhibits 1-10, 12-21, #526 Declaration, #530 Sealed Document,, (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
June 26, 2017 |
Filing 531
SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Gail Gegenheimer In Support of Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.s Opposition To T-Mobiles Motion For Recovery Of Attorneys' Fees by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #528 Stipulated MOTION to Seal Stipulated Motion To File Under Seal Certain Portions Of Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Opposition To T-Mobile's Motions For Attorneys' Fees And Costs; Huawei's Supporting Declarations and Exhibits 1-10, 12-21, #525 Declaration, (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
June 26, 2017 |
Filing 530
SEALED DOCUMENT Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Opposition To T-Mobile's Motion For Recovery Of Attorneys' Fees by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #528 Stipulated MOTION to Seal Stipulated Motion To File Under Seal Certain Portions Of Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Opposition To T-Mobile's Motions For Attorneys' Fees And Costs; Huawei's Supporting Declarations and Exhibits 1-10, 12-21, #524 Response to Motion, (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
June 26, 2017 |
Filing 529
DECLARATION of Jeffrey Theodore In Support Of Stipulated Motion To File Under Seal Certain Portions Of Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Opposition To T-Mobile's Motions For Attorneys' Fees, Costs; Huawei's Supporting Declarations and Exhibits 1-10, 12-21 filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #528 Stipulated MOTION to Seal Stipulated Motion To File Under Seal Certain Portions Of Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Opposition To T-Mobile's Motions For Attorneys' Fees And Costs; Huawei's Supporting Declarations and Exhibits 1-10, 12-21 (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
June 26, 2017 |
Filing 528
Stipulated MOTION to Seal Stipulated Motion To File Under Seal Certain Portions Of Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Opposition To T-Mobile's Motions For Attorneys' Fees And Costs; Huawei's Supporting Declarations and Exhibits 1-10, 12-21, filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/7/2017, (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
June 26, 2017 |
Filing 527
Redacted DECLARATION of Jessica I. Rothschild In Support Of Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.s Opposition To T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Fee Motion #533 and In Support Of Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Opposition To T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Motion To Recover Costs #532 filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #501 SEALED MOTION to for Recovery of Attorneys' Fees; re #499 Stipulated MOTION to Seal ;, #509 MOTION FOR BILL OF COSTS Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10 (Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 11, #3 Exhibit 12-21 (Filed Under Seal))(Rothschild, Jessica)
|
June 26, 2017 |
Filing 526
Redacted DECLARATION of Bradley S. Keller In Support of Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.s Opposition To T-Mobile's Motion For Recovery Of Attorneys' Fees re #533 filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #501 SEALED MOTION to for Recovery of Attorneys' Fees; re #499 Stipulated MOTION to Seal ; (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
June 26, 2017 |
Filing 525
Redacted DECLARATION of Gail Gegenheimer In Support of Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.s Opposition To T-Mobile's Motion For Recovery Of Attorneys' Fees [REDACTED-PUBLIC VERSION] #533 filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #501 SEALED MOTION to for Recovery of Attorneys' Fees; re #499 Stipulated MOTION to Seal ; (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
June 26, 2017 |
Filing 524
RESPONSE, by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc, to #501 SEALED MOTION to for Recovery of Attorneys' Fees; re #499 Stipulated MOTION to Seal ;, #504 Redacted MOTION for Attorney Fees . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rothschild, Jessica)
|
June 26, 2017 |
Filing 523
RESPONSE, by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc, to #509 MOTION FOR BILL OF COSTS Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rothschild, Jessica)
|
June 23, 2017 |
Filing 522
REPLY, filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc, TO RESPONSE to #497 MOTION for Bond Approval (Garrett, Nathaniel)
|
June 23, 2017 |
Filing 521
Stipulated MOTION to Seal T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s and Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Stipulated Motion to Seal Huawei's Renewed Motion For Judgment As Matter Of Law Under FRCP 50(b) [Dkt. No. 516] and File Redacted Version, filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law Under FRCP 50(b) REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) Noting Date 7/7/2017, (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
June 21, 2017 |
NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re 516 MOTION for Judgment Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law Under FRCP 50(b): At the request of counsel, motion is sealed pending submission of a redacted version of the document. (VE)
|
June 21, 2017 |
NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #516 MOTION for Judgment Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law Under FRCP 50(b): At the request of counsel, motion is sealed pending submission of a redacted version of the document. (VE)
|
June 20, 2017 |
Filing 520
SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits A, B and F by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #517 Stipulated MOTION to Seal , #501 SEALED MOTION to for Recovery of Attorneys' Fees; re #499 Stipulated MOTION to Seal ;, #519 Declaration, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit F)(Li, Xinlin)
|
June 20, 2017 |
Filing 519
Supplemental DECLARATION of Steven N. Feldman filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #501 SEALED MOTION to for Recovery of Attorneys' Fees; re #499 Stipulated MOTION to Seal ; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Exhibit C-1, #3 Exhibit C-2, #4 Exhibit C-3, #5 Exhibit C-4, #6 Exhibit C-5, #7 Exhibit C-6, #8 Exhibit C-7, #9 Exhibit C-8, #10 Exhibit D-G)(Li, Xinlin)
|
June 20, 2017 |
Filing 518
DECLARATION of Ellen Kenney filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #517 Stipulated MOTION to Seal (Li, Xinlin)
|
June 20, 2017 |
Filing 517
Stipulated MOTION to Seal , filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/7/2017, (Li, Xinlin)
|
June 19, 2017 |
Filing 516
MOTION for Judgment Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law Under FRCP 50(b), filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/7/2017, (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
June 19, 2017 |
Filing 515
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, to #497 MOTION for Bond Approval. (Li, Xinlin)
|
June 19, 2017 |
Filing 514
MOTION for New Trial , filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/7/2017, (Hueston, John)
|
June 19, 2017 |
Filing 513
ORDER granting plaintiff's #510 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages signed by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS) Modified on 6/19/2017/cc OptoFidelity, LLC (RS).
|
June 14, 2017 |
Filing 512
NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #501 SEALED MOTION to for Recovery of Attorneys' Fees; re #499 Stipulated MOTION to Seal ;, #504 Redacted MOTION for Attorney Fees . Filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. Noting Date 6/30/2017, (Kipling, Michael)
|
June 14, 2017 |
MOTION(S) REFERRED to Deputy in Charge Joe Whiteley: re 509 MOTION FOR BILL OF COSTS Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54 (RS)
|
June 14, 2017 |
MOTION(S) REFERRED to Deputy in Charge Joe Whiteley: re #509 MOTION FOR BILL OF COSTS Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54 (RS)
|
June 13, 2017 |
Filing 511
DECLARATION of Steven N. Feldman filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #510 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Kipling, Michael)
|
June 13, 2017 |
Filing 510
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/13/2017, (Kipling, Michael)
|
June 12, 2017 |
Filing 509
MOTION FOR BILL OF COSTS Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54, filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Bill of Costs) Noting Date 6/30/2017, (Li, Xinlin)
|
June 8, 2017 |
Filing 508
ORDER granting #499 Stipulated Motion to file under seal signed by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS) Modified on 6/8/2017/cc OptoFidelity, LLC (RS).
|
June 7, 2017 |
Noting Date Reset: 497 MOTION for Bond Approval is renoted for 6/23/2017 pursuant to LCR 7(d)(3). (VE)
|
June 7, 2017 |
Noting Date Reset: #497 MOTION for Bond Approval is renoted for 6/23/2017 pursuant to LCR 7(d)(3). (VE)
|
June 6, 2017 |
Filing 507
DECLARATION of William C. Zoellner filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #504 Redacted MOTION for Attorney Fees (Li, Xinlin)
|
June 6, 2017 |
Filing 506
Redacted DECLARATION of Steven N. Feldman filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #504 Redacted MOTION for Attorney Fees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Li, Xinlin)
|
June 6, 2017 |
Filing 505
Redacted DECLARATION of David J. Burman filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #504 Redacted MOTION for Attorney Fees (Li, Xinlin)
|
June 5, 2017 |
Filing 504
Redacted MOTION for Attorney Fees , filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/23/2017, (Li, Xinlin)
|
June 5, 2017 |
Filing 503
SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Steven N. Feldman by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #499 Stipulated MOTION to Seal , #501 SEALED MOTION to for Recovery of Attorneys' Fees; re #499 Stipulated MOTION to Seal ; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Li, Xinlin)
|
June 5, 2017 |
Filing 502
SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of David J. Burman by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #499 Stipulated MOTION to Seal , #501 SEALED MOTION to for Recovery of Attorneys' Fees; re #499 Stipulated MOTION to Seal ; (Li, Xinlin)
|
June 5, 2017 |
Filing 501
SEALED MOTION to for Recovery of Attorneys' Fees; re #499 Stipulated MOTION to Seal ; by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 6/23/2017, (Li, Xinlin)
|
June 5, 2017 |
Filing 500
DECLARATION of Xinlin Li Morrow filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #499 Stipulated MOTION to Seal (Li, Xinlin)
|
June 5, 2017 |
Filing 499
Stipulated MOTION to Seal , filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/16/2017, (Li, Xinlin)
|
June 5, 2017 |
Filing 498
DECLARATION of Nathaniel P. Garrett filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #497 MOTION for Bond Approval (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Garrett, Nathaniel)
|
June 5, 2017 |
Filing 497
MOTION for Bond Approval, filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/16/2017, (Garrett, Nathaniel)
|
June 1, 2017 |
Filing 496
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael E Kipling on behalf of Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. (Kipling, Michael)
|
June 1, 2017 |
Filing 495
ORDER re #492 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Theane Evangelis for T-Mobile USA Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
|
June 1, 2017 |
Filing 494
ORDER re #491 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Josh A Krevitt for T-Mobile USA Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
|
June 1, 2017 |
Filing 493
ORDER re #490 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Daniel J Thomasch for T-Mobile USA Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
|
June 1, 2017 |
Filing 492
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Theane Evangelis FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4895782 (Kipling, Michael)
|
June 1, 2017 |
Filing 491
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Josh Andrew Krevitt FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4895769 (Kipling, Michael)
|
June 1, 2017 |
Filing 490
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Daniel J. Thomasch FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4895748 (Kipling, Michael)
|
May 22, 2017 |
Filing 489
JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff T-Mobile USA, Inc. against Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc. (VE)
|
May 22, 2017 |
Filing 488
ORDER re: Juror Lunches by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
|
May 18, 2017 |
Filing 487
SEALED DOCUMENT Plaintiff's Jury List and Juror Biographical Questionnaires (filed upon the request of Plaintiff related to the Batson challenge during voir dire) (VE)
|
May 18, 2017 |
Filing 486
SEALED DOCUMENT Jury List and Juror Biographical Questionnaires (VE)
|
May 18, 2017 |
Filing 485
UNREDACTED SEALED #484 JURY VERDICT (VE)
|
May 18, 2017 |
Filing 484
JURY VERDICT (Redacted) (VE)
|
May 18, 2017 |
Filing 483
UNREDACTED SEALED #482 Jury Question and the Court's Response (VE)
|
May 18, 2017 |
Filing 482
Jury Question and the Court's Response (Redacted) (VE)
|
May 18, 2017 |
Filing 481
UNREDACTED SEALED #480 Jury Question and the Court's Response (VE)
|
May 18, 2017 |
Filing 480
Jury Question and the Court's Response (Redacted) (VE)
|
May 17, 2017 |
Filing 479
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Jones - Dep Clerk: Victoria Ericksen; Pla Counsel: John Hueston, Moez Kaba, Alison Plessman, Steven Feldman, Xinlin Morrow, Michael Kipling, Eric Hayden; Def Counsel: James Hibey, Timothy Bickham, Michael Allan, Jeffrey Theodore, Jessica Rothschild, Frank Cordell; CR: Debbie Zurn; JURY TRIAL -- Day 16 held on 5/17/2017. At 8:55 a.m., the jury returns and resumes deliberations. At 12:49 p.m., the jury returns with a verdict in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant as set forth in the verdict form. The jury is polled and is unanimous. Judgment to be entered. (VE)
|
May 16, 2017 |
Filing 477
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Jones - Dep Clerk: Victoria Ericksen; Pla Counsel: John Hueston, Moez Kaba, Alison Plessman, Steven Feldman, Xinlin Morrow, Michael Kipling, Eric Hayden; Def Counsel: James Hibey, Timothy Bickham, Michael Allan, Jeffrey Theodore, Jessica Rothschild, Frank Cordell; CR: Debbie Zurn; JURY TRIAL -- Day 15 held on 5/16/2017. At 9:24 a.m., the jury returns and resumes deliberations. The jury submits two written questions. After conferring with counsel, the Court responds to the jury in writing. At 4:30 p.m., the jury is excused to return at 9:00 a.m. on 5/17/2017, to resume deliberations. (VE)
|
May 16, 2017 |
Filing 476
COURT'S FINAL INSTRUCTIONS TO THE JURY (VE)
|
May 15, 2017 |
Filing 478
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Jones - Dep Clerk: Victoria Ericksen; Pla Counsel: John Hueston, Moez Kaba, Alison Plessman, Steven Feldman, Xinlin Morrow, Michael Kipling, Eric Hayden; Def Counsel: James Hibey, Timothy Bickham, Michael Allan, Jeffrey Theodore, Jessica Rothschild, Frank Cordell; CR: Debbie Zurn; JURY TRIAL -- Day 14 held on 5/15/2017. The Court instructs the jury. Counsel present closing arguments. At 3:30 p.m., the jury commences deliberations. At 4:35 p.m., the jury is excused to return on 5/16/2017 at 9:00 a.m., to resume deliberations. (VE)
|
May 14, 2017 |
Filing 474
ORDER denying #469 MOTION for Judgment DEFENDANT HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC.'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
|
May 12, 2017 |
Filing 473
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Jones - Dep Clerk: Victoria Ericksen; Pla Counsel: John Hueston, Moez Kaba, Alison Plessman, Steven Feldman, Xinlin Morrow, Michael Kipling, Eric Hayden; Def Counsel: James Hibey, Timothy Bickham, Michael Allan, Jeffrey Theodore, Jessica Rothschild, Frank Cordell; CR: Debbie Zurn, Andrea Ramirez; JURY TRIAL -- Day 13 held on 5/12/2017. Debra Aron is sworn and testifies. Defendant rests. Ryan Sullivan is sworn and testifies in rebuttal. Plaintiff rests. Exhibits Admitted: 1124, 2020, 2021, 2022, 2023, 2024, 2025, 2026, 2027, 2028, and 2029. Jury trial to resume on 5/15/2017 at 9:00 a.m., before the Hon. Richard A. Jones. (VE)
|
May 12, 2017 |
Filing 472
Proposed Jury Instructions by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc (Proposed Jury Instruction No. 29 and Question No. 7 to the Verdict Form) (Li, Xinlin)
|
May 12, 2017 |
Filing 471
TRIAL BRIEF in Support of Unjust Enrichment Damages for Breach of Contract by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. (Li, Xinlin)
|
May 12, 2017 |
Filing 470
TRIAL BRIEF (Huawei Device USA's Trial Brief re Unjust Enrichment Damages; Proposed Jury Instruction No. 29 & Verdict Form Question 7) by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
May 12, 2017 |
Filing 469
MOTION for Judgment DEFENDANT HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC.'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/12/2017, (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
May 11, 2017 |
Filing 475
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Jones - Dep Clerk: Victoria Ericksen; Pla Counsel: John Hueston, Moez Kaba, Alison Plessman, Steven Feldman, Xinlin Morrow, Michael Kipling, Eric Hayden; Def Counsel: James Hibey, Timothy Bickham, Michael Allan, Jeffrey Theodore, Jessica Rothschild, Frank Cordell; CR: Debbie Zurn, Andrea Ramirez; JURY TRIAL -- Day 12 held on 5/11/2017. The deposition of William Wevers is presented to the jury in lieu of live testimony. Yongjian Dong, Sumeet Mann, and Joshua Smith are sworn and testify. Exhibits Admitted: 832, 833, 999, 1000, 1086, 1914, 3048, 3106, 3201, 3211, 3290, 3297, 3343, 3344, 3444.126, 3444.141, 3606, 3952, 3957, 4140, 4141, 4145, 4147, 4148, 4149, 4171, 4175, 4180, 4184, 4190, 4198, 4202, 4203, 4207, 4250, 4278, 4296, 4324, 4544, 4545, 4633, 4637, 4643, 4724, 4744, 4770, 4793, and 4794. Exhibit Refused: 2065. Objections and exceptions to the Court's proposed jury instructions are noted for the record. Jury trial to resume on 5/12/2017 at 9:00 a.m., before the Hon. Richard A. Jones. (VE)
|
May 10, 2017 |
Filing 468
MINUTE ORDER entered upon the authority of Judge Richard A. Jones denying Huawei Device USA's request to present the testimony of Aegis. (VE)
|
May 10, 2017 |
Filing 467
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Jones - Dep Clerk: Victoria Ericksen; Pla Counsel: John Hueston, Moez Kaba, Alison Plessman, Steven Feldman, Xinlin Morrow, Michael Kipling, Eric Hayden; Def Counsel: James Hibey, Timothy Bickham, Michael Allan, Jeffrey Theodore, Jessica Rothschild, Frank Cordell; CR: Debbie Zurn, Andrea Ramirez; JURY TRIAL -- Day 11 held on 5/10/2017. Testimony of Andrew Wolfe resumes. Todd Menenberg and Kimberly Bylund are sworn and testify. Exhibits Admitted: 887, 888, 3368, 3750, 3796, 3970TD, 4108, 4115, 4387, 4399, 4600, and 4616. Jury trial to resume on 5/11/2017 at 9:00 a.m., before the Hon. Richard A. Jones. (VE)
|
May 10, 2017 |
Filing 466
TRIAL BRIEF TO EXCLUDE, OR ALTERNATIVELY LIMIT, TESTIMONY OF AEGIS by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. (Li, Xinlin)
|
May 10, 2017 |
Filing 465
(DISREGARD, FILER TO REFILE DOCUMENT) TRIAL BRIEF TO EXCLUDE, OR ALTERNATIVELY LIMIT, TESTIMONY OF AEGIS by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. (Li, Xinlin) Modified on 5/10/2017 (RS).
