Page et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Paul Page and Susan Page
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Asbestos Corp., Ltd, BW/IP Inc., CBS Corporation, Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Fraser's Boiler Service, Inc., General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., Ingersoll Rand Company, Lockheed Shipbuilding Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Saberhagen Holdings, Inc., Sepco Corporation, The William Powell Company, Uniroyal, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC and Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2014cv01853
Filed: December 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Kitsap
Presiding Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 175 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Parties' 174 Stipulation. All claims against Sepco Corporation only are dismissed without prejudice and without costs as to any party. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER directing Plaintiff Susan Page to inform the court of the status of Sepco's bankruptcy and whether the court should maintain the stay. The court further ORDERS Ms. Page to file her response to this order with ten days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER directing Plaintiff Susan Page to inform the court of the status of Sepco's bankruptcy and whether the court should maintain the stay. Response due within seven days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 168 Stipulation of Dismissal of Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation is dismissed with prejudice and without costs, reserving to plaintiffs all of plaintiffs' rights of action against all other persons, corporations, or entities. The parties also agree that this order may be presented without further notice of presentation. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company re parties' 165 Stipulation, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (Metropolitan Life Insurance Company terminated.)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting 162 Stipulated Motion for dismissal Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant IMO Industries, Inc. with prejudice and without costs. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing all claims against Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC with prejudice per 160 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal of Defendant Saberhagen Holdings, Inc. re parties' 153 Stipulation, by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge James L. Robart dismissing with prejudice all claims against Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. f/k/a Atwood & Morrill. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Page et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Page
Represented By: Thomas J. Breen
Represented By: Kristin M Houser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Page
Represented By: Thomas J. Breen
Represented By: Kristin M Houser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Barry Neal Mesher
Represented By: Brian D Zeringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asbestos Corp., Ltd
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP Inc.
Represented By: Christine E Dinsdale
Represented By: Michael Ryan O'Clair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: R Dirk Bernhardt
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.
Represented By: Barry Neal Mesher
Represented By: Brian D Zeringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: R Dirk Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fraser's Boiler Service, Inc.
Represented By: Carl Edward Forsberg
Represented By: William Chris Gibson
Represented By: Melissa K Roeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: R Dirk Bernhardt
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc.
Represented By: Christine E Dinsdale
Represented By: Michael Ryan O'Clair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: James Edward Horne
Represented By: Michael Edward Ricketts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll Rand Company
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Shipbuilding Company
Represented By: Robert Gregory Andre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard G Gawlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saberhagen Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Kost Thorson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sepco Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey M Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The William Powell Company
Represented By: Daniel Ruttenberg
Represented By: J. Scott Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniroyal, Inc.
Represented By: Chris Robert Youtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Allen Eraut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.
Represented By: Dana C Kopij
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?