Mendis v. Schneider National Carriers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mendis, Balapuwaduge Mendis, Michael Feola, Andrea Arbaugh and Edward Ash
Defendant: Schneider National Carriers, Inc. and Schneider National Carriers Inc
Intervenor Plaintiff: Washington State Department of Labor & Industries and Washington State Attorney General's Office
Case Number: 2:2015cv00144
Filed: January 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour; CRD: Paul Pierson; Plaintiffs' Counsel: Greg Wolk & Erika Nusser; Defense Counsel: Michael Phillips; Court Reporter: Nancy Bauer; Time of Hearing: 9:00 a.m.; Courtroom: 16206;Motion Hearing was held on 11/13/2018 re #190 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed plaintiffs. Court confirmed that there were no objectors present for the proceeding and executed the order granting approval. (PP)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #190 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 195 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #190 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Amended) (Nusser, Erika)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 194 Supplemental DECLARATION of Melinda Yang filed by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #190 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Nusser, Erika)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 193 DECLARATION of Melinda Yang on behalf of Settlement Administrator with Respect to Notification of Class Action Lawsuit filed by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #190 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Nusser, Erika)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 192 DECLARATION of Gregory A. Wolk filed by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #190 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Nusser, Erika)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 191 DECLARATION of Erika L. Nusser filed by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #190 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Nusser, Erika)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs , filed by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/13/2018, (Nusser, Erika)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER re Plaintiffs' #185 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Deadline to mail notice to Class Members is within 59 days after entry of this order. Deadline for Settlement Class Members to submit exclusion requests or objections is within 30 days of the date that Settlement Notices are sent, pursuant to the Notice Plan. Deadline for the Parties to submit any responses to objections is within 35 days of the date that Settlement Notices are sent, pursuant to the Notice Plan. Deadline for Class Counsel to file motion requesting final approval and award of attorneys' fees and costs is within 14 days of the date that Settlement Notices are sent, pursuant to the Notice Plan. The Final Approval Hearing is scheduled for November 13, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 188 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis, TO RESPONSE to #185 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Nusser, Erika)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 187 NOTICE OF PROPOSED CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CLASS ACTION FAIRNESS ACT, 28 U.S.C. 1715 ; filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc. (Kane, Matthew)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 186 DECLARATION of Erika L. Nusser filed by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #185 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Nusser, Erika)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement , filed by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/27/2018, (Nusser, Erika)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MINUTE ORDER re parties' #183 Joint Status Report. The Court ORDERS that within fourteen (14) days from the entry of this Order the parties file another joint status report if Plaintiffs have not yet filed a motion for preliminary approval of the settlement. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis (Nusser, Erika)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' #181 Stipulated Motion; directing Clerk to update the caption to remove Washington as Plaintiff-Intervenor. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT) (Washington State Attorney General's Office and Washington State Department of Labor & Industries terminated)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 181 Stipulated MOTION For State of Washington to Withdraw as Intervenor, filed by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis. Noting Date 5/22/2018, (Wolk, Greg)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MINUTE ORDER re parties' #179 Joint notice of settlement and request regarding pending motions and pre-trial and trial-related dates. Defendant's pending motions for partial summary judgment (Dkt. No. #146 ) and decertification (Dkt. No. #153 ) are held in ABEYANCE in anticipation of a proposed class action settlement. The motions will be deemed withdrawn without prejudice in the event the Court grants final approval of the proposed settlement. All remaining pre-trial and trial deadlines and dates are stricken and/or vacated. Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to file a motion for preliminary approval of the proposed class action settlement not later than 45 days from the date of this order. If Plaintiffs fail to do so, the parties shall file a joint status report to the Court by this date. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 NOTICE of Settlement AND REQUEST REGARDING PENDING MOTIONS AND TRIAL-RELATED DATES AND DEADLINES by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc (Kane, Matthew)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 178 STATEMENT Pre-Trial Statement by Intervenor Plaintiffs Washington State Attorney General's Office, Washington State Department of Labor & Industries (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sandstrom, Anastasia)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' #144 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 176 Supplemental DECLARATION of Matthew C. Kane filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc re #153 MOTION Decertify Class Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(c) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K, #2 Exhibit L, #3 Exhibit M, #4 Exhibit N, #5 Exhibit O)(Kane, Matthew)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 REPLY, filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc, TO RESPONSE to #153 MOTION Decertify Class Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(c) (Kane, Matthew)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 174 DECLARATION of Michael R. Phillips filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc re #144 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Kane, Matthew)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 SURREPLY filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc re #144 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Kane, Matthew)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting State of Washington's #152 Motion to Intervene signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 171 SEALED DOCUMENT (Exhibit 2 to Erika L. Nusser Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Decertify) by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #24 Protective Order, #169 Declaration, (Nusser, Erika)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 SEALED DOCUMENT (Exhibit 1 to Erika L. Nusser Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Decertify) by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #24 Protective Order, #169 Declaration, (Nusser, Erika)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 DECLARATION of Erika L. Nusser filed by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #153 MOTION Decertify Class Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(c) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Nusser, Erika)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis, to #153 MOTION Decertify Class Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(c) . (Nusser, Erika)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 NOTICE Of Intent To File A Surreply Pursuant To LCR 7(G) In Further Opposition To Plaintiffs Reply In Support Of Motion For Partial Summary Judgment re #162 Reply to Response to Motion ; filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc. (Kane, Matthew)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 RESPONSE, by Interested Parties Washington State Attorney General's Office, Washington State Department of Labor & Industries, to #153 MOTION Decertify Class Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(c) . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sandstrom, Anastasia)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Supplemental DECLARATION of Matthew C. Kane filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc re #146 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit J, #3 Exhibit K)(Kane, Matthew)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 REPLY, filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc, TO RESPONSE to #146 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Kane, Matthew)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Supplemental DECLARATION of Toby J. Marshall filed by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #144 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Nusser, Erika)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis, TO RESPONSE to #144 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Nusser, Erika)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 RESPONSE, by Interested Parties Washington State Attorney General's Office, Washington State Department of Labor & Industries, to #146 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sandstrom, Anastasia)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 DECLARATION of Toby J. Marshall filed by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #146 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Nusser, Erika)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis, to #146 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nusser, Erika)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 DECLARATION AFFIDAVIT of Matthew C. Kane filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc re #155 Response to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Kane, Matthew) Modified on 4/23/2018 to edit docket text to reflect language on pleading (TH).
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 DECLARATION AFFIDAVIT of Andrea Sequin filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc re #155 Response to Motion (Kane, Matthew) Modified on 4/23/2018 to edit docket text to reflect language on pleading (TH).
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 DECLARATION AFFIDAVIT of Robert Crandall filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc re #155 Response to Motion (Kane, Matthew) Modified on 4/23/2018 to edit docket text to reflect language on pleading (TH).
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 RESPONSE, by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc, to #144 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Oral Argument Requested. (Kane, Matthew)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 DECLARATION of Matthew C. Kane filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc re #153 MOTION Decertify Class Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(c) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to Declaration, #3 Exhibit C to Declaration, #4 Exhibit D to Declaration, #5 Exhibit E to Declaration, #6 Exhibit F to Declaration, #7 Exhibit G to Declaration, #8 Exhibit H to Declaration, #9 Exhibit I to Declaration, #10 Exhibit J to Declaration)(Kane, Matthew)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MOTION Decertify Class Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(c) , filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/4/2018, (Kane, Matthew)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MOTION to Intervene , filed by Intervenor Interested Parties Washington State Attorney General's Office, Washington State Department of Labor & Industries. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) Noting Date 4/27/2018, (Sandstrom, Anastasia) Modified on 4/12/2018 (TH).
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Anastasia Sandstrom on behalf of Intervenor Parties Washington State Department of Labor & Industries, Washington State Attorney General's Office. (Sandstrom, Anastasia)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #144 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Filed by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis. Noting Date 4/27/2018, (Marshall, Toby)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc re #148 Notice-Other, Amended Certificate of Service For Defendants Notice of Constitutional Question Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.1 Regarding Motion For Partial Summary Judgment (Kane, Matthew)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 NOTICE of Constitutional Question Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.1 Regarding Motion For Partial Summary Judgment re #147 Declaration, #146 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ; filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Kane, Matthew)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 DECLARATION of Matthew C. Kane filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc re #146 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Kane, Matthew)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/27/2018, (Kane, Matthew)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 DECLARATION of Toby J. Marshall filed by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #144 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Marshall, Toby)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , filed by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/13/2018, (Marshall, Toby)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's #142 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages - Over-length Brief, filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/20/2018, (Kane, Matthew)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' #140 Stipulation to Continue Dispositive Motion Deadlines. Dispositive motions due by 3/23/2018; Response to Dispositive Motion due by 4/20/2018; and Reply to Dispositive Motion due by 4/27/2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Dispositive Motion Deadlines by parties (Phillips, Michael)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #137 MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Expert Rebuttal Deadline ; by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis. (Marshall, Toby)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 DECLARATION of Toby J. Marshall filed by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #137 MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Expert Rebuttal Deadline (Marshall, Toby)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Expert Rebuttal Deadline, filed by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/8/2017, (Marshall, Toby)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MINUTE ORDER re parties' #135 Stipulation to Modify Case Schedule. 39.1 mediation to be completed by 4/20/2018, Discovery completed by 3/30/2018, Dispositive motions due by 3/2/2018, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 10/30/2017, Proposed pretrial order due by 6/11/2018, Defendants' Pretrial Statement due by 5/21/2018, Plaintiffs' Pretrial Statement due by 5/14/2018, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 11/30/2017, Jury Trial is set for 7/9/2018 at 9:30 AM before U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) Modified on 11/7/2017 to edit docket text (TH).