|
May 10, 2017 |
Filing 464
TRIAL BRIEF (Huawei Device USA's Brief in Support of its Request to Call a Corporate Representative of Aegis) by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
May 10, 2017 |
NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #465 Trial Brief : Disregard this posting, document to be refiled (RS)
|
May 10, 2017 |
NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re 465 Trial Brief : Disregard this posting, document to be refiled (RS)
|
May 9, 2017 |
Filing 463
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Jones - Dep Clerk: Victoria Ericksen; Pla Counsel: John Hueston, Moez Kaba, Alison Plessman, Steven Feldman, Xinlin Morrow, Michael Kipling, Eric Hayden; Def Counsel: James Hibey, Timothy Bickham, Michael Allan, Jeffrey Theodore, Jessica Rothschild, Frank Cordell; CR: Debbie Zurn, Andrea Ramirez; JURY TRIAL -- Day 10 held on 5/9/2017. Testimony of Flavio Rossi resumes. The video deposition of Hailin Yu is presented to the jury in lieu of live testimony. Ryan Sullivan and Laura Buckland are sworn and testify. Plaintiff rests. Andrew Wolfe is sworn and testifies. Exhibits Admitted: 114, 808, 809, 811, 922, 960, 1173, 1176, 1196, 1327, 1363A, 1806, 2087, 3055, 3444 (page 137 only), 3709, 3754, 3817, 3817-1, 3822, 3822-1, 3824, 3824-1, 3828, 3828-1, 4453, 4653, and 4705. Exhibit Refused: 2110. Jury trial to resume on 5/10/2017 at 9:00 a.m., before the Hon. Richard A. Jones. (VE)
|
May 9, 2017 |
Filing 462
Proposed Jury Verdict Form by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. (Li, Xinlin)
|
May 9, 2017 |
Filing 461
Proposed Jury Instructions by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc [Revised Jury Instructions Regarding Damages] (Li, Xinlin)
|
May 9, 2017 |
Filing 460
Proposed Jury Instructions by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc (Defendant's Revised Proposed Jury Instructions Regarding Damages and Verdict Form) (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
May 8, 2017 |
Filing 459
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Jones - Dep Clerk: Victoria Ericksen; Pla Counsel: John Hueston, Moez Kaba, Alison Plessman, Steven Feldman, Xinlin Morrow, Michael Kipling, Eric Hayden; Def Counsel: James Hibey, Timothy Bickham, Michael Allan, Jeffrey Theodore, Jessica Rothschild, Frank Cordell; CR: Debbie Zurn, Andrea Ramirez; JURY TRIAL -- Day 9 held on 5/8/2017. Testimony of Michael Davies resumes. Corban Cunningham, Jason Hayes, and Flavio Rossi are sworn and testify. Exhibits Admitted: 849, 1044, 1154, 1172, 1186, 1190, 1192, 1193, 1288, 1641, 1644, 3436, 4162, 4212, 4213, 4305, 4355, 4423, 4428, and 4623. Jury trial to resume on 5/9/2017 at 9:00 a.m., before the Hon. Richard A. Jones. (VE)
|
May 5, 2017 |
Filing 458
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Jones - Dep Clerk: Victoria Ericksen; Pla Counsel: John Hueston, Moez Kaba, Alison Plessman, Steven Feldman, Xinlin Morrow, Michael Kipling, Eric Hayden; Def Counsel: James Hibey, Timothy Bickham, Michael Allan, Jeffrey Theodore, Jessica Rothschild, Frank Cordell; CR: Debbie Zurn, Andrea Ramirez; JURY TRIAL -- Day 8 held on 5/5/2017. Testimony of Jiangao Cui resumes. Michael Davies is sworn and testifies. Exhibits Admitted: 118, 342, 565, 591, 659, 690, 698, 716, 1021, 1149, 1612, 1618, 1643, 1645, 1884, 1887, 1933, 2006, 2052, 3232, 3313TD, 4320, 4599, 4599TD, and 4599TD-2. Jury trial to resume on 5/8/2017 at 9:00 a.m., before the Hon. Richard A. Jones.(VE)
|
May 4, 2017 |
Filing 457
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Jones - Dep Clerk: Victoria Ericksen; Pla Counsel: John Hueston, Moez Kaba, Alison Plessman, Steven Feldman, Xinlin Morrow, Michael Kipling, Eric Hayden; Def Counsel: James Hibey, Timothy Bickham, Michael Allan, Jeffrey Theodore, Jessica Rothschild, Frank Cordell; CR: Debbie Zurn, Andrea Ramirez; JURY TRIAL -- Day 7 held on 5/4/2017. Testimony of Peng Hu resumes. Trey Villanueva and Jiangao Cui are sworn and testify. After inquiring of Juror No. 1 regarding her request to be excused, and after conferring with counsel, the Court excuses Juror No. 1 from further jury service. Exhibits Admitted: 524, 990, 1115, 1213, 1215, 1238, 1276, 1937, 2151 (page 14 only), 4366, 4368, 4405, and 4619. Exhibit Refused: 4469. Jury trial to resume on 5/5/2017 at 9:00 a.m., before the Hon. Richard A. Jones. (VE)
|
May 4, 2017 |
Filing 456
ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones. (RS)
|
May 3, 2017 |
Filing 455
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Jones - Dep Clerks: Victoria Ericksen, Rhonda Miller; Pla Counsel: John Hueston, Moez Kaba, Alison Plessman, Steven Feldman, Xinlin Morrow, Michael Kipling, Eric Hayden; Def Counsel: James Hibey, Timothy Bickham, Michael Allan, Jeffrey Theodore, Jessica Rothschild, Frank Cordell; CR: Debbie Zurn, Andrea Ramirez; JURY TRIAL -- Day 6 held on 5/3/2017. Testimony of Peng Hu resumes. Exhibits Admitted: 6TD, 8TD, 42TD, 347, 1650, 1904, 1915, 2067, 3100TD, 3108, 3108TD, 3108TD-2, 3165, 3230, 3230TD, 3230TD-2, 3241TD, 3248, 3264TD, 3265TD, 3269TD, 3274TD, 3314TD, 3386, 3395, 3408TD, 3429, 3430, 3477 (Pages 1-23 only), 3477 (Pages 39-60 only), 3738, 3918, 3958, and 4596TD. Jury trial to resume on 5/4/2017 at 9:00 a.m., before the Hon. Richard A. Jones. (VE)
|
May 2, 2017 |
Filing 454
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Jones - Dep Clerk: Victoria Ericksen; Pla Counsel: John Hueston, Moez Kaba, Alison Plessman, Steven Feldman, Xinlin Morrow, Michael Kipling, Eric Hayden; Def Counsel: James Hibey, Timothy Bickham, Michael Allan, Jeffrey Theodore, Jessica Rothschild, Frank Cordell; CR: Debbie Zurn, Andrea Ramirez; JURY TRIAL -- Day 5 held on 5/2/2017. Testimony of Kathy Barnes resumes. Joseph Mantz and Peng Hu are sworn and testify. Exhibits Admitted: 73, 108, 166, 167, 183, 388, 389, 830, 831, 861, 862, 874, 892, 961, 1045, 1070, 1797, 1889, 1944, 1972, 2074, 3091, 3092, 3093, 3094, 3404TD, 3441, 3648, 4109, 4185, 4205, 4208, 4215, 4220, 4227, 4307, 4317, 4327, 4330, 4333, 4335, 4337, 4338, 4344, 4349, 4488, 4489, and 4622. Jury trial to resume on 5/3/2017 at 9:00 a.m., before the Hon. Richard A. Jones. (VE)
|
May 2, 2017 |
Filing 453
COURT'S RULING on Designation of Deposition Transcript of William Wevers by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
|
May 2, 2017 |
Filing 452
COURT'S RULING on Designation of Deposition Transcript of William Wevers by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
|
May 1, 2017 |
Filing 451
Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc.'s BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS HEARSAY OBJECTIONS TO THE DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF WILLIAM WEVERS by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc (Li, Xinlin)
|
May 1, 2017 |
Filing 450
TRIAL BRIEF Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Trial Brief Re Hearsay Objections To The Deposition Testimony of William Wevers by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
April 28, 2017 |
Filing 449
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Jones - Dep Clerk: Victoria Ericksen; Pla Counsel: John Hueston, Moez Kaba, Alison Plessman, Steven Feldman, Xinlin Morrow, Michael Kipling, Eric Hayden; Def Counsel: James Hibey, Timothy Bickham, Michael Allan, Jeffrey Theodore, Jessica Rothschild, Frank Cordell; CR: Debbie Zurn, Andrea Ramirez; JURY TRIAL -- Day 4 held on 4/28/2017. The Court and counsel discuss sealing of the courtroom for limited specific testimony regarding trade secrets. The Court and counsel discuss the allowable scope of the testimony of David Jenkinson. Testimony of David Jenkinson resumes. Kathy Barnes is sworn and testifies. Exhibits Admitted: 111, 353, 807, 901, 909, 931, 1033, 1035, 1123, 1360, 1382, 1905, 1913, 3106 (page 5 only), 3446, 4153, 4156, 4239, 4395-1, 4395-2, 4395-3, and 4473-21. Jury trial to resume on 5/2/2017 at 9:00 a.m., before the Hon. Richard A. Jones. (VE)
|
April 28, 2017 |
Filing 448
COURT'S RULING on Designation of Deposition Transcript of Kathy Barnes by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
|
April 28, 2017 |
Filing 447
COURT'S RULING on Designation of Deposition Transcript of Kimberly Bylund by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
|
April 27, 2017 |
Filing 446
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Jones - Dep Clerk: Victoria Ericksen; Pla Counsel: John Hueston, Moez Kaba, Alison Plessman, Steven Feldman, Xinlin Morrow, Michael Kipling; Def Counsel: James Hibey, Timothy Bickham, Michael Allan, Jeffrey Theodore, Jessica Rothschild, Frank Cordell; CR: Debbie Zurn, Andrea Ramirez; JURY TRIAL -- Day 3 held on 4/27/2017. Testimony of Richard Yao resumes. David Jenkinson is sworn and testifies. Exhibits Admitted: 4, 83, 444, 445, 1120, 1220, 1934, 3136, 3141, 3148, 3159, 3167, 3175, 3233, 3260, 3261, 3262, 3263, 3303, 3318, 3322, 3331, 3331TD, 3341, 3341-1, 3341-2, 3341-3, 3342, 3342TD, 3371, 3373, 3411, 4304, 4391, 4395, and 4592. Exhibits Refused: 3222 and 3222TD. Jury trial to resume on 4/28/2017 at 9:00 a.m., before the Hon. Richard A. Jones. (VE)
|
April 26, 2017 |
Filing 445
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Jones - Dep Clerk: Rhonda Miller; Pla Counsel: John Hueston, Moez Kaba, Alison Plessman, Steven Feldman, Xinlin Morrow, Michael Kipling; Def Counsel: James Hibey, Timothy Bickham, Michael Allan, Jeffrey Theodore, Jessica Rothschild, Frank Cordell; CR: Debbie Zurn, Andrea Ramirez; JURY TRIAL -- Day 2 held on 4/26/2017. Timothy Jason Young and Richard Yao are sworn and testify. Exhibits Admitted: 245, 464, 465, 952, 953, 1006, 1090, 1091, 1249, 1258, 1363, 1882, 1891, 1898, 1924, 1940, 1945, 1948, 1949, 1950, 1953, 1955, 1956, 2070, 4218, 4257, 4281, 4282, and 4311. Exhibits 1006 and 1363 conditionally admitted pending further proper foundation. After hearing from the parties, the Court adopts the parties' joint proposed jury instruction regarding sealing of the courtroom. During trial, if testimony or documents are presented that include confidential information, the public monitor will be turned off. If testimony or documents are presented that include proprietary information, the Court will read the instruction. Jury trial to resume on 4/26/2017 at 9:00 a.m., before the Hon. Richard A. Jones. (VE)
|
April 26, 2017 |
Filing 441
COURT'S RULING on Designation of Deposition Transcript of Hailin Yu by Judge Richard A Jones. (RM)
|
April 26, 2017 |
Filing 440
COURT'S RULING on Designation of Deposition Transcript of Charles de Chateauvieux by Judge Richard A Jones. (RM)
|
April 26, 2017 |
Filing 439
COURT'S RULING on Designation of Deposition Transcript of Helen Li by Judge Richard A Jones. (RM)
|
April 26, 2017 |
Filing 438
COURT'S RULING on Designation of Deposition Transcript of Xiaomei Ling by Judge Richard A Jones. (RM)
|
April 26, 2017 |
Filing 437
COURT'S RULING on Designation of Deposition Transcript of Jennifer Ponder by Judge Richard A Jones. (RM)
|
April 26, 2017 |
Filing 436
COURT'S RULING on Designation of Deposition Transcript of Hailin Yu by Judge Richard A Jones. (RM)
|
April 25, 2017 |
Filing 444
Defendant's Peremptory Challenges (VE)
|
April 25, 2017 |
Filing 443
UNREDACTED SEALED #442 Plaintiff's Peremptory Challenges (Juror Names Unredacted) (VE)
|
April 25, 2017 |
Filing 442
Plaintiff's Peremptory Challenges (Juror Names Redacted) (VE)
|
April 25, 2017 |
Filing 435
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Jones - Dep Clerk: Victoria Ericksen; Pla Counsel: John Hueston, Moez Kaba, Alison Plessman, Steven Feldman, Xinlin Morrow, Michael Kipling; Def Counsel: James Hibey, Timothy Bickham, Michael Allan, Jeffrey Theodore, Jessica Rothschild, Frank Cordell; CR: Debbie Zurn, Andrea Ramirez; JURY TRIAL -- Day 1 held on 4/25/2017. Voir dire commences. The jury is sworn and empaneled. The Court preliminarily instructs the jury. Counsel present opening statements. Jury trial to resume on 4/26/2017 at 9:00 a.m., before the Hon. Richard A. Jones. (VE)
|
April 25, 2017 |
Filing 434
ORDER re #430 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Adam Olin for T-Mobile USA Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
|
April 25, 2017 |
Filing 433
ORDER re #429 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sourabh Mishra for T-Mobile USA Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
|
April 25, 2017 |
Filing 432
ORDER re #428 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ellen Kenney for T-Mobile USA Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
|
April 25, 2017 |
Filing 431
ORDER re #427 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brian C. Berggren for T-Mobile USA Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
|
April 25, 2017 |
Filing 430
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Adam Olin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4852255 (Kipling, Michael)
|
April 25, 2017 |
Filing 429
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sourabh Mishra FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4852248 (Kipling, Michael)
|
April 25, 2017 |
Filing 428
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ellen Kenney FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4852240 (Kipling, Michael)
|
April 25, 2017 |
Filing 427
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brian C. Berggren FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4852230 (Kipling, Michael)
|
April 25, 2017 |
Filing 426
COURT'S RULING on Designation of Deposition Transcript of Jennifer Ponder (VE)
|
April 25, 2017 |
Filing 425
COURT'S RULING on Designation of Deposition Transcript of Xiaomei Ling (VE)
|
April 25, 2017 |
Filing 424
COURT'S RULING on Designation of Deposition Transcript of Helen Li (VE)
|
April 25, 2017 |
Filing 423
COURT'S RULING on Designation of Deposition Transcript of Charles de Chateauvieux (VE)
|
April 21, 2017 |
Filing 422
ORDER re #421 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Bo Yue for Huawei Device USA Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
|
April 21, 2017 |
Filing 421
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Bo Yue FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4849111 (Cordell, Franklin)
|
April 20, 2017 |
Filing 420
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on 4/18/2017 before Judge Richard A. Jones.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Debbie Zurn, debbie_zurn@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8504. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/19/2017, (DZ)
|
April 19, 2017 |
Filing 419
MINUTE ORDER Memorializing Telephone Conference entered upon the authority of Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
|
April 19, 2017 |
Filing 417
MINUTE ORDER Authorizing Food and Liquids in the Courthouse During Trial, entered upon the authority of Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
|
April 18, 2017 |
Filing 418
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Jones - Dep Clerk: Victoria Ericksen; Pla Counsel: John Hueston, Moez Kaba, Xinlin Morrow, Michael Kipling; Def Counsel: Timothy Bickham, James Hibey, Michael Allan, Jeffrey Theodore, Frank Cordell, Jeffrey Thomas; CR: Debbie Zurn; TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 4/18/2017. The Court directs the parties that no further additional briefing is permitted without leave from the Court. After hearing from counsel, the Court orders as follows: During trial the Court will seal the courtroom in a narrow manner to prevent the potential disclosure of trade secrets upon a proper foundation being laid and a clear indication that the courtroom should be closed. Defendant's request for an early exchange of exhibits prior to testimony is denied. The Court declines to adopt Defendant's request for ex parte communication with any "check" interpreters. Minute Order memorializing the Court's rulings to be entered. (VE)
|
April 18, 2017 |
Filing 416
ORDER denying defendant's #405 Motion for Leave to Depose by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS) Modified on 4/18/2017/cc OptoFidelity, LLC (RS).
