Verasonics, Inc. v. Alpinion Medical Systems Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff: Verasonics, Inc.
Defendant: Alpinion Medical Systems Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2014cv01820
Filed: November 26, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 42 Motion to confirm the final arbitration award and amend judgment. The June 7, 2017 final award in Verasonics, Inc. v. Alpinion Medical Systems Co., Ltd., ICDR No. 01-15-0002-9484 in the American Arbitration Asso ciation, as modified by the disposition of application for modification of award from the arbitration dated June 26, 2017, is CONFIRMED. The Court ORDERS Alpinion to comply with the terms of the final award. Clerk is directed to amend the judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 32 Motion to confirm arbitration award. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiff's 34 Motion to Seal by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verasonics, Inc. v. Alpinion Medical Systems Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpinion Medical Systems Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verasonics, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan M. Lloyd
Represented By: Eric S. Walters(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Erica D. Wilson(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?