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Case Schedule by parties (Marshall, Toby)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER OF USCA (17-80025) re #121 Notice from 9th Circuit Court of Appeals (CDA)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER re #132 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Matthew C Kane for Schneider National Carriers Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew C. Kane FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4959128 (Smith, Douglas)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Brian E. Spang for Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc. (Smith, Douglas)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #124 MOTION to Approve Proposed Notice Plan and Set Case Schedule : 39.1 mediation to be completed by 12/31/2017, Discovery completed by 12/8/2017, Dispositive motions due by 11/10/2017, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 10/9/2017, Proposed pretrial order due by 2/16/2018, Defendants Pretrial Statement due by 1/26/2018, Plaintiffs Pretrial Statement due by 1/19/2018, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 11/6/2017, Jury Trial is set for 3/5/2018 before U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour, signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Supplemental DECLARATION of Erika L. Nusser filed by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #124 MOTION to Approve Proposed Notice Plan and Set Case Schedule (Nusser, Erika)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis, TO RESPONSE to #124 MOTION to Approve Proposed Notice Plan and Set Case Schedule (Nusser, Erika)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 DECLARATION of Michael R. Phillips filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc re #124 MOTION to Approve Proposed Notice Plan and Set Case Schedule (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Tabor, Kellie)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 RESPONSE, by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc, to #124 MOTION to Approve Proposed Notice Plan and Set Case Schedule . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tabor, Kellie)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 DECLARATION of Erika L. Nusser filed by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #124 MOTION to Approve Proposed Notice Plan and Set Case Schedule (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Nusser, Erika)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MOTION to Approve Proposed Notice Plan and Set Case Schedule , filed by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B) Noting Date 6/9/2017, (Nusser, Erika)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER OF USCA (17-80025) re #121 Notice from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. The court, in its discretion, denies the petition for permission to appeal the district courts February 7, 2017 order granting class action certification. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(f); Chamberlan v. Ford Motor Co., 402 F.3d 952 (9th Cir. 2005) (per curiam).(CDA)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting #115 Defendant's partial motion to dismiss. Plaintiffs' payroll card and safety equipment deduction claims are dismissed with prejudice; by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RM)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE FROM NINTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS (17-80025) Receipt of Petition for Permission to Appeal received.(SG)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 REPLY, filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc, TO RESPONSE to #115 MOTION to Dismiss (Tabor, Kellie)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 DECLARATION of Erika L. Nusser filed by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #115 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Nusser, Erika)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis, to #115 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Nusser, Erika)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Granting #51 Motion to Certify Class by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RM)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ANSWER to #114 Amended Complaint (Third) with JURY DEMAND by Schneider National Carriers Inc.(Tabor, Kellie)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc. Noting Date 2/17/2017, (Tabor, Kellie)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Balapuwaduge Mendis, Michael Feola, Edward Ash, Andrea Arbaugh.(Rekhi, Hardeep)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 PRAECIPE re #112 Declaration by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Erika L. Nusser)(Nusser, Erika)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Supplemental DECLARATION of Toby J. Marshall filed by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #51 MOTION to Certify Class (Nusser, Erika)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh, Edward Ash, Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis, TO RESPONSE to #51 MOTION to Certify Class (Nusser, Erika)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MINUTE ORDER withdrawing defendant's #106 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Withdrawing Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Pleadings to Allow Plaintiffs' to File Third Amended Complaint by parties re #106 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Nusser, Erika)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MINUTE ORDER extending deadline to 1/4/2017 for Plaintiffs' to file response to Defendant's #106 motion for judgment on the pleadings; Reply due 1/9/2017; motion #106 renoted for 1/9/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Plaintiffs to Respond by parties re #106 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Nusser, Erika)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc. Noting Date 1/6/2017, (Tabor, Kellie)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 DECLARATION of Sonya Kwon filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc re #51 MOTION to Certify Class (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Tabor, Kellie)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 