|
April 17, 2017 |
Filing 415
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Margaret P Kammerud for Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. (Guo, Li)
|
April 17, 2017 |
Filing 414
ORDER denying Defendant's #403 notice of objection to jury trial, by Judge Richard A Jones. (PM)
|
April 17, 2017 |
Filing 413
NOTICE to File Under Seal re #409 Sealed Document, ; filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. (Li, Xinlin)
|
April 17, 2017 |
Filing 412
DECLARATION of Dr. Ryan Sullivan filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #406 MOTION for Leave Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Leave To Depose Ryan Sullivan and Disclose Witness(es) On Newly Disclosed Opinions [PUBLIC VERSION - REDACTED] (Li, Xinlin)
|
April 17, 2017 |
Filing 411
DECLARATION of Steven N. Feldman filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #406 MOTION for Leave Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Leave To Depose Ryan Sullivan and Disclose Witness(es) On Newly Disclosed Opinions [PUBLIC VERSION - REDACTED] (Li, Xinlin)
|
April 17, 2017 |
Filing 410
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, to #406 MOTION for Leave Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Leave To Depose Ryan Sullivan and Disclose Witness(es) On Newly Disclosed Opinions [PUBLIC VERSION - REDACTED]. (Li, Xinlin)
|
April 17, 2017 |
Filing 409
SEALED DOCUMENT T-Mobile's Opposition to Huawei's Motion for Leave by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #372 Order on Motion to Seal, #316 Order on Motion to Seal,,,,,, #397 Order on Stipulated Motion to Seal, #405 Sealed Document, (Li, Xinlin)
|
April 14, 2017 |
Filing 408
NOTICE Plaintiff T-Mobile USA, Inc. and Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc. Joint Notice of Filing Redacted Order on Motions In Limine ; filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff T-Mobile USA, Inc. and Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc. Joint Redactions to Court Order (ECF No. 400))(Rothschild, Jessica)
|
April 14, 2017 |
Filing 407
RESPONSE by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #403 Notice-Other (Li, Xinlin)
|
April 13, 2017 |
Set Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 4/18/2017 at 4:30 PM before Judge Richard A. Jones on 403 Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Objection To Jury Trial On Unjust Enrichment and Reasonable Royalty and 406 Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Leave To Depose Ryan Sullivan and Disclose Witness(es) On Newly Disclosed Opinions (VE)
|
April 13, 2017 |
Set Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 4/18/2017 at 4:30 PM before Judge Richard A. Jones on #403 Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Objection To Jury Trial On Unjust Enrichment and Reasonable Royalty and #406 Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Leave To Depose Ryan Sullivan and Disclose Witness(es) On Newly Disclosed Opinions (VE)
|
April 6, 2017 |
Filing 406
MOTION for Leave Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Leave To Depose Ryan Sullivan and Disclose Witness(es) On Newly Disclosed Opinions [PUBLIC VERSION - REDACTED], filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/21/2017, (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
April 6, 2017 |
Filing 405
SEALED DOCUMENT Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Leave To Depose Ryan Sullivan and Disclose Witness(es) On Newly Disclosed Opinions by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #372 Order on Motion to Seal, #404 Notice-Other (Guo, Li)
|
April 6, 2017 |
Filing 404
NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Certain Portions of Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Leave To Depose Ryan Sullivan and Disclose Witness(es) On Newly Disclosed Opinions ; filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. (Guo, Li)
|
April 6, 2017 |
Filing 403
NOTICE Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Objection To Jury Trial On Unjust Enrichment and Reasonable Royalty ; filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
April 1, 2017 |
Filing 402
STATEMENT Plaintiff T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s and Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Joint Statement Regarding Deposition Designations by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Li, Xinlin)
|
March 31, 2017 |
Filing 401
MINUTE ORDER entered upon the authority of Judge Richard A. Jones. No later than 4/14/2017, the parties shall file a proposed redacted version of (1) the Court's Sealed Order on Summary Judgment, Dkt. #334; and (2) the Court's Sealed Order on Motions in Limine, Dkt. #400. If the parties do not file proposed redactions within this time frame, the Court will unseal the Orders. Dkts. #334, 400. (VE)
|
March 30, 2017 |
Filing 400
SEALED ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff T-Mobile's #325 Motion in Limine (Nos. 1-3); granting in part and denying in part Defendant Huawei USA's #329 Motion in Limine (1-10), by Judge Richard A Jones. Sealed per direction from Chambers. (SWT) (cc: all counsel via email, OptoFidelity, LLC via USPS)
|
March 28, 2017 |
Defendant Huawei Technologies Co Ltd (a China company) is terminated per 334 SEALED ORDER granting in part and denying in part T-Mobile's 245 Sealed Motion for partial summary judgment; granting in part and denying in part Huawei Technologies' 250 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part T-Mobile's 254 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and denying Huawei USA's Cross Motions to strike 278 280 . (VE)
|
March 28, 2017 |
Defendant Huawei Technologies Co Ltd (a China company) is terminated per #334 SEALED ORDER granting in part and denying in part T-Mobile's #245 Sealed Motion for partial summary judgment; granting in part and denying in part Huawei Technologies' #250 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part T-Mobile's #254 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and denying Huawei USA's Cross Motions to strike #278 #280 . (VE)
|
March 23, 2017 |
Filing 399
STATEMENT re #391 Order on Motion to Seal,,,,,,,,, Plaintiff T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s and Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Joint Submission Regarding Certain Motions To Seal by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Omnibus [Proposed] Order Maintaining Under Seal Certain Documents)(Rothschild, Jessica)
|
March 20, 2017 |
Filing 398
ORDER granting dft Huawei Device USA Inc's #390 Motion for Leave to File Responsive Brief by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS) Modified on 3/20/2017/cc OptoFidelity, LLC (RS).
|
March 20, 2017 |
Filing 397
ORDER granting #392 Stipulated Motion to file under seal certain portions of T-Mobile's opposition to Huawei's motion for leave to file responsive brief by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS) Modified on 3/20/2017/cc OptoFidelity, LLC (RS).
|
March 17, 2017 |
Filing 396
REPLY, filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc, TO RESPONSE to #390 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Leave To File A Responsive Brief (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
March 13, 2017 |
Filing 395
UNREDACTED SEALED #394 Response to Motion, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc (Li, Xinlin)
|
March 13, 2017 |
Filing 394
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, to #390 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Leave To File A Responsive Brief. (Li, Xinlin)
|
March 13, 2017 |
Filing 393
DECLARATION of Steven N. Feldman filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #392 Stipulated MOTION to Seal Portions of T-Mobile's Opposition to Huawei's Motion for Leave (Li, Xinlin)
|
March 13, 2017 |
Filing 392
Stipulated MOTION to Seal Portions of T-Mobile's Opposition to Huawei's Motion for Leave, filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/24/2017, (Li, Xinlin)
|
March 10, 2017 |
Filing 391
ORDER STRIKING ALL PENDING MOTIONS #349 #364 #375 #377 #388 ; within 14 days parties are directed to meet and confer; within 14 days parties shall jointly file proof of agreement or the court will unseal all affected documents. Going forward, any motion to seal that is not brought jointly by the parties will be summarily denied and the documents at issue will be unsealed. Any party that violates this Order will be subject to sanctions by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
|
March 2, 2017 |
Filing 390
MOTION for Leave to File Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Leave To File A Responsive Brief, filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Responsive Brief (Redacted Public Version), #389 SEALED DOCUMENT Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Responsive Brief (Sealed) by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #388 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions Of Its Responsive Brief, #2 Declaration Of Jessica I. Rothschild In Support Of Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Responsive Brief And Exhibits 1-2, #3 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/17/2017, (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
March 2, 2017 |
Filing 389
SEALED DOCUMENT Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Responsive Brief (Sealed) by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #388 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions Of Its Responsive Brief (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
March 2, 2017 |
Filing 388
MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions Of Its Responsive Brief, filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/17/2017, (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
March 1, 2017 |
Filing 387
RESPONSE, by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc, to #375 MOTION to Seal . (Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
February 22, 2017 |
Filing 386
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of pretrial conference held on 2/10/2017 before Judge Richard A. Jones.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Nancy Bauer, nancy_bauer@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8506. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/23/2017, (NB)
|
February 21, 2017 |
Filing 385
TRIAL BRIEF Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Supplemental Trial Brief (REDACTED - PUBLIC VERSION) by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Yemei (Joyce) Dong (SEALED))(Rothschild, Jessica)
|
February 21, 2017 |
Filing 384
TRIAL BRIEF (Supplemental Trial Brief Redacted for Public Filing) by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. (Li, Xinlin)
|
February 21, 2017 |
Filing 383
SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Yemei (Joyce) Dong (SEALED) by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #377 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion To Seal Declaration Of Yemei (Joyce) Dong and Certain Portions of Its Supplemental Trial Brief, #382 Sealed Document, (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
February 21, 2017 |
Filing 382
SEALED DOCUMENT Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Supplemental Trial Brief (SEALED) by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #377 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion To Seal Declaration Of Yemei (Joyce) Dong and Certain Portions of Its Supplemental Trial Brief, #351 Sealed Document (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
February 21, 2017 |
Filing 381
SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits T-W to Declaration of Steve N. Feldman by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #375 MOTION to Seal , #380 Declaration (Li, Xinlin)
|
February 21, 2017 |
Filing 380
DECLARATION of Steven N. Feldman filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #375 MOTION to Seal (Li, Xinlin)
|
February 21, 2017 |
Filing 379
SEALED DOCUMENT Unredacted Supplemental Trial Brief by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #375 MOTION to Seal , #357 Trial Brief (Li, Xinlin)
|
February 21, 2017 |
Filing 378
DECLARATION of Charles M. De Chateauvieux filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #377 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion To Seal Declaration Of Yemei (Joyce) Dong and Certain Portions of Its Supplemental Trial Brief (Guo, Li)
|
February 21, 2017 |
Filing 377
MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion To Seal Declaration Of Yemei (Joyce) Dong and Certain Portions of Its Supplemental Trial Brief, filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/10/2017, (Guo, Li)
|
February 21, 2017 |
Filing 376
DECLARATION of Xinlin Li Morrow filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #375 MOTION to Seal (Li, Xinlin)
|
February 21, 2017 |
Filing 375
MOTION to Seal , filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. Noting Date 3/3/2017, (Li, Xinlin)
|
February 17, 2017 |
Filing 374
ORDER granting T-Mobile USA, Inc's #342 Motion to Seal. The clerk is directed to maintain Exhibits D, E, G, J and Q to the Feldman Decl. under seal. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (PM)
|
February 17, 2017 |
Filing 373
ORDER granting Defendants' #336 Motion to Seal. Huawei USA's Opposition to T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Motions in Limine, and Exhibits 2 and 3 to the Declaration of Margaret Kammerud in support thereof are hereby ordered sealed. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (PM) Modified on 2/17/2017 cc to OptoFidelity, LLC (PM).
|
February 17, 2017 |
Filing 372
ORDER granting Defendants' #327 Motion to Seal. Huawei's Motion in Limine, (2) the Declaration of Michael Flynn-OBrien in support thereof, and (3) Exhibits 1, 3, 5, 6, 7, 8, 10, and 15 attached to the Declaration of Margaret Kammerud in support thereof are hereby sealed. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (PM) Modified on 2/17/2017: cc to OptoFidelity, LLC (PM).
|
February 17, 2017 |
Filing 371
DECLARATION of Peng Hu filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #349 MOTION to Seal (Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
February 17, 2017 |
Filing 370
RESPONSE, by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc, to #349 MOTION to Seal . (Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
February 13, 2017 |
Filing 369
ORDER within 7 days the parties are permitted to submit a brief re certain points of contention addressed in the parties' pretrial submissions by Judge Richard A Jones. (RS) Modified on 2/13/2017/cc OptoFidelity, LLC (RS).
|
February 13, 2017 |
Filing 368
MINUTE ORDER entered upon the authority of Judge Richard A. Jones. To accommodate the court's trial schedule, the trial date in this matter is adjusted from 2/21/2017 to Tuesday, 4/25/2017 at 9:00 AM. (VE)
|
February 10, 2017 |
Filing 367
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Jones - Dep Clerk: Victoria Ericksen; Pla Counsel: John Hueston, Alison Plessman, Moez Kaba, Xinlin Li, Michael Kipling; Def Counsel: James Hibey, Timothy Bickham, Michael Allan, Frank Cordell; CR: Nancy Bauer; PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 2/10/2017. Jury trial confirmed to commence on Tuesday, 4/25/2017 at 9:00 a.m. The court and counsel discuss length of trial, trial schedule, jury selection procedure, exhibits, witness issues, and general trial procedure. The court sets this matter for a 12-day trial, with the time allocation to be split 50/50 between the parties. All aspects of trial are included in the time allocation, including jury selection, opening and closing statements, all testimony, and jury instructions. The court sets deadlines for the parties to exchange their final lists of trial witnesses and deposition designations as set forth on the record. The court GRANTS Plaintiff's request to exclude late-disclosed witnesses Jin Zhou and Xuesong Yu. The court precludes the parties from pursuing the outstanding discovery in Finland. The court will issue a minute order regarding whether it will permit responsive trial briefs. Deadline to notify the Court of any settlement without incurring the cost of summoning a venire is 4/20/2017 by 4:00 p.m. (VE)
|
February 8, 2017 |
Filing 366
SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Dr. Debra J. Aron; #363 Huawei Device USA, Inc.s Request For A Hearing On Its Motion In Limine To Exclude Ryan Sullivans Expert Opinions by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #364 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion To Seal The Declaration Of Dr. Debra J. Aron, #363 Request,, (Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
February 8, 2017 |
Filing 365
DECLARATION of Margaret P. Kammerud In Support Of Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion To Seal The Declaration of Dr. Debra J. Aron; #363 Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Request For A Hearing On Its Motion In Limine To Exclude Ryan Sullivan's Expert Opinions filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #364 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion To Seal The Declaration Of Dr. Debra J. Aron (Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
February 8, 2017 |
Filing 364
MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion To Seal The Declaration Of Dr. Debra J. Aron, filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/24/2017, (Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
February 8, 2017 |
Filing 363
REQUEST : Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Request For A Hearing On Its Motion In Limine To Exclude Ryan Sullivan's Expert Opinions by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc for Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Request For A Hearing On Its Motion In Limine To Exclude Ryan Sullivan's Expert Opinions re #329 SEALED MOTION to DEFENDANTS HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC. AND HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.'S MOTION IN LIMINE 1-10 (SEALED); re #327 MOTION to Seal HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. AND HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC.'S, #333 Redacted Document, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Dr. Debra J. Aron (SEALED))(Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
February 8, 2017 |
Filing 362
RESPONSE, by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc, to #342 MOTION to Seal . (Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
February 8, 2017 |
Filing 361
DECLARATION of Xinlin Li Morrow filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #327 MOTION to Seal HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. AND HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC.'S MOTION TO SEAL THE MOTION IN LIMINE, CERTAIN PORTIONS OF THE DECLARATION OF MICHAEL FLYNN-OBRIEN, AND CERTAIN EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF MARGARET KAMMERUD (Li, Xinlin)
|
February 8, 2017 |
Filing 360
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, to #327 MOTION to Seal HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. AND HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC.'S MOTION TO SEAL THE MOTION IN LIMINE, CERTAIN PORTIONS OF THE DECLARATION OF MICHAEL FLYNN-OBRIEN, AND CERTAIN EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF MARGARET KAMMERUD. (Li, Xinlin)
|
February 8, 2017 |
Filing 359
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, to #336 MOTION to Seal . (Li, Xinlin)
|
February 7, 2017 |
Filing 358
TRIAL BRIEF (Redacted for Public Filing) by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. (Li, Xinlin)
|
February 7, 2017 |
Filing 357
TRIAL BRIEF DEFENDANT HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC.'S TRIAL BRIEF by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. (Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
February 7, 2017 |
Filing 356
Proposed Jury Instructions by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc (Joint Statement of Disputed Instructions) (Li, Xinlin)
|
February 7, 2017 |
Filing 355
Proposed Jury Instructions by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc (Joint Agreed Instructions) (Li, Xinlin)
|
February 7, 2017 |
Filing 354
Proposed Voir Dire by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: T-Mobile and Huawei [Proposed] Joint Supplemental Juror Questionnaire, #2 Exhibit B: T-Mobile and Huawei [Proposed] Joint Judge Conducted Voir Dire)(Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
February 7, 2017 |
Filing 353
SEALED DOCUMENT Sealed Exhibit A-L and P-Q to Declaration of Steven N. Feldman by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #349 MOTION to Seal , #352 Declaration, #351 Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-F, #2 Exhibit G-H, #3 Exhibit I, #4 Exhibit J-L, #5 Exhibit P, #6 Exhibit Q)(Li, Xinlin)
|
February 7, 2017 |
Filing 352
DECLARATION of Steven N. Feldman filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #349 MOTION to Seal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Q)(Li, Xinlin)
|
February 7, 2017 |
Filing 351
SEALED DOCUMENT Trial Brief by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #349 MOTION to Seal (Li, Xinlin)
|
February 7, 2017 |
Filing 350
DECLARATION of Xinlin Li Morrow filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #349 MOTION to Seal (Li, Xinlin)
|
February 7, 2017 |
Filing 349
MOTION to Seal , filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. Noting Date 2/17/2017, (Li, Xinlin)
|
January 31, 2017 |
Filing 348
Proposed Pretrial Order by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Li, Xinlin)
|
January 30, 2017 |
Filing 347
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, to #329 SEALED MOTION to DEFENDANTS HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC. AND HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.'S MOTION IN LIMINE 1-10 (SEALED); re #327 MOTION to Seal HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. AND HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC.'S. Oral Argument Requested. (Li, Xinlin)
|
January 30, 2017 |
Filing 346
SEALED DOCUMENT Sealed Exhibits D-E, G, J, Q to Declaration of Steven N. Feldman by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #342 MOTION to Seal , #345 Declaration, #344 Sealed Document, (Li, Xinlin)
|
January 30, 2017 |
Filing 345
DECLARATION of Steven N. Feldman filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #329 SEALED MOTION to DEFENDANTS HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC. AND HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.'S MOTION IN LIMINE 1-10 (SEALED); re #327 MOTION to Seal HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. AND HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC.'S, #342 MOTION to Seal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Q)(Li, Xinlin)
|
January 30, 2017 |
Filing 344
SEALED DOCUMENT T-Mobile's Opposition to Huawei's Motions in Limine Nos. 1-10 by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #342 MOTION to Seal , #329 SEALED MOTION to DEFENDANTS HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC. AND HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.'S MOTION IN LIMINE 1-10 (SEALED); re #327 MOTION to Seal HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. AND HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC.'S (Li, Xinlin)
|
January 30, 2017 |
Filing 343
DECLARATION of Xinlin Li Morrow filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #342 MOTION to Seal (Li, Xinlin)
|
January 30, 2017 |
Filing 342
MOTION to Seal , filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. Noting Date 2/10/2017, (Li, Xinlin)
|
January 30, 2017 |
Filing 341
SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits 2 and 3 to Declaration of Margaret Kammerud by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #336 MOTION to Seal , #339 Declaration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
January 30, 2017 |
Filing 340
SEALED DOCUMENT Huawei Device USA Inc.'s Opposition to to T-Mobile's Motions in Limine by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #336 MOTION to Seal , #338 Response to Motion (Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
January 30, 2017 |
Filing 339
DECLARATION of Margaret Kammerud filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #325 MOTIONS IN LIMINE Nos. 1-3 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
January 30, 2017 |
Filing 338
RESPONSE, by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc, to #325 MOTIONS IN LIMINE Nos. 1-3. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
January 30, 2017 |
Filing 337
DECLARATION of Michael Flynn-O'Brien filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #336 MOTION to Seal (Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
January 30, 2017 |
Filing 336
MOTION to Seal , filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/10/2017, (Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
January 30, 2017 |
Filing 335
DECLARATION of Michael Davies in Support of T-Mobile's Opposition to Huawei's Motion in Limine No. 2 filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #329 SEALED MOTION to DEFENDANTS HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC. AND HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.'S MOTION IN LIMINE 1-10 (SEALED); re #327 MOTION to Seal HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. AND HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC.'S (Li, Xinlin)
|
January 26, 2017 |
Filing 334
SEALED ORDER granting in part and denying in part T-Mobile's #245 Sealed Motion for partial summary judgment; granting in part and denying in part Huawei Technologies' #250 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part T-Mobile's #254 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying Huawei USA's Cross Motions to strike #278 #280 . Parties to prepare jointly redacted version within 14 days by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)counsel emailed. Modified on 1/26/2017/cc OptoFidelity, LLC (RS).
|
January 19, 2017 |
Filing 333
REDACTION to #329 SEALED MOTION to DEFENDANTS HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC. AND HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.'S MOTION IN LIMINE 1-10 (SEALED); re #327 MOTION to Seal HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. AND HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC.'S [REDACTED] DEFENDANTS HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC. AND HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.'S MOTION IN LIMINE 1-10 by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
January 17, 2017 |
Filing 332
DECLARATION of MARGARET KAMMERUD IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC. AND HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.'S MOTION IN LIMINE 1-10 filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #329 SEALED MOTION to DEFENDANTS HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC. AND HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.'S MOTION IN LIMINE 1-10 (SEALED); re #327 MOTION to Seal HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. AND HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC.'S (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Redacted), #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 (Sealed), #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5 (Redacted), #6 Exhibit 6 (Sealed), #7 Exhibit 7 (Redacted), #8 Exhibit 8 (Sealed), #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10 (Redacted), #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15 (Sealed), #16 Exhibit 16)(Rothschild, Jessica)
|
January 17, 2017 |
Filing 331
DECLARATION of MICHAEL FYLNN-OBRIEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC. AND HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.S MOTIONS IN LIMINE 1-10 (REDACTED) filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #329 SEALED MOTION to DEFENDANTS HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC. AND HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.'S MOTION IN LIMINE 1-10 (SEALED); re #327 MOTION to Seal HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. AND HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC.'S (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
January 17, 2017 |
Filing 330
SEALED DOCUMENT DECLARATION OF MICHAEL FYLNN-OBRIEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC. AND HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE 1-10 and M. KAMMERUD DECLARATION EXHIBITS 1, 3, 5, 6, 7, 8, 10, 15 by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #327 MOTION to Seal HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. AND HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC.'S MOTION TO SEAL THE MOTION IN LIMINE, CERTAIN PORTIONS OF THE DECLARATION OF MICHAEL FLYNN-OBRIEN, AND CERTAIN EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF MARGARET KAMMERUD, #328 Declaration, #329 SEALED MOTION to DEFENDANTS HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC. AND HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.'S MOTION IN LIMINE 1-10 (SEALED); re #327 MOTION to Seal HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. AND HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC.'S (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 15)(Rothschild, Jessica)
|
January 17, 2017 |
Filing 329
SEALED MOTION to DEFENDANTS HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC. AND HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.'S MOTION IN LIMINE 1-10 (SEALED); re #327 MOTION to Seal HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. AND HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC.'S MOTION TO SEAL THE MOTION IN LIMINE, CERTAIN PORTIONS OF THE DECLARATION OF MICHAEL FLYNN-OBRIEN, AND CERTAIN EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF MARGARET KAMMERUD, #328 Declaration, ; by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/3/2017, (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
January 17, 2017 |
Filing 328
DECLARATION of MARGARET KAMMERUD IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC. AND HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.'S MOTION TO SEAL filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #327 MOTION to Seal HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. AND HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC.'S MOTION TO SEAL THE MOTION IN LIMINE, CERTAIN PORTIONS OF THE DECLARATION OF MICHAEL FLYNN-OBRIEN, AND CERTAIN EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF MARGARET KAMMERUD (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
January 17, 2017 |
Filing 327
MOTION to Seal HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. AND HUAWEI DEVICE USA, INC.'S MOTION TO SEAL THE MOTION IN LIMINE, CERTAIN PORTIONS OF THE DECLARATION OF MICHAEL FLYNN-OBRIEN, AND CERTAIN EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF MARGARET KAMMERUD, filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/10/2017, (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
January 17, 2017 |
Filing 326
DECLARATION of Steven N. Feldman filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #325 MOTIONS IN LIMINE Nos. 1-3 (Li, Xinlin)
|
January 17, 2017 |
Filing 325
MOTIONS IN LIMINE Nos. 1-3, filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 2/3/2017, (Li, Xinlin)
|
January 17, 2017 |
Filing 324
ORDER denying defendants' #221 Motion to strike portions of an expert report ; denying defendants' #223 Sealed Motion by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS) Modified on 1/17/2017/cc OptoFidelity, LLC (RS).
|
January 13, 2017 |
Set Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 2/10/2017 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 13106 before Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
|
January 11, 2017 |
Filing 323
REDACTION to #316 Order on Motion to Seal,,,,,, #221 MOTION to Exclude Defendants Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. and Huawei Device USA, Inc.s Motion To Strike Portions of T-Mobile's September 17, 2016 Supplemental Expert Report of Michael A.M. Davies (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION), #223 SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of T-Mobile's September 17, 2016 Supplemental Expert Report of Michael A.M. Davies; re #219 MOTION to Seal Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. and Huawei Device USA, Inc.s Motion To DKT. NO. 221: CONTAINS A LIMITED UNSEALED PORTION OF DKT. NO. 223 by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
January 11, 2017 |
Filing 322
STATEMENT re #313 Statement,,,,, SECOND JOINT SUBMISSION RE PENDING MOTIONS TO SEAL by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kipling, Michael)
|
January 11, 2017 |
Filing 321
EXHIBIT 4 (UNSEALED VERSIONS) re #285 Sealed Document,, #316 Order on Motion to Seal,,,,,, #284 Declaration,, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11, #2 Exhibit 23, #3 Exhibit 24, #4 Exhibit 28, #5 Exhibit 29, #6 Exhibit 30, #7 Exhibit 31)(Kipling, Michael)
|
January 10, 2017 |
Filing 320
MINUTE ORDER entered upon the authority of Judge Richard A. Jones. Defendants' #318 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages is DENIED. (VE)
|
January 5, 2017 |
Filing 319
DECLARATION of Margaret P. Kammerud filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #318 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Cordell, Franklin)
|
January 5, 2017 |
Filing 318
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages ,filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/5/2017, (Cordell, Franklin)
|
January 4, 2017 |
Filing 317
ORDER denying Plaintiff's #213 Motion to Compel Pursuant to Local Rule 37, by Judge Richard A Jones. (PM)
|
December 29, 2016 |
Filing 316
ORDER by Judge Richard A. Jones GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART the parties' #219 , #243 , #255 , #267 , #276 , #282 , and #295 Motions to Seal. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (VE)
|
December 28, 2016 |
Filing 315
ORDER re #314 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Nathaniel P. Garrett for Huawei Device USA Inc., and for Huawei Technologies Co Ltd, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
|
December 28, 2016 |
Filing 314
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Nathaniel P. Garrett FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4717301 (Cordell, Franklin)
|
December 18, 2016 |
Filing 313
STATEMENT re #276 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions of Their Opposition To T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Motion For Partial Summary Judgment, #267 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of T-Mobile's Opposition to Huawei Technologies' Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits Thereto, #243 MOTION to Seal , #282 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of T-Mobile's Opposition to Huawei Device USA's Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits Thereto, #219 MOTION to Seal Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. and Huawei Device USA, Inc.s Motion To Seal Certain Portions Of Their Motion To Strike and Certain Exhibits 1 and 2 To The Declaration Of Michael Flynn-OBrien, #295 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions of Its Reply I/S/O Its Motion For Summary Judgment and Certain Exhibits To The Supplemental Declaration Of Jessica Rothschild, #255 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions Of Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment and Certain Exhibits To The Declaration Of Jessica I. Rothschild JOINT SUBMISSION RE PENDING MOTIONS TO SEAL by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc (Li, Xinlin)
|
November 30, 2016 |
Filing 312
DECLARATION of XINLIN LI MORROW filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #295 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions of Its Reply I/S/O Its Motion For Summary Judgment and Certain Exhibits To The Supplemental Declaration Of Jessica Rothschild (Kipling, Michael)
|
November 30, 2016 |
Filing 311
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, to #295 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions of Its Reply I/S/O Its Motion For Summary Judgment and Certain Exhibits To The Supplemental Declaration Of Jessica Rothschild. (Kipling, Michael)
|
November 18, 2016 |
Filing 310
REPLY, filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd, TO RESPONSE to #276 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions of Their Opposition To T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Motion For Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Amended))(Rothschild, Jessica)
|
November 18, 2016 |
Filing 309
REPLY, filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, TO RESPONSE to #267 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of T-Mobile's Opposition to Huawei Technologies' Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits Thereto (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Li, Xinlin)
|
November 18, 2016 |
Filing 308
DECLARATION of Xinlin Li Morrow filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #267 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of T-Mobile's Opposition to Huawei Technologies' Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits Thereto, #282 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of T-Mobile's Opposition to Huawei Device USA's Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits Thereto (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-F)(Li, Xinlin)
|
November 18, 2016 |
Filing 307
REPLY, filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, TO RESPONSE to #282 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of T-Mobile's Opposition to Huawei Device USA's Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits Thereto (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Li, Xinlin)
|
November 16, 2016 |
Filing 306
RESPONSE, by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd, to #267 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of T-Mobile's Opposition to Huawei Technologies' Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits Thereto. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rothschild, Jessica)
|
November 16, 2016 |
Filing 305
RESPONSE, by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd, to #282 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of T-Mobile's Opposition to Huawei Device USA's Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits Thereto. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rothschild, Jessica)
|
November 16, 2016 |
Filing 304
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, to #276 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions of Their Opposition To T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Motion For Partial Summary Judgment. (Kipling, Michael)
|
November 14, 2016 |
Filing 303
DECLARATION of Fang Ning In Support of Defendant Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Reply In Support of Its Motion For Summary Judgment; #301 Reply; #302 Supplemental Declaration of Jessica I. Rothschild filed by Defendant Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #250 MOTION for Summary Judgment Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion For Summary Judgment (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
November 14, 2016 |
Filing 302
Supplemental DECLARATION of Jessica I. Rothschild In Support of Defendant Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Reply In Support of Its Motion For Summary Judgment; #251 DECLARATION of Jessica I. Rothschild In Support Of Defendant Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.s Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #250 MOTION for Summary Judgment Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion For Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G, #2 Exhibit H, #3 Exhibit I, #4 Exhibit J)(Rothschild, Jessica)
|
November 14, 2016 |
Filing 301
REPLY, filed by Defendant Huawei Technologies Co Ltd, TO RESPONSE to #250 MOTION for Summary Judgment Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion For Summary Judgment (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
November 14, 2016 |
Filing 300
Supplemental DECLARATION of Jessica I. Rothschild In Support of Defendant Device USA, Inc.'s Reply In Support of Its Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #259 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] to #257 SEALED MOTION to Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment, #295 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions of Its Reply I/S/O Its Motion For Summary Judgment and Certain Exhibits To The Supplemental Declaration Of Jessica Rothschild, #257 SEALED MOTION to Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment; re #255 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions Of Hua (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 68 (Sealed), #2 Exhibit 69, #3 Exhibit 70, #4 Exhibit 71, #5 Exhibit 72 (Redacted), #6 Exhibit 73 (Sealed), #7 Exhibit 74 (Sealed), #8 Exhibit 75, #9 Exhibit 76 (Sealed), #10 Exhibit 77, #11 Exhibit 78, #12 Exhibit 79)(Rothschild, Jessica)
|
November 14, 2016 |
Filing 299
REPLY, filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc, TO RESPONSE to #257 SEALED MOTION to Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment; re #255 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions Of Hua, #295 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions of Its Reply I/S/O Its Motion For Summary Judgment and Certain Exhibits To The Supplemental Declaration Of Jessica Rothschild (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rothschild, Jessica)
|
November 14, 2016 |
Filing 298
SEALED DOCUMENT Jessica I. Rothschild Supplemental Declaration Exhibits 68, 72, 73, 74, 76 by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #295 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions of Its Reply I/S/O Its Motion For Summary Judgment and Certain Exhibits To The Supplemental Declaration Of Jessica Rothschild, #260 Declaration,,,,,,,,, #258 Sealed Document,,,, #297 Sealed Document,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 68, #2 Exhibit 72, #3 Exhibit 73, #4 Exhibit 74, #5 Exhibit 76)(Rothschild, Jessica)
|
November 14, 2016 |
Filing 297
SEALED DOCUMENT Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Reply In Support of Its Motion For Summary Judgment by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #295 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions of Its Reply I/S/O Its Motion For Summary Judgment and Certain Exhibits To The Supplemental Declaration Of Jessica Rothschild, #257 SEALED MOTION to Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment; re #255 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions Of Hua, #259 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] to #257 SEALED MOTION to Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment, #296 Declaration, (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
November 14, 2016 |
Filing 296
DECLARATION of Michael Flynn-OBrien In Support Of Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions of Its Reply In Support of Its Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #295 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions of Its Reply I/S/O Its Motion For Summary Judgment and Certain Exhibits To The Supplemental Declaration Of Jessica Rothschild (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
November 14, 2016 |
Filing 295
MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions of Its Reply I/S/O Its Motion For Summary Judgment and Certain Exhibits To The Supplemental Declaration Of Jessica Rothschild by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/2/2016, (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
November 14, 2016 |
Filing 294
SEALED DOCUMENT Reply by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #276 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions of Their Opposition To T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Motion For Partial Summary Judgment, #267 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of T-Mobile's Opposition to Huawei Technologies' Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits Thereto, #243 MOTION to Seal , #205 Order on Motion for Sanctions,,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Seal,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Leave,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Sealed Motion,,,,,,, #293 Reply to Response to Motion, #245 SEALED MOTION to for Partial Summary Judgment; re #243 MOTION to Seal ; (Li, Xinlin)
|
November 14, 2016 |
Filing 293
REPLY, filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, TO RESPONSE to #245 SEALED MOTION to for Partial Summary Judgment; re #243 MOTION to Seal ; (Li, Xinlin)
|
November 14, 2016 |
Filing 292
DECLARATION of Xinlin Li Morrow filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #245 SEALED MOTION to for Partial Summary Judgment; re #243 MOTION to Seal ; (Li, Xinlin)
|
November 14, 2016 |
Filing 291
DECLARATION of Theodore E. MacInnes filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #245 SEALED MOTION to for Partial Summary Judgment; re #243 MOTION to Seal ; (Li, Xinlin)
|
November 11, 2016 |
Filing 290
REPLY, filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, TO RESPONSE to #243 MOTION to Seal (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Amended))(Li, Xinlin)
|
November 9, 2016 |
Filing 289
DECLARATION of Mingtao (Alex) Xiong In Support of Huawei's Response In Support of T-Mobile's Motion To Seal (Dkt. 243); #288 RESPONSE, by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #243 MOTION to Seal (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
November 9, 2016 |
Filing 288
RESPONSE, by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd, to #243 MOTION to Seal . (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
November 9, 2016 |
Filing 287
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, to #255 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions Of Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment and Certain Exhibits To The Declaration Of Jessica I. Rothschild. (Kipling, Michael)
|
November 7, 2016 |
Filing 286
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, to #257 SEALED MOTION to Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment; re #255 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions Of Hua. Oral Argument Requested. (Li, Xinlin)
|
November 7, 2016 |
Filing 285
SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits 2-6, 8, 11-32, 34-38, 48, 49, 54, and 57 to Declaration of Steven N. Feldman by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #282 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of T-Mobile's Opposition to Huawei Device USA's Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits Thereto, #283 Sealed Document,, #284 Declaration,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 6, 8, 11, 12, #3 Exhibit 13, #4 Exhibit 14-21, #5 Exhibit 22-24, #6 Exhibit 25-29, #7 Exhibit 30-32, 34-37, #8 Exhibit 38, #9 Exhibit 48, #10 Exhibit 49, #11 Exhibit 54, #12 Exhibit 57)(Li, Xinlin)
|
November 7, 2016 |
Filing 284
DECLARATION of Steven N. Feldman filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #257 SEALED MOTION to Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment; re #255 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions Of Hua, #282 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of T-Mobile's Opposition to Huawei Device USA's Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits Thereto (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-40, #2 Exhibit 41-54, #3 Exhibit 55-57)(Li, Xinlin)
|
November 7, 2016 |
Filing 283
SEALED DOCUMENT Opposition to Huawei Device USA's Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #282 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of T-Mobile's Opposition to Huawei Device USA's Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits Thereto, #257 SEALED MOTION to Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment; re #255 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions Of Hua (Li, Xinlin)
|
November 7, 2016 |
Filing 282
MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of T-Mobile's Opposition to Huawei Device USA's Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits Thereto by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. Noting Date 11/18/2016, (Li, Xinlin)
|
November 7, 2016 |
Filing 281
DECLARATION of Jessica I. Rothschild In Support of Defendants Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. and Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Opposition To T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Motion For Partial Summary Judgment, #280 RESPONSE, by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #276 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions of Their Opposition To T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Motion For Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Sealed), #2 Exhibit 2 (Sealed), #3 Exhibit 3 (Sealed), #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5 (Redacted), #6 Exhibit 6 (Sealed), #7 Exhibit 7 (Redacted), #8 Exhibit 8 (Sealed), #9 Exhibit 9 (Redacted), #10 Exhibit 10 (Sealed), #11 Exhibit 11 (Sealed), #12 Exhibit 12 (Sealed), #13 Exhibit 13 (Sealed))(Rothschild, Jessica)
|
November 7, 2016 |
Filing 280
RESPONSE, by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd, to #245 SEALED MOTION to for Partial Summary Judgment; re #243 MOTION to Seal ;, #254 Redacted MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rothschild, Jessica)
|
November 7, 2016 |
Filing 279
SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits 1, 2, 3, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13 to the Declaration of Jessica I. Rothschild In Support of Defendants Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. and Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Opposition To T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Motion For Partial Summary Judgment by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #276 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions of Their Opposition To T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Motion For Partial Summary Judgment, #278 Sealed Document,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13)(Rothschild, Jessica) Modified on 12/29/2016 to unseal Exhibits 1, 2, 3, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11 and 12 pursuant to the Court's #316 Order on the parties' Motions to Seal. (VE)
|
November 7, 2016 |
Filing 278
SEALED DOCUMENT Defendants Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. and Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Opposition To T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Motion For Partial Summary Judgment by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #276 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions of Their Opposition To T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Motion For Partial Summary Judgment, #245 SEALED MOTION to for Partial Summary Judgment; re #243 MOTION to Seal ;, #254 Redacted MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
November 7, 2016 |
Filing 277
DECLARATION of Michael Flynn-OBrien In Support of Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.s Motion To Seal Certain Portions of Their Opposition To T-Mobile USA, Inc.s Motion For Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #276 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions of Their Opposition To T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Motion For Partial Summary Judgment (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
November 7, 2016 |
Filing 276
MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions of Their Opposition To T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Motion For Partial Summary Judgment by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/18/2016, (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
November 7, 2016 |
Filing 275
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, to #250 MOTION for Summary Judgment Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion For Summary Judgment. Oral Argument Requested. (Li, Xinlin)
|
November 7, 2016 |
Filing 274
EXHIBIT 1-27 to Declaration of Xinlin Li Morrow re #271 Declaration, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc (Li, Xinlin)
|
November 7, 2016 |
Filing 273
SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits 1-14 and 21-27 to Declaration of Xinlin Li Morrow by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #267 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of T-Mobile's Opposition to Huawei Technologies' Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits Thereto, #270 Sealed Document, #271 Declaration, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6-7, #5 Exhibit 8-9, #6 Exhibit 10-12, #7 Exhibit 13-14, #8 Exhibit 21-22, #9 Exhibit 23-27)(Li, Xinlin)
|
November 7, 2016 |
Filing 272
DECLARATION of Steven N. Feldman filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #267 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of T-Mobile's Opposition to Huawei Technologies' Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits Thereto (Li, Xinlin)
|
November 7, 2016 |
Filing 271
DECLARATION of Xinlin Li Morrow filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #250 MOTION for Summary Judgment Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion For Summary Judgment, #267 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of T-Mobile's Opposition to Huawei Technologies' Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits Thereto (Li, Xinlin)
|
November 7, 2016 |
Filing 270
SEALED DOCUMENT Opposition to Huawei Technologies' Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #267 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of T-Mobile's Opposition to Huawei Technologies' Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits Thereto, #250 MOTION for Summary Judgment Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion For Summary Judgment (Li, Xinlin)
|
November 7, 2016 |
Filing 269
DECLARATION of Jason Hayes filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #267 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of T-Mobile's Opposition to Huawei Technologies' Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits Thereto (Li, Xinlin)
|
November 7, 2016 |
Filing 268
DECLARATION of Flavio Rossi filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #267 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of T-Mobile's Opposition to Huawei Technologies' Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits Thereto (Li, Xinlin)
|
November 7, 2016 |
Filing 267
MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of T-Mobile's Opposition to Huawei Technologies' Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits Thereto by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. Noting Date 11/18/2016, (Li, Xinlin)
|
November 7, 2016 |
Filing 266
ORDER granting Plaintiff's #211 Motion to Seal by Judge Richard A Jones. (AD)
|
November 4, 2016 |
***Motion withdrawn: #263 SEALED MOTION to for Relief; re #84 Order ; filed by T-Mobile USA Inc. (RS)
|
November 4, 2016 |
***Motion withdrawn: 263 SEALED MOTION to for Relief; re 84 Order ; filed by T-Mobile USA Inc. (RS)
|
November 3, 2016 |
Filing 265
SEALED DOCUMENT Notice of Withdrawal by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #84 Order, #264 Sealed Document, #263 SEALED MOTION to for Relief; re #84 Order ; (Li, Xinlin)
|
November 1, 2016 |
Filing 264
SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Eric Hayden by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #84 Order, #263 SEALED MOTION to for Relief; re #84 Order ; (Li, Xinlin)
|
November 1, 2016 |
Filing 263
SEALED MOTION to for Relief; re #84 Order ; by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/1/2016, (Li, Xinlin)
|
October 21, 2016 |
Filing 262
SEALED EXHIBIT CC by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc to the Declaration of XinLin Li Morrow in support of T-Mobile's motion for partial summary judgment re #246 Notice of Filing Paper or Physical Materials. Filed in sealed room in Clerk's Office. (RS)
|
October 20, 2016 |
Filing 261
DECLARATION of Alison Plessman filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #245 SEALED MOTION to for Partial Summary Judgment; re #243 MOTION to Seal ; (Li, Xinlin)
|
October 20, 2016 |
Filing 260
DECLARATION of Jessica I. Rothschild In Support of Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #259 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] to #257 SEALED MOTION to Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment, #255 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions Of Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment and Certain Exhibits To The Declaration Of Jessica I. Rothschild, #257 SEALED MOTION to Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment; re #255 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions Of Hua (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 (SEALED), #3 Exhibit 3 (SEALED), #4 Exhibit 4 (SEALED), #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6 (SEALED), #7 Exhibit 7 (SEALED), #8 Exhibit 8 (SEALED), #9 Exhibit 9 (SEALED), #10 Exhibit 10 (SEALED), #11 Exhibit 11 (SEALED), #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19 (SEALED), #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21 (SEALED), #22 Exhibit 22 (SEALED), #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53 (SEALED), #54 Exhibit 54 (SEALED), #55 Exhibit 55 (SEALED), #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64 (SEALED), #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67)(Rothschild, Jessica)
|
October 20, 2016 |
Filing 259
MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] to #257 SEALED MOTION to Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/14/2016, (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
October 20, 2016 |
Filing 258
SEALED DOCUMENT Jessica I. Rothschild Declaration Exhibits 2, 3, 4, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 19, 21, 22, 53, 54, 55 and 64 by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #255 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions Of Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment and Certain Exhibits To The Declaration Of Jessica I. Rothschild, #257 SEALED MOTION to Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment; re #255 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions Of Hua (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 10, #9 Exhibit 11, #10 Exhibit 19, #11 Exhibit 21, #12 Exhibit 22, #13 Exhibit 53, #14 Exhibit 54, #15 Exhibit 55, #16 Exhibit 64)(Rothschild, Jessica)
|
October 20, 2016 |
Filing 257
SEALED MOTION to Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment; re #255 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions Of Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment and Certain Exhibits To The Declaration Of Jessica I. Rothschild ; by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 11/14/2016, (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
October 20, 2016 |
Filing 256
DECLARATION of Michael Flynn-OBrien In Support Of Defendants Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Seal filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #255 MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions Of Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment and Certain Exhibits To The Declaration Of Jessica I. Rothschild (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
October 20, 2016 |
Filing 255
MOTION to Seal Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Seal Certain Portions Of Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment and Certain Exhibits To The Declaration Of Jessica I. Rothschild by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/14/2016, (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
October 20, 2016 |
Filing 254
Redacted MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 11/11/2016, (Li, Xinlin)
|
October 20, 2016 |
Filing 253
DECLARATION of Xu Li In Support Of Defendant Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #250 MOTION for Summary Judgment Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion For Summary Judgment (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
October 20, 2016 |
Filing 252
SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits D-E, H, J-N, O, R-Z, AA-BB, and FF by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #243 MOTION to Seal , #245 SEALED MOTION to for Partial Summary Judgment; re #243 MOTION to Seal ;, #248 Declaration, #249 Exhibit, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E, #2 Exhibit H, #3 Exhibit J, #4 Exhibit K, #5 Exhibit L, #6 Exhibit M, #7 Exhibit N, #8 Exhibit O, #9 Exhibit R, #10 Exhibit S, #11 Exhibit T, #12 Exhibit U, #13 Exhibit V, #14 Exhibit W, #15 Exhibit X, #16 Exhibit Y, #17 Exhibit Z, #18 Exhibit AA, #19 Exhibit BB, #20 Exhibit FF)(Li, Xinlin) Modified on 12/29/2016 to unseal Exhibits D, H, J, T, U, X, and FF pursuant to the Court's #316 Order on the parties' Motions to Seal. (VE)
|
October 20, 2016 |
Filing 251
DECLARATION of Jessica I. Rothschild In Support Of Defendant Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.s Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #250 MOTION for Summary Judgment Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion For Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Rothschild, Jessica)
|
October 20, 2016 |
Filing 250
MOTION for Summary Judgment Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion For Summary Judgment by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/14/2016, (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
October 20, 2016 |
Filing 249
EXHIBIT S A-HH re #245 SEALED MOTION to for Partial Summary Judgment; re #243 MOTION to Seal ;, #248 Declaration by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Li, Xinlin)
|
October 20, 2016 |
Filing 248
DECLARATION of Xinlin Li Morrow filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #245 SEALED MOTION to for Partial Summary Judgment; re #243 MOTION to Seal ; (Li, Xinlin)
|
October 20, 2016 |
Filing 247
DECLARATION of Jason Hayes filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #243 MOTION to Seal (Li, Xinlin)
|
October 20, 2016 |
Filing 246
NOTICE of Filing Exhibit CC to Declaration of Xinlin Li Morrow in Support of T-Mobile's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in Paper or Physical Form with the Clerk's Office by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. inre #245 Sealed Motion. (Li, Xinlin)
|
October 20, 2016 |
Filing 245
SEALED MOTION to for Partial Summary Judgment; re #243 MOTION to Seal ; by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 11/11/2016, (Li, Xinlin)
|
October 20, 2016 |
Filing 244
DECLARATION of Xinlin Li Morrow filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #243 MOTION to Seal (Li, Xinlin)
|
October 20, 2016 |
Filing 243
MOTION to Seal by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. Noting Date 11/11/2016, (Li, Xinlin)
|
October 7, 2016 |
Filing 242
REPLY, filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, TO RESPONSE to #216 SEALED MOTION to Compel; re #211 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of T-Mobile's Motion to Compel and Declaration of Michael Davies, and Exhibits 3-4 and 6-12 to Declaration of Michael Davies, #213 MOTI (Li, Xinlin)
|
October 7, 2016 |
Filing 241
DECLARATION of Jessica Rothschild filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #223 SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of T-Mobile's September 17, 2016 Supplemental Expert Report of Michael A.M. Davies; re #219 MOTION to Seal Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. and Huawei Device USA, Inc.s Motion To (Cordell, Franklin)
|
October 7, 2016 |
Filing 240
REPLY, filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd, TO RESPONSE to #223 SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of T-Mobile's September 17, 2016 Supplemental Expert Report of Michael A.M. Davies; re #219 MOTION to Seal Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. and Huawei Device USA, Inc.s Motion To (Cordell, Franklin)
|
October 3, 2016 |
Filing 239
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, to #223 SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of T-Mobile's September 17, 2016 Supplemental Expert Report of Michael A.M. Davies; re #219 MOTION to Seal Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. and Huawei Device USA, Inc.s Motion To. (Li, Xinlin)
|
October 3, 2016 |
Filing 238
DECLARATION of Michael Flynn-OBrien In Support of #234 Defendants Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. and Huawei Device USA, Inc.s Opposition To T-Mobile USA, Inc.s Motion To Compel filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #213 MOTION to Compel , #216 SEALED MOTION to Compel; re #211 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of T-Mobile's Motion to Compel and Declaration of Michael Davies, and Exhibits 3-4 and 6-12 to Declaration of Michael Davies, #213 MOTI (Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
October 3, 2016 |
Filing 237
DECLARATION of Jiabo Liu In Support of #234 Defendants Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. and Huawei Device USA, Inc.s Opposition To Plaintiff T-Mobile USA, Inc.s Motion To Compel filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #213 MOTION to Compel , #216 SEALED MOTION to Compel; re #211 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of T-Mobile's Motion to Compel and Declaration of Michael Davies, and Exhibits 3-4 and 6-12 to Declaration of Michael Davies, #213 MOTI (Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
October 3, 2016 |
Filing 236
DECLARATION of Li Guo In Support of #234 Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.s Opposition To T-Mobile USA, Inc.s Motion To Compel filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #213 MOTION to Compel , #216 SEALED MOTION to Compel; re #211 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of T-Mobile's Motion to Compel and Declaration of Michael Davies, and Exhibits 3-4 and 6-12 to Declaration of Michael Davies, #213 MOTI (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
October 3, 2016 |
Filing 235
DECLARATION of Timothy C. Bickham In Support of #234 Defendants Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. and Huawei Device USA, Inc.s Opposition To T-Mobiles Motion To Compel filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #213 MOTION to Compel , #216 SEALED MOTION to Compel; re #211 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of T-Mobile's Motion to Compel and Declaration of Michael Davies, and Exhibits 3-4 and 6-12 to Declaration of Michael Davies, #213 MOTI (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
October 3, 2016 |
Filing 234
RESPONSE, by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd, to #213 MOTION to Compel , #216 SEALED MOTION to Compel; re #211 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of T-Mobile's Motion to Compel and Declaration of Michael Davies, and Exhibits 3-4 and 6-12 to Declaration of Michael Davies, #213 MOTI. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
October 3, 2016 |
Reset Deadline: Pursuant to the parties' #231 Stipulated MOTION TO MOVE REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT DEADLINE, the deadline for production of Defendants' technical rebuttal reports is extended from 9/30/2015 to noon Pacific Daylight Time on 10/5/2016. (VE)
|
October 3, 2016 |
Reset Deadline: Pursuant to the parties' 231 Stipulated MOTION TO MOVE REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT DEADLINE, the deadline for production of Defendants' technical rebuttal reports is extended from 9/30/2015 to noon Pacific Daylight Time on 10/5/2016. (VE)
|
September 30, 2016 |
Filing 233
REPLY, filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd, TO RESPONSE to #219 MOTION to Seal Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. and Huawei Device USA, Inc.s Motion To Seal Certain Portions Of Their Motion To Strike and Certain Exhibits 1 and 2 To The Declaration Of Michael Flynn-OBrien (Cordell, Franklin)
|
September 30, 2016 |
Filing 232
NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #218 MOTION Relief from the September 30, 2016, deadline to serve Supplemental Rebuttal Reports from Huawei Experts Drs. Wolfe and Smith re #152 Minute Order ; by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. (Cordell, Franklin)
|
September 30, 2016 |
Filing 231
Stipulated MOTION TO MOVE REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT DEADLINE by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. Noting Date 9/30/2016, (Cordell, Franklin)
|
September 28, 2016 |
Filing 230
DECLARATION of Xinlin Li Morrow re #229 Response to Motion by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc (Li, Xinlin)
|
September 28, 2016 |
Filing 229
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, to #218 MOTION Relief from the September 30, 2016, deadline to serve Supplemental Rebuttal Reports from Huawei Experts Drs. Wolfe and Smith re #152 Minute Order . (Li, Xinlin)
|
September 28, 2016 |
Filing 228
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, to #219 MOTION to Seal Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. and Huawei Device USA, Inc.s Motion To Seal Certain Portions Of Their Motion To Strike and Certain Exhibits 1 and 2 To The Declaration Of Michael Flynn-OBrien. (Li, Xinlin)
|
September 28, 2016 |
Filing 227
RESPONSE, by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd, to #211 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of T-Mobile's Motion to Compel and Declaration of Michael Davies, and Exhibits 3-4 and 6-12 to Declaration of Michael Davies. (Cordell, Franklin)
|
September 26, 2016 |
Filing 226
ORDER re #225 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Li Guo for Huawei Device USA Inc and for Huawei Technologies Co Ltd, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
|
September 26, 2016 |
Filing 225
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Li Guo FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4614383 (Cordell, Franklin)
|
September 23, 2016 |
Filing 224
SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #219 MOTION to Seal Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. and Huawei Device USA, Inc.s Motion To Seal Certain Portions Of Their Motion To Strike and Certain Exhibits 1 and 2 To The Declaration Of Michael Flynn-OBrien, #223 SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of T-Mobile's September 17, 2016 Supplemental Expert Report of Michael A.M. Davies; re #219 MOTION to Seal Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. and Huawei Device USA, Inc.s Motion To (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Michael Flynn-O'Brien ISO Huawei's Motion to Strike (SEALED), #2 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Michael Flynn-O'Brien ISO Huawei's Motion to Strike (SEALED))(Rothschild, Jessica)
|
September 22, 2016 |
Filing 223
SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of T-Mobile's September 17, 2016 Supplemental Expert Report of Michael A.M. Davies; re #219 MOTION to Seal Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. and Huawei Device USA, Inc.s Motion To Seal Certain Portions Of Their Motion To Strike and Certain Exhibits 1 and 2 To The Declaration Of Michael Flynn-OBrien ; by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 10/7/2016, (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
September 22, 2016 |
Filing 222
DECLARATION of Michael Flynn-O'Brien filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #221 MOTION to Exclude Defendants Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. and Huawei Device USA, Inc.s Motion To Strike Portions of T-Mobile's September 17, 2016 Supplemental Expert Report of Michael A.M. Davies (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (REDACTED), #2 Exhibit 2 (REDACTED), #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Rothschild, Jessica)
|
September 22, 2016 |
Filing 221
MOTION to Exclude Defendants Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. and Huawei Device USA, Inc.s Motion To Strike Portions of T-Mobile's September 17, 2016 Supplemental Expert Report of Michael A.M. Davies (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 10/7/2016, (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
September 22, 2016 |
Filing 220
DECLARATION of Michael Flynn-O'Brien filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #219 MOTION to Seal Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. and Huawei Device USA, Inc.s Motion To Seal Certain Portions Of Their Motion To Strike and Certain Exhibits 1 and 2 To The Declaration Of Michael Flynn-OBrien (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Michael Flynn-O'Brien (Redacted), #2 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Michael Flynn-O'Brien (Redacted))(Rothschild, Jessica)
|
September 22, 2016 |
Filing 219
MOTION to Seal Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. and Huawei Device USA, Inc.s Motion To Seal Certain Portions Of Their Motion To Strike and Certain Exhibits 1 and 2 To The Declaration Of Michael Flynn-OBrien by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/30/2016, (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
September 22, 2016 |
Filing 218
MOTION Relief from the September 30, 2016, deadline to serve Supplemental Rebuttal Reports from Huawei Experts Drs. Wolfe and Smith re #152 Minute Order by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Alternative No. 1: [Proposed] Order [Proposed] Order Granting Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. and Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Relief From Deadline Pursuant To Local Civil Rule 7(J), #2 Proposed Order Alternative No. 2: [Proposed] Order Granting Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. and Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Motion For Relief From Deadline Pursuant To Local Civil Rule 7(J)) Noting Date 9/30/2016, (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
September 21, 2016 |
Filing 217
SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Michael Davies and Exhibits 3-4 and 6-12 by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #211 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of T-Mobile's Motion to Compel and Declaration of Michael Davies, and Exhibits 3-4 and 6-12 to Declaration of Michael Davies, #215 Declaration, #213 MOTION to Compel , #216 SEALED MOTION to Compel; re #211 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of T-Mobile's Motion to Compel and Declaration of Michael Davies, and Exhibits 3-4 and 6-12 to Declaration of Michael Davies, #213 MOTI (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit 12)(Li, Xinlin)
|
September 21, 2016 |
Filing 216
SEALED MOTION to Compel; re #211 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of T-Mobile's Motion to Compel and Declaration of Michael Davies, and Exhibits 3-4 and 6-12 to Declaration of Michael Davies, #213 MOTION to Compel ; by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. Noting Date 10/7/2016, (Li, Xinlin)
|
September 21, 2016 |
Filing 215
DECLARATION of Michael A. M. Davies filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #213 MOTION to Compel (Li, Xinlin)
|
September 21, 2016 |
Filing 214
DECLARATION of Xinlin Li Morrow filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #213 MOTION to Compel (Li, Xinlin)
|
September 21, 2016 |
Filing 213
MOTION to Compel by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. Noting Date 10/7/2016, (Li, Xinlin)
|
September 21, 2016 |
Filing 212
DECLARATION of Xinlin Li Morrow filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #211 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of T-Mobile's Motion to Compel and Declaration of Michael Davies, and Exhibits 3-4 and 6-12 to Declaration of Michael Davies (Li, Xinlin)
|
September 21, 2016 |
Filing 211
MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of T-Mobile's Motion to Compel and Declaration of Michael Davies, and Exhibits 3-4 and 6-12 to Declaration of Michael Davies by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. Noting Date 9/30/2016, (Li, Xinlin)
|
August 26, 2016 |
NOTICE TO PARTIES: Based on Huawei's representation that it has produced all clawed-back documents, the Court need not rule on Huawei's claims of privilege for the documents not addressed by the Court's prior 205 Order. (VE)
|
August 26, 2016 |
NOTICE TO PARTIES: Based on Huawei's representation that it has produced all clawed-back documents, the Court need not rule on Huawei's claims of privilege for the documents not addressed by the Court's prior #205 Order. (VE)
|
August 11, 2016 |
Filing 210
ORDER SETTING AMENDED TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES. Length of Trial: To be determined. JURY TRIAL is continued to 2/21/2017 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 13106 before Judge Richard A. Jones. Supplemental Expert Report from T-Mobile Expert Mr. Davies due 9/16/2016, Supplemental Rebuttal Reports from Huawei Experts Drs. Wolfe and Smith due 9/30/2016, Expert discovery completed by 10/14/2016, Dispositive motions due by 10/20/2016, Motions in Limine due by 1/17/2017, Pretrial Order due by 1/30/2017, Trial briefs, proposed jury instructions, proposed voir dire, agreed neutral statement of the case, deposition designations, and trial exhibits due 2/6/2017, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
|
August 6, 2016 |
Filing 209
Agreed Stipulated MOTION To Continue Trial Date and Interim Deadlines by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. Noting Date 8/8/2016, (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
August 5, 2016 |
Filing 208
NOTICE of Lodging ; filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. (Cordell, Franklin)
|
July 29, 2016 |
Filing 207
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING DISPOSITIVE MOTION DEADLINES by parties (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
July 29, 2016 |
Filing 206
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on 7/28/2016 before Judge Richard A. Jones.
<.
< Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/27/2016, (DZ)
|
July 29, 2016 |
Pursuant to the parties' 207 STIPULATION REGARDING DISPOSITIVE MOTION DEADLINES, the deadline for filing dispositive motions is extended to 8/9/2016. Oppositions to dispositive motions are due 8/29/2016. Replies to dispositive motions are due 9/2/2016. All other pretrial deadlines remain unchanged. (VE)
|
July 29, 2016 |
Pursuant to the parties' #207 STIPULATION REGARDING DISPOSITIVE MOTION DEADLINES, the deadline for filing dispositive motions is extended to 8/9/2016. Oppositions to dispositive motions are due 8/29/2016. Replies to dispositive motions are due 9/2/2016. All other pretrial deadlines remain unchanged. (VE)
|
July 28, 2016 |
Filing 205
MINUTE ORDER entered upon the authority of Judge Richard A. Jones. On 7/28/2016, the Court held a telephonic conference addressing numerous issues raised by the Parties' discovery motions. Having heard from the Parties and having reviewed their submissions, the Court memorializes its oral rulings denying #130 Motion for Sanctions; granting in part and denying in part #132 Motion to Compel; granting #134 Motion to Compel; granting #136 Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part #138 Motion to Compel; granting #149 Motion for Leave; granting #163 Motion to Seal; granting in part, denying in part, and reserving in part #179 Motion to Compel; granting #181 Motion to Seal; granting in part, denying in part, and reserving in part #183 Sealed Motion; and granting #190 Motion to Seal. (VE)
|
July 28, 2016 |
Filing 204
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Jones - Dep Clerk: Victoria Ericksen; Pla Counsel: John Hueston, Alison Plessman, Steven Feldman; Def Counsel: James Hibey, Timothy Bickham, Franklin Cordell; CR: Debbie Zurn; TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 7/28/2016. The court hears argument of counsel and rules as follows on the parties' pending motions: Defendants' #130 Motion for Sanctions is DENIED. Defendants' #149 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief is GRANTED. Plaintiff's #132 #138 Motion to Compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants' #134 Motion to Compel is GRANTED. Plaintiff's #179 #183 Second Motion to Compel is GRANTED in part, DENIED in part, and RESERVED in part. The parties' #136 #163 #181 #190 Motions to Seal are GRANTED. (VE)
|
July 21, 2016 |
Filing 203
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Lee Linderman for Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. (Kipling, Michael)
|
July 21, 2016 |
Set Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 7/28/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
|
July 18, 2016 |
Pursuant to the parties' #202 Stipulated MOTION Regarding Scheduling of Depositions Past the Discovery Deadline, the court will permit the parties to conduct depositions beyond the discovery deadline as follows: Ryan Sullivan on July 27; Michael Allan Martin Davies on July 29; Todd Menenberg on August 4; Debra Aron on August 11; Josh Smith on August 23; and Andrew Wolfe on August 26. The trial date and all other pretrial deadlines, including the dispositive motions deadline, remain unchanged. (VE)
|
July 18, 2016 |
Pursuant to the parties' 202 Stipulated MOTION Regarding Scheduling of Depositions Past the Discovery Deadline, the court will permit the parties to conduct depositions beyond the discovery deadline as follows: Ryan Sullivan on July 27; Michael Allan Martin Davies on July 29; Todd Menenberg on August 4; Debra Aron on August 11; Josh Smith on August 23; and Andrew Wolfe on August 26. The trial date and all other pretrial deadlines, including the dispositive motions deadline, remain unchanged. (VE)
|
July 15, 2016 |
Filing 202
Stipulated MOTION Regarding Scheduling of Depositions Past the Discovery Deadline by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. Noting Date 7/15/2016, (Cordell, Franklin)
|
July 13, 2016 |
Filing 201
ORDER re #200 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jeffrey M Theodore for Huawei Device USA Inc and Huawei Technologies Co Ltd, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
|
July 13, 2016 |
Filing 200
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jeffrey M. Theodore FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4522476 (Cordell, Franklin)
|
July 6, 2016 |
Filing 199
SURREPLY filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #183 SEALED MOTION, #179 Redacted MOTION to Compel HUAWEIS INVESTIGATION DOCUMENTS AND CORRESPONDENCE TO: #192 RESPONSE, by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd; TO: #196 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
July 2, 2016 |
Filing 198
NOTICE of Defendants Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Notice of Intent To File Surreply to T-Mobile USA, Inc. re #196 Reply to Response to Motion, #197 Declaration ; filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
July 1, 2016 |
Filing 197
DECLARATION of Steven N. Feldman filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #183 SEALED MOTION, #179 Redacted MOTION to Compel HUAWEIS INVESTIGATION DOCUMENTS AND CORRESPONDENCE (Kipling, Michael)
|
July 1, 2016 |
Filing 196
REPLY, filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, TO RESPONSE to #183 SEALED MOTION, #179 Redacted MOTION to Compel HUAWEIS INVESTIGATION DOCUMENTS AND CORRESPONDENCE (Kipling, Michael)
|
June 28, 2016 |
Filing 195
Supplemental DECLARATION of Steven N. Feldman filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #183 SEALED MOTION, #179 Redacted MOTION to Compel HUAWEIS INVESTIGATION DOCUMENTS AND CORRESPONDENCE (Kipling, Michael)
|
June 27, 2016 |
Filing 194
SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit A to the Declaration Of Michael J. Allan In Support Of Defendants Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.s Opposition To Motion To Compel by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #190 MOTION to Seal Defendants Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.s Motion To File Under Seal Exhibit To The Declaration Of Michael J. Allan, #191 Declaration, (Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
June 27, 2016 |
Filing 193
DECLARATION of Declaration Of Michael J. Allan In Support Of Defendants Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.s Opposition To Motion To Compel filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #183 SEALED MOTION, #179 Redacted MOTION to Compel HUAWEIS INVESTIGATION DOCUMENTS AND CORRESPONDENCE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Public), #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
June 27, 2016 |
Filing 192
RESPONSE, by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd, to #183 SEALED MOTION, #179 Redacted MOTION to Compel HUAWEIS INVESTIGATION DOCUMENTS AND CORRESPONDENCE. (Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
June 27, 2016 |
Filing 191
DECLARATION of Of Jessica I. Rothschild In Support Of Defendants Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Motion To Seal filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #190 MOTION to Seal Defendants Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.s Motion To File Under Seal Exhibit To The Declaration Of Michael J. Allan (Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
June 27, 2016 |
Filing 190
MOTION to Seal Defendants Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.s Motion To File Under Seal Exhibit To The Declaration Of Michael J. Allan by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/15/2016, (Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
June 27, 2016 |
Filing 189
RESPONSE, by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd, to #183 SEALED MOTION, #181 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of Its Motion to Compel. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Huawei's Response, #2 Proposed Order)(Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
June 17, 2016 |
Filing 188
REPLY, filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd, TO RESPONSE to #149 MOTION for Leave Defendants Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.s Motion For Leave To File Supplemental Brief (Attachments: #1 Huawei's Attachment to Reply, #2 Proposed Order)(Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
June 15, 2016 |
Pursuant to the parties' #185 Stipulated MOTION Regarding Scheduling of Depositions Past the Fact Discovery Deadline, Huawei was entitled to take the deposition of Trey Villanueva, and is entitled to take the deposition of Jason Young, and T-Mobile was entitled to take the depositions of Jennifer Ponder, Prachi Kathale, and Jiangao Cui after the 5/18/2016 deadline for completing fact discovery. (VE)
|
June 15, 2016 |
Pursuant to the parties' 185 Stipulated MOTION Regarding Scheduling of Depositions Past the Fact Discovery Deadline, Huawei was entitled to take the deposition of Trey Villanueva, and is entitled to take the deposition of Jason Young, and T-Mobile was entitled to take the depositions of Jennifer Ponder, Prachi Kathale, and Jiangao Cui after the 5/18/2016 deadline for completing fact discovery. (VE)
|
June 14, 2016 |
Filing 187
DECLARATION of Flavio Rossi filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #163 MOTION to Seal Defendants Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.s Motion To File Under Seal An Exhibit To The Declaration of Jessica Rothschild (Walter, Majorie)
|
June 14, 2016 |
Filing 186
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, to #163 MOTION to Seal Defendants Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.s Motion To File Under Seal An Exhibit To The Declaration of Jessica Rothschild. (Walter, Majorie)
|
June 14, 2016 |
Filing 185
Stipulated MOTION Regarding Scheduling of Depositions Past the Fact Discovery Deadline by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/14/2016, (Cordell, Franklin)
|
June 13, 2016 |
Filing 184
SEALED DOCUMENT Feldman Decl ISO MTC Investigation Docs by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #181 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of Its Motion to Compel, #180 Declaration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhs. 4-11)(Walter, Majorie)
|
June 13, 2016 |
Filing 183
SEALED MOTION T-MOBILE USA, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL HUAWEIS INVESTIGATION DOCUMENTS AND CORRESPONDENCE by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #181 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of Its Motion to Compel (Walter, Majorie) Modified on 6/14/2016 to change into a motion (RS).
|
June 13, 2016 |
Filing 182
DECLARATION of Steven N. Feldman filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #181 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of Its Motion to Compel (Walter, Majorie)
|
June 13, 2016 |
Filing 181
MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of Its Motion to Compel by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/1/2016, (Walter, Majorie)
|
June 13, 2016 |
Filing 180
DECLARATION of Steven N. Feldman filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #179 Redacted MOTION to Compel HUAWEIS INVESTIGATION DOCUMENTS AND CORRESPONDENCE (Walter, Majorie)
|
June 13, 2016 |
Filing 179
Redacted MOTION to Compel HUAWEIS INVESTIGATION DOCUMENTS AND CORRESPONDENCE by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/1/2016, (Walter, Majorie)
|
June 13, 2016 |
Filing 178
Second DECLARATION of Ellen Kenney filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #149 MOTION for Leave Defendants Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.s Motion For Leave To File Supplemental Brief (Walter, Majorie)
|
June 13, 2016 |
Filing 177
DECLARATION of Corey Riel filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #149 MOTION for Leave Defendants Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.s Motion For Leave To File Supplemental Brief (Walter, Majorie)
|
June 13, 2016 |
Filing 176
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, to #149 MOTION for Leave Defendants Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.s Motion For Leave To File Supplemental Brief. (Walter, Majorie)
|
June 8, 2016 |
Filing 175
Supplemental DECLARATION of Samuel S. Rubin filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #130 MOTION for Sanctions (Kipling, Michael)
|
June 8, 2016 |
Filing 174
Supplemental DECLARATION of Ellen Kenney filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #130 MOTION for Sanctions (Kipling, Michael)
|
June 8, 2016 |
Filing 173
SURREPLY filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #130 MOTION for Sanctions AND REQUEST TO STRIKE EXTRANEOUS ARGUMENT AND NEW MATERIAL FROM HUAWEIS REPLY BRIEF (Kipling, Michael)
|
June 4, 2016 |
Filing 172
NOTICE of Intent to File Surreply re #130 MOTION for Sanctions , #168 Reply to Response to Motion ; filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. (Li, Xinlin)
|
June 3, 2016 |
Filing 171
Supplemental DECLARATION of Aaron Magley [Dkt. Nos. 168, 170] filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #130 MOTION for Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
June 3, 2016 |
Filing 170
DECLARATION of Aaron Magley [Dkt. No. 168] filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #130 MOTION for Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
June 3, 2016 |
Filing 169
Supplemental DECLARATION of (Second Supplemental) Michael Flynn-O'Brien In Support of Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.s Motion For Sanctions [Dkt. No. 168] and filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #130 MOTION for Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit J, #3 Exhibit K, #4 Exhibit L, #5 Exhibit M, #6 Exhibit N, #7 Exhibit O, #8 Exhibit P, #9 Exhibit Q, #10 Exhibit R)(Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
June 3, 2016 |
Filing 168
REPLY, filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd, TO RESPONSE to #130 MOTION for Sanctions (Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
June 3, 2016 |
Filing 167
DECLARATION of Jessica I. Rothschild In Support Of Defendants Huawei Device USA, Inc. And Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.s Reply In Support Of Defendants Motion To Compel [Dkt. No. 166] and filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #134 MOTION to Compel Defendants Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Compel T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (Lodged Under Seal) See Dkt. Nos. 164, 165)(Rothschild, Jessica)
|
June 3, 2016 |
Filing 166
REPLY, filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd, TO RESPONSE to #134 MOTION to Compel Defendants Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Compel T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rothschild, Jessica)
|
June 3, 2016 |
Filing 165
UNREDACTED SEALED #164 Declaration,, by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
June 3, 2016 |
Filing 164
DECLARATION of Jessica I. Rothschild In Support Of Defendants Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.s Motion To Seal filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #163 MOTION to Seal Defendants Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.s Motion To File Under Seal An Exhibit To The Declaration of Jessica Rothschild (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B (Lodged Under Seal))(Rothschild, Jessica)
|
June 3, 2016 |
Filing 163
MOTION to Seal Defendants Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.s Motion To File Under Seal An Exhibit To The Declaration of Jessica Rothschild by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/17/2016, (Rothschild, Jessica)
|
June 1, 2016 |
Filing 162
ORDER re #161 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Moez M Kaba for T-Mobile USA Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
|
June 1, 2016 |
Filing 161
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Moez M. Kaba FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4470462 (Kipling, Michael)
|
May 31, 2016 |
Filing 160
DECLARATION of Steven N. Feldman filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #134 MOTION to Compel Defendants Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Compel T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Kipling, Michael)
|
May 31, 2016 |
Filing 159
DECLARATION of XINLIN MORROW filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #134 MOTION to Compel Defendants Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Compel T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Kipling, Michael)
|
May 31, 2016 |
Filing 158
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, to #134 MOTION to Compel Defendants Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Compel T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Kipling, Michael)
|
May 31, 2016 |
Filing 157
DECLARATION of Michael E. Kipling filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #130 MOTION for Sanctions (Kipling, Michael)
|
May 31, 2016 |
Filing 156
DECLARATION of Marjorie A. Walter filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #130 MOTION for Sanctions (Kipling, Michael)
|
May 31, 2016 |
Filing 155
DECLARATION of Samuel S. Rubin filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #130 MOTION for Sanctions (Kipling, Michael)
|
May 31, 2016 |
Filing 154
DECLARATION of Ellen Kenney filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #130 MOTION for Sanctions (Kipling, Michael)
|
May 31, 2016 |
Filing 153
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, to #130 MOTION for Sanctions . Oral Argument Requested. (Kipling, Michael)
|
May 31, 2016 |
Filing 152
MINUTE ORDER Regarding Discovery Issues entered upon the authority of Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
|
May 30, 2016 |
Filing 151
DECLARATION of Aaron Magley filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #149 MOTION for Leave Defendants Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.s Motion For Leave To File Supplemental Brief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
May 30, 2016 |
Filing 150
Supplemental DECLARATION of Michael Flynn-OBrien In Support Of Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.s Motion For Sanctions filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #149 MOTION for Leave Defendants Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.s Motion For Leave To File Supplemental Brief, #130 MOTION for Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit J, #3 Exhibit K, #4 Exhibit L)(Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
May 30, 2016 |
Filing 149
MOTION for Leave Defendants Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.s Motion For Leave To File Supplemental Brief by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Defendants Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.s Supplemental Brief In Support of Its Motion For Sanctions (Dkt. No. 130), #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/17/2016, (Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
May 27, 2016 |
Filing 148
DECLARATION of XINLIN LI MORROW filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #132 MOTION to Compel Pursuant to Local Rule 37, #138 Redacted MOTION to Compel (Kipling, Michael)
|
May 27, 2016 |
Filing 147
REPLY, filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, TO RESPONSE to #132 MOTION to Compel Pursuant to Local Rule 37, #138 Redacted MOTION to Compel (Kipling, Michael)
|
May 25, 2016 |
Filing 146
DECLARATION of Alex Xiong In Support Of Huawei's Response (Dkt. No. 145) In Support Of T-Mobile's Motion To Seal (Dkt. 136) filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #136 MOTION to Seal PORTIONS OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL AND SUPPORTING DECLARATION (Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
May 25, 2016 |
Filing 145
RESPONSE, by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd, to #136 MOTION to Seal PORTIONS OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL AND SUPPORTING DECLARATION. (Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
May 24, 2016 |
Filing 144
ERRATA re #143 Declaration by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peng Hu)(Cordell, Franklin)
|
May 23, 2016 |
Filing 143
DECLARATION of Peng Hu filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #132 MOTION to Compel Pursuant to Local Rule 37, #138 Redacted MOTION to Compel (Cordell, Franklin)
|
May 23, 2016 |
Filing 142
DECLARATION of Jessica I. Rothschild filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #132 MOTION to Compel Pursuant to Local Rule 37, #138 Redacted MOTION to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G)(Cordell, Franklin)
|
May 23, 2016 |
Filing 141
RESPONSE, by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd, to #132 MOTION to Compel Pursuant to Local Rule 37, #138 Redacted MOTION to Compel . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cordell, Franklin)
|
May 17, 2016 |
Filing 140
UNREDACTED SEALED #139 Declaration, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc (Kipling, Michael)
|
May 17, 2016 |
Filing 139
Redacted DECLARATION of XINLIN LI MORROW filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #138 Redacted MOTION to Compel (Kipling, Michael)
|
May 17, 2016 |
Filing 138
Redacted MOTION to Compel by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. Noting Date 5/27/2016, (Kipling, Michael)
|
May 17, 2016 |
Filing 137
DECLARATION of Michael E. Kipling filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #136 MOTION to Seal PORTIONS OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL AND SUPPORTING DECLARATION (Kipling, Michael)
|
May 17, 2016 |
Filing 136
MOTION to Seal PORTIONS OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL AND SUPPORTING DECLARATION by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/27/2016, (Kipling, Michael)
|
May 13, 2016 |
Filing 135
DECLARATION of Margaret P. Kammerud In Support Of filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #134 MOTION to Compel Defendants Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Compel T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
May 13, 2016 |
Filing 134
MOTION to Compel Defendants Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Compel T-Mobile USA, Inc. by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/3/2016, (Flynn-O'Brien, Michael)
|
May 13, 2016 |
NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #132 MOTION to Compel Pursuant to Local Rule 37, #133 Declaration : These documents are sealed/restricted per atty phone call as they contain sensitive material. Atty to refile redacted versions. (RS)
|
May 13, 2016 |
NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re 132 MOTION to Compel Pursuant to Local Rule 37, 133 Declaration : These documents are sealed/restricted per atty phone call as they contain sensitive material. Atty to refile redacted versions. (RS)
|
May 12, 2016 |
Filing 133
SEALED DECLARATION of XINLIN LI MORROW filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #132 MOTION to Compel Pursuant to Local Rule 37 (Kipling, Michael) Modified on 5/13/2016 (RS).
|
May 12, 2016 |
Filing 132
SEALED MOTION to Compel Pursuant to Local Rule 37 by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/27/2016, (Kipling, Michael) Modified on 5/13/2016 (RS).
|
May 7, 2016 |
Filing 131
DECLARATION of Michael Flynn-O'Brien filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #130 MOTION for Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Cordell, Franklin)
|
May 7, 2016 |
Filing 130
MOTION for Sanctions by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/3/2016, (Cordell, Franklin)
|
May 6, 2016 |
Filing 129
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Huawei defendants' #110 Motion to Compel by Judge Richard A Jones.(PM)
|
May 3, 2016 |
Filing 128
REPLY BRIEF T-MOBILE'S OBJECTIONS & RESPONSES TO DEFS' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF ISO DEFS' MOTION TO COMPEL re #122 Brief by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. (Kipling, Michael)
|
April 29, 2016 |
Filing 127
ORDER re #125 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Steven N Feldman for T-Mobile USA Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
|
April 29, 2016 |
Filing 126
ORDER re #124 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jennifer Bunn Hayden for T-Mobile USA Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
|
April 29, 2016 |
Filing 125
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Steven N. Feldman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4433174 (Kipling, Michael)
|
April 29, 2016 |
Filing 124
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jennifer Bunn Hayden FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4433156 (Kipling, Michael)
|
April 28, 2016 |
Filing 123
DECLARATION of Margaret P. Kammerud filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #110 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cordell, Franklin)
|
April 28, 2016 |
Filing 122
Supplemental BRIEF re #110 MOTION to Compel by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd (Cordell, Franklin)
|
April 28, 2016 |
Filing 121
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION OF HELEN LIJINGRU by parties (Kipling, Michael)
|
April 28, 2016 |
Pursuant to the parties' 121 STIPULATION REGARDING DEPOSITION OF HELEN LIJINGRU, T-Mobile shall be entitled to take the deposition of Helen Lijingru ("Ms. Li") upon her return from maternity leave in or around June 2016. (VE)
|
April 28, 2016 |
Pursuant to the parties' #121 STIPULATION REGARDING DEPOSITION OF HELEN LIJINGRU, T-Mobile shall be entitled to take the deposition of Helen Lijingru ("Ms. Li") upon her return from maternity leave in or around June 2016. (VE)
|
April 20, 2016 |
Filing 120
ORDER granting defendants' #85 Motion for Protective Order by Judge Richard A Jones. (AD)
|
April 13, 2016 |
Reset Deadlines: Based on the communication of counsel with court staff, the Court resets the following pretrial deadlines: Initial Expert Witness Reports due by 5/11/2016, Fact Discovery completed by 5/18/2016. All other deadlines remain the same. (VE)
|
April 6, 2016 |
Filing 119
ORDER re #118 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael E. Flynn-O'Brien for Huawei Device USA Inc., and for Huawei Technologies Co Ltd., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
|
April 6, 2016 |
Filing 118
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael E. Flynn-O'Brien FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4403071 (Cordell, Franklin)
|
March 25, 2016 |
Filing 117
DECLARATION of Jessica I. Rothschild filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #110 MOTION to Compel (Cordell, Franklin)
|
March 25, 2016 |
Filing 116
REPLY, filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd, TO RESPONSE to #110 MOTION to Compel (Cordell, Franklin)
|
March 23, 2016 |
Filing 115
ORDER re #114 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael J. Allan for Huawei Device USA Inc. and for Huawei Technologies Co Ltd, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
|
March 23, 2016 |
Added Attorneys William F. Abrams, James Hibey, Timothy C. Bickham, and Jessica I. Rothschild for defendant Huawei Technologies Co Ltd per 53 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
|
March 23, 2016 |
Added Attorneys William F. Abrams, James Hibey, Timothy C. Bickham, and Jessica I. Rothschild for defendant Huawei Technologies Co Ltd per #53 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
|
March 22, 2016 |
Filing 114
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael J. Allan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4386124 (Cordell, Franklin)
|
March 21, 2016 |
Filing 113
DECLARATION of Ellen Kenney filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #110 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Li, Xinlin)
|
March 21, 2016 |
Filing 112
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, to #110 MOTION to Compel . (Li, Xinlin)
|
March 10, 2016 |
Filing 111
DECLARATION of Jessica I. Rothschild filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #110 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Cordell, Franklin)
|
March 10, 2016 |
Filing 110
MOTION to Compel by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/25/2016, (Cordell, Franklin)
|
February 8, 2016 |
Filing 109
ORDER re #108 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Margaret P Kammerud for Huawei Device USA Inc, and for Huawei Technologies Co Ltd, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
|
February 8, 2016 |
Filing 108
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Margaret P. Kammerud FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4330348 (Cordell, Franklin)
|
January 20, 2016 |
Filing 107
ORDER denying OptoFidelity's #92 Motion to Quash; granting Huawei USA's #96 Motion for issuance of letters of request by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
|
December 22, 2015 |
Filing 106
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #105 Minute Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates (Service of corrected image is attached). (VE)
|
December 22, 2015 |
Filing 105
MINUTE ORDER SETTING AMENDED TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES. Length of Trial: To be determined. To accommodate the parties' request, the Court adjusts the trial date and pretrial deadlines as follows: JURY TRIAL is reset for 10/31/2016 at 9:00 AM before Judge Richard A. Jones. Amended Pleadings due by 5/4/2016, Fact Discovery completed by 5/4/2016, Expert Discovery completed by 7/5/2016, Dispositive motions due by 8/2/2016, Motions in Limine due by 10/3/2016, Pretrial Order due by 10/17/2016, Trial briefs, proposed jury instructions, proposed voir dire, agreed neutral statement of the case, deposition designations, and trial exhibits to be submitted by 10/24/2016, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Main Document 105 replaced on 12/22/2015) (VE).
|
December 17, 2015 |
Filing 104
REPLY, filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc, TO RESPONSE to #96 MOTION Issuance of Letters of Request (Cordell, Franklin)
|
December 16, 2015 |
Filing 103
REPLY, filed by Interested Party OptoFidelity, LLC, TO RESPONSE to #92 MOTION to Quash (RS)
|
December 16, 2015 |
Filing 102
RESPONSE, by Interested Party OptoFidelity, LLC, to #96 MOTION Issuance of Letters of Request . (RS)
|
December 14, 2015 |
Filing 101
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, to #96 MOTION Issuance of Letters of Request . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hayden, Eric)
|
December 14, 2015 |
Filing 100
MINUTE ORDER SETTING AMENDED TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES. Length of Trial: To be determined. JURY TRIAL is continued to 10/11/2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 13106 before Judge Richard A. Jones. Amended Pleadings due by 4/14/2016, Fact Discovery completed by 4/14/2016, Expert Discovery completed by 6/13/2016, Dispositive motions due by 7/13/2016, Motions in Limine due by 9/13/2016, Pretrial Order due by 9/27/2016, Trial briefs, proposed jury instructions, proposed voir dire, agreed neutral statement of the case, deposition designations, and trial exhibits to be submitted by 10/4/2016, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
|
December 11, 2015 |
Filing 99
REQUEST by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc for JOINT REQUEST TO MODIFY ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES (Kipling, Michael)
|
December 8, 2015 |
Filing 98
RESPONSE, by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc, to #92 MOTION to Quash. (Cordell, Franklin)
|
December 3, 2015 |
Filing 97
DECLARATION of Michael Stoll filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #96 MOTION Issuance of Letters of Request (Cordell, Franklin)
|
December 3, 2015 |
Filing 96
MOTION Issuance of Letters of Request by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/18/2015, (Cordell, Franklin)
|
December 2, 2015 |
Filing 95
ORDER re #94 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael E. Stoll for Huawei Device USA Inc., and for Huawei Technologies Co Ltd, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
|
December 1, 2015 |
Filing 94
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael E. Stoll FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4250117 (Cordell, Franklin)
|
November 30, 2015 |
Filing 93
AFFIDAVIT of Hans Kuosmanen filed by Interested Party OptoFidelity, LLC re #92 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Produce Documents. (PM)
|
November 30, 2015 |
Filing 92
MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Produce Documents by Interested Party OptoFidelity, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noted by Clerk for 12/11/2015. (PM)
|
November 6, 2015 |
Filing 91
REPLY, filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd, TO RESPONSE to #85 MOTION for Protective Order (Cordell, Franklin)
|
November 4, 2015 |
Filing 90
DECLARATION of Jason Hayes filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #85 MOTION for Protective Order (Kipling, Michael)
|
November 4, 2015 |
Filing 89
DECLARATION of Lee Linderman filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #85 MOTION for Protective Order (Kipling, Michael)
|
November 4, 2015 |
Filing 88
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, to #85 MOTION for Protective Order . (Kipling, Michael)
|
October 29, 2015 |
Filing 87
DECLARATION of Jessica I. Rothschild filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #85 MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(Cordell, Franklin)
|
October 29, 2015 |
Filing 86
DECLARATION of Richard Yao filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #85 MOTION for Protective Order (Cordell, Franklin)
|
October 29, 2015 |
Filing 85
MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/6/2015, (Cordell, Franklin)
|
September 11, 2015 |
Filing 84
AMENDED STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
|
September 8, 2015 |
Filing 83
AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER for treatment of inadvertently produced privileged materials by Judge Richard A Jones. (RS)
|
September 3, 2015 |
Filing 82
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER FOR TREATMENT OF INADVERTENTLY PRODUCED PRIVILEGED MATERIALS PURSUANT TO FED. R. EVID. 502(D) (AMENDED) by parties (Kipling, Michael)
|
September 3, 2015 |
Filing 81
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY (AMENDED) by parties (Kipling, Michael)
|
August 28, 2015 |
Filing 80
ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by Huawei Technologies Co Ltd.(Cordell, Franklin)
|
August 28, 2015 |
Filing 79
ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by Huawei Device USA Inc.(Cordell, Franklin)
|
July 14, 2015 |
Filing 78
ORDER denying Huawei Device USA's #65 MOTION to Compel and for Protective Order and denying Huawei Technologies' #69 MOTION for Protective Order To Stay Discovery, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
|
July 14, 2015 |
Filing 77
ORDER by Judge Richard A. Jones. The court GRANTS Huawei USA's #32 Motion to Dismiss in part and denies it in part, dismissing only T-Mobile's CPA claim. The court GRANTS Huawei China's #54 Motion to Dismiss in part and denies it in part, dismissing only T-Mobile's tortious interference claim without prejudice. (VE)
|
June 26, 2015 |
Filing 76
REPLY, filed by Defendant Huawei Technologies Co Ltd, TO RESPONSE to #69 MOTION for Protective Order To Stay Discovery (Cordell, Franklin)
|
June 26, 2015 |
Filing 75
REPLY, filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc, TO RESPONSE to #65 MOTION to Compel and for Protective Order (Cordell, Franklin)
|
June 24, 2015 |
Filing 74
PRAECIPE to attach document (Amended to include signature) re #73 Response to Motion by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc (Kipling, Michael)
|
June 24, 2015 |
Filing 73
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, to #69 MOTION for Protective Order To Stay Discovery. (Kipling, Michael)
|
June 22, 2015 |
Filing 72
DECLARATION of Lee Linderman filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #65 MOTION to Compel and for Protective Order (Kipling, Michael)
|
June 22, 2015 |
Filing 71
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, to #65 MOTION to Compel and for Protective Order. (Kipling, Michael)
|
June 18, 2015 |
Filing 70
DECLARATION of Jessica I. Rothschild filed by Defendant Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #69 MOTION for Protective Order To Stay Discovery (Cordell, Franklin)
|
June 18, 2015 |
Filing 69
MOTION for Protective Order To Stay Discovery by Defendant Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/26/2015, (Cordell, Franklin)
|
June 15, 2015 |
Filing 68
SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Huawei Technologies Co Ltd on 3/30/2015 Xiaowu Zhang accepted service (Kipling, Michael)
|
June 12, 2015 |
Filing 67
NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #65 MOTION to Compel and for Protective Order. Filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. Noting Date 6/26/2015, (Cordell, Franklin)
|
June 11, 2015 |
Filing 66
DECLARATION of Jessica I. Rothschild filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #65 MOTION to Compel and for Protective Order (Cordell, Franklin)
|
June 11, 2015 |
Filing 65
MOTION to Compel and for Protective Order by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/19/2015, (Cordell, Franklin)
|
May 22, 2015 |
Filing 64
ORDER re #62 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Xinlin Li for T-Mobile USA Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(LMK)
|
May 22, 2015 |
Filing 63
ORDER re #61 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Lee Linderman for T-Mobile USA Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(LMK)
|
May 21, 2015 |
Filing 62
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Xinlin Li FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4025999 (Kipling, Michael)
|
May 21, 2015 |
Filing 61
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Lee Linderman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4025993 (Kipling, Michael)
|
May 19, 2015 |
***Motion terminated: #60 Stipulated MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO WITHDRAW ERIC HAYDEN DECLARATION [DKT. 57] filed by Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. The court grants the parties' stipulation, and will not consider the Declaration of Erik Hayden, which will remain under seal. Dkt. #57 . The court will instead rely on the parties' stipulation of facts. (VE)
|
May 19, 2015 |
***Motion terminated: 60 Stipulated MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO WITHDRAW ERIC HAYDEN DECLARATION [DKT. 57] filed by Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. The court grants the parties' stipulation, and will not consider the Declaration of Erik Hayden, which will remain under seal. Dkt. # 57 . The court will instead rely on the parties' stipulation of facts. (VE)
|
May 18, 2015 |
Filing 60
Stipulated MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO WITHDRAW ERIC HAYDEN DECLARATION [DKT. 57] by Defendant Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation of Facts) Noting Date 5/18/2015, (Cordell, Franklin)
|
May 15, 2015 |
Filing 59
REPLY, filed by Defendant Huawei Technologies Co Ltd, TO RESPONSE to #54 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) (Cordell, Franklin)
|
May 13, 2015 |
Filing 58
NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Michael E Kipling. Filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. (Kipling, Michael) Modified Address on 5/13/2015 (DS).
|
May 13, 2015 |
At the joint telephonic request of all parties, the court places the Declaration of Eric J. Hayden (Dkt. # 57 ) under seal. This action is not a ruling on the merits of the request to seal the document. No later than Monday, May 18, the proponent of sealing the document shall file a motion to seal (or stipulated motion to seal, if all parties are in agreement). If the motion is not timely filed, the court will unseal the document. (VE)
|
May 13, 2015 |
At the joint telephonic request of all parties, the court places the Declaration of Eric J. Hayden (Dkt. #57 ) under seal. This action is not a ruling on the merits of the request to seal the document. No later than Monday, May 18, the proponent of sealing the document shall file a motion to seal (or stipulated motion to seal, if all parties are in agreement). If the motion is not timely filed, the court will unseal the document. (VE)
|
May 11, 2015 |
Filing 57
DECLARATION of Eric J. Hayden filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #54 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) (Kipling, Michael)
|
May 11, 2015 |
Filing 56
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, to #54 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6). Oral Argument Requested. (Kipling, Michael)
|
May 4, 2015 |
Noting Date Set/Reset re 32 Huawei Device USA, Inc's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) : Noting Date 5/15/2015. Noting date reset to correspond to noting date of Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.s' later-filed motion to dismiss (Dkt. # 54 ) which makes many of the same arguments. (VE)
|
May 4, 2015 |
Noting Date Set/Reset re #32 Huawei Device USA, Inc's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) : Noting Date 5/15/2015. Noting date reset to correspond to noting date of Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.s' later-filed motion to dismiss (Dkt. #54 ) which makes many of the same arguments. (VE)
|
April 22, 2015 |
Filing 55
DECLARATION of Lily Xu filed by Defendant Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #54 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) (Cordell, Franklin)
|
April 22, 2015 |
Filing 54
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) by Defendant Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8) Noting Date 5/15/2015, (Cordell, Franklin)
|
April 22, 2015 |
Filing 53
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Franklin Dennis Cordell on behalf of Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. (Cordell, Franklin)
|
April 21, 2015 |
Filing 52
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones. The court TERMINATES Huawei Technologies' #50 motion to dismiss. Huawei Technologies shall file nothing further until it enters a notice of appearance. SEE MINUTE ORDER FOR FURTHER INSTRUCTION.(LMK)
|
April 20, 2015 |
Filing 51
DECLARATION of Lily Xu filed by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd re #50 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint under FRCP 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) (Cordell, Franklin)
|
April 20, 2015 |
Filing 50
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint under FRCP 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) by Defendants Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/15/2015, (Cordell, Franklin)
|
April 20, 2015 |
Filing 49
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Huawei Investment & Holding Co., Ltd. for Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Huawei Technologies Co Ltd (Cordell, Franklin)
|
March 31, 2015 |
Filing 48
STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR TREATMENT OF INADVERTENTLY PRODUCED PRIVILEGED MATERIALS PURSUANT TO FED. R. EVID. 502(D) by Judge Richard A Jones. (RS)
|
March 31, 2015 |
Filing 47
STIPULATION AND ORDER RE ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY by Judge Richard A Jones. (RS)
|
March 24, 2015 |
Filing 46
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER FOR TREATMENT OF INADVERTENTLY PRODUCED PRIVILEGED MATERIALS PURSUANT TO FED. R. EVID. 502(D) by parties (Kipling, Michael)
|
March 24, 2015 |
Filing 45
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY by parties (Kipling, Michael)
|
February 27, 2015 |
No action necessary on 44 stipulation to withdraw and substitute counsel. Change of law firms for Plaintiff's counsel is already reflected on docket. (VE)
|
February 27, 2015 |
No action necessary on #44 stipulation to withdraw and substitute counsel. Change of law firms for Plaintiff's counsel is already reflected on docket. (VE)
|
February 25, 2015 |
Filing 44
STIPULATION RE WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by parties (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kipling, Michael)
|
January 12, 2015 |
Filing 43
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Kevin Kiley for Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. (Kipling, Michael)
|
January 12, 2015 |
Filing 42
NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Michael E Kipling. Filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. (Kipling, Michael) Modified Addresses of PHV Attorney's on 1/12/2015 (DS).
|
January 6, 2015 |
Filing 41
MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES. Length of Trial: To be determined. JURY TRIAL is set for 6/20/2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 13106 before Judge Richard A. Jones. Joinder of Parties due by 4/1/2015, Amended Pleadings due by 12/23/2015, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 12/23/2015, Discovery completed by 2/22/2016, Dispositive motions due by 3/22/2016, Motions in Limine due by 5/23/2016, Pretrial Order due by 6/6/2016, Trial briefs, proposed jury instructions, proposed voir dire, agreed neutral statement of the case, deposition designations, and trial exhibits to be submitted by 6/13/2016, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
|
December 15, 2014 |
Filing 40
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 5-7. (Kipling, Michael)
|
December 11, 2014 |
Filing 39
ORDER denying dfts' #33 Motion to Seal; granting dfts' #29 Motion to Seal; The clerk shall UNSEAL the documents at docket numbers 32-6, 32-7, and 32-8 by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
|
November 21, 2014 |
Filing 38
REPLY, filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc, TO RESPONSE to #32 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (Cordell, Franklin)
|
November 17, 2014 |
Filing 37
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, to #32 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). Oral Argument Requested. (Kipling, Michael)
|
November 5, 2014 |
Filing 36
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, to #33 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 6, 7 and 8 to Motion to Dismiss Complaint (Dkt. 32), #29 MOTION to Seal Certain Exhibits to the Declaration of Franklin D. Cordell. (Kipling, Michael)
|
October 30, 2014 |
Filing 35
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/1/2014, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/8/2014, Joint Status Report due by 12/15/2014, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
|
October 28, 2014 |
Filing 34
DECLARATION of Franklin D. Cordell filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #33 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 6, 7 and 8 to Motion to Dismiss Complaint (Dkt. 32) (Cordell, Franklin)
|
October 28, 2014 |
Filing 33
MOTION to Seal Exhibits 6, 7 and 8 to Motion to Dismiss Complaint (Dkt. 32) by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/7/2014, (Cordell, Franklin)
|
October 27, 2014 |
Filing 32
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 5 Redacted, #6 SEALED Exhibit 6, #7 SEALED Exhibit 7, #8SEALED Exhibit 8, #9 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/21/2014, (Cordell, Franklin) Modified on 10/28/2014 to seal per atty call. Motion to seal these exhibits forthcoming (RS). Modified on 12/11/2014 to unseal exhibits 6-8 per order (RS).
|
October 27, 2014 |
Filing 31
UNREDACTED SEALED #29 MOTION to Seal Certain Exhibits to the Declaration of Franklin D. Cordell, by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc (Cordell, Franklin)
|
October 27, 2014 |
Filing 30
DECLARATION of Franklin D. Cordell filed by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc re #29 MOTION to Seal Certain Exhibits to the Declaration of Franklin D. Cordell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4 (redacted), #2 Exhibit 5 (redacted))(Cordell, Franklin)
|
October 27, 2014 |
Filing 29
MOTION to Seal Certain Exhibits to the Declaration of Franklin D. Cordell by Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/7/2014, (Cordell, Franklin)
|
October 23, 2014 |
Filing 28
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Huawei Device USA Inc (Cordell, Franklin)
|
October 21, 2014 |
Filing 27
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on J. Lapinid, Process Specialist, CT Corp. on 10/13/2014, filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. (Kipling, Michael)
|
October 21, 2014 |
Filing 26
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on M. Rowe, Office Asst for Registered Agent on 10/10/2014, filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. (Kipling, Michael)
|
October 10, 2014 |
Filing 25
Summons Issued as to defendant(s) Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(LMK)
|
October 9, 2014 |
Filing 24
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Kipling, Michael)
|
September 26, 2014 |
Filing 23
ORDER re #18 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney William F. Abrams for Huawei Device USA Inc, by William M. McCool. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d)). (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(LMK)
|
September 26, 2014 |
Filing 22
ORDER re #19 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Timothy C. Bickham for Huawei Device USA Inc, by William M. McCool.(NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d)).(No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(LMK)
|
September 26, 2014 |
Filing 21
ORDER re #17 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jessica I. Rothschild for Huawei Device USA Inc, by William M. McCool. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d)). (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
|
September 26, 2014 |
Filing 20
ORDER re #16 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney James Hibey for Huawei Device USA Inc, by William M. McCool. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d)). (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
|
September 25, 2014 |
Filing 19
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Timothy C. Bickham FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3752090 (Cordell, Franklin)
|
September 25, 2014 |
Filing 18
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY William F. Abrams FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3752087 (Cordell, Franklin)
|
September 25, 2014 |
Filing 17
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jessica I. Rothschild FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3752078 (Cordell, Franklin)
|
September 25, 2014 |
Filing 16
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY James F. Hibey FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3752060 (Cordell, Franklin)
|
September 25, 2014 |
Filing 15
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Franklin Dennis Cordell on behalf of Defendant Huawei Device USA Inc. (Cordell, Franklin)
|
September 24, 2014 |
Filing 14
Summons Issued as to defendant(s) Huawei Technologies Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(TM)
|
September 23, 2014 |
Filing 13
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc (Attachments: #1 Summons Huawei Technologies, #2 Summons Huawei Technologies c/o CT Corp. WA, #3 Summons Huawei Technologies c/o CT Corp. CA)(Kipling, Michael)
|
September 15, 2014 |
Filing 12
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Michele Rowe, Office Assistant for Registered Agent CT Corporation Systems on 9/5/2014, filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. (Kipling, Michael)
|
September 3, 2014 |
Filing 11
Summons electronically issued as to defendant(s) Huawei Device USA Inc. (RE)
|
September 3, 2014 |
Filing 10
ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kevin Kiley for T-Mobile USA, Inc., by William M. McCool. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d)).(No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
|
September 3, 2014 |
Filing 9
ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS ATtorney John C. Hueston for T-Mobile USA, Inc., by William M. McCool. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d)). (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
|
September 3, 2014 |
Filing 8
ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Eric Hayden for T-Mobile USA, Inc., by William M. McCool. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d)).(No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
|
September 3, 2014 |
Filing 7
ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Alison Plessman for T-Mobile USA, Inc., by William M. McCool. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d)). (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
|
September 3, 2014 |
Filing 6
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kevin Kiley FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3724296 (Kipling, Michael)
|
September 3, 2014 |
Filing 5
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John C. Hueston FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3724275 (Kipling, Michael)
|
September 3, 2014 |
Filing 4
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Eric Hayden FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3724264 (Kipling, Michael)
|
September 3, 2014 |
Filing 3
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Alison Plessman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3724253 (Kipling, Michael)
|
September 3, 2014 |
Judge Richard A Jones added. (RE)
|
September 2, 2014 |
Filing 2
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc. for T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Kipling, Michael)
|
September 2, 2014 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-3723756) Attorney Michael E Kipling added to party T-Mobile USA, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kipling, Michael)
|
September 2, 2014 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-3723756) Attorney Michael E Kipling added to party T-Mobile USA, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Kipling, Michael)
|