DECLARATION of Tony Parks filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc re #51 MOTION to Certify Class (Tabor, Kellie)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 DECLARATION of William Patrick Lilja filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc re #51 MOTION to Certify Class (Tabor, Kellie)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 DECLARATION of Wayne Jensen filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc re #51 MOTION to Certify Class (Tabor, Kellie)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 DECLARATION of Terry Hoyt filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc re #51 MOTION to Certify Class (Tabor, Kellie)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 DECLARATION of Kira Hobart filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc re #51 MOTION to Certify Class (Tabor, Kellie)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 DECLARATION of Alexander Hill filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc re #51 MOTION to Certify Class (Tabor, Kellie)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 DECLARATION of Patrick Coty filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc re #51 MOTION to Certify Class (Tabor, Kellie)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 DECLARATION of John Archuleta filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc re #51 MOTION to Certify Class (Tabor, Kellie)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 DECLARATION of Brian E Spang filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc re #51 MOTION to Certify Class (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Tabor, Kellie)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 RESPONSE, by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc, to #51 MOTION to Certify Class . Oral Argument Requested. (Tabor, Kellie)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ANSWER to #93 Amended Complaint, for Damages with JURY DEMAND by Schneider National Carriers Inc.(Smith, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Plaintiffs Andrea Arbaugh and Edward Ash added per #93 Second Amended Complaint. (PM)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Schneider National Carriers Inc with JURY DEMAND, filed by Balapuwaduge Mendis, Michael Feola, Andrea Arbaugh and Edward Ash(Rekhi, Hardeep) Modified on 11/18/2016 to add additional names of plaintiffs (PM).
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' #49 Motion for leave to amend the complaint. Plaintiffs may amend the complaint to add Plaintiffs Ash and Arbaugh, but may not add additional claims. Plaintiffs' #73 Motion to certify a question to the Washington Supreme Court is denied. Defendant Schneider's #43 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted in part and denied in part. (PM)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Greg Alan Wolk. Filed by Plaintiffs Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis. (Wolk, Greg) Modified Firm Address for Rekhi & Wolk, P.S. on 10/18/2016 (DS).
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Supplemental DECLARATION of Brian E. Spang filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc re #73 MOTION to Certify Question to the Washington Supreme Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Tabor, Kellie)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 SURREPLY filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc re #73 MOTION to Certify Question to the Washington Supreme Court (Tabor, Kellie)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE of Intent to File Surreply in Opposition to Motion to Certify Question ; filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc. (Tabor, Kellie)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 DECLARATION of Erika L. Nusser filed by Plaintiffs Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #73 MOTION to Certify Question to the Washington Supreme Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Nusser, Erika)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis, TO RESPONSE to #73 MOTION to Certify Question to the Washington Supreme Court (Nusser, Erika)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 DECLARATION of Erika L. Nusser filed by Plaintiffs Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #49 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint (Nusser, Erika)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis, TO RESPONSE to #49 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint (Nusser, Erika)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MINUTE ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour per parties' #78 Stipulation Setting Revised Class Certification Schedule, Defendant's opposition to Plaintiffs' #51 MOTION for Class Certification due 12/9/2016; Plaintiffs' reply brief due 1/9/2017. (PM)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 DECLARATION of Brian E. Spang filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc re #73 MOTION to Certify Question to the Washington Supreme Court (Tabor, Kellie)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 RESPONSE, by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc, to #73 MOTION to Certify Question to the Washington Supreme Court. Oral Argument Requested. (Tabor, Kellie)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 DECLARATION of Brian E. Spang filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc re #49 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint (Tabor, Kellie)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 RESPONSE, by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc, to #49 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint. (Tabor, Kellie)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Setting Revised Class Certification Briefing Schedule by parties (Smith, Douglas)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MINUTE ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour re parties' #76 Stipulation Vacating Class Certification Briefing Schedule. It is ordered that Defendant's #72 Motion to Vacate the Class Certification Briefing Schedule #72 is withdrawn, and the class certification briefing schedule is vacated #30 . Parties shall submit their proposed class certification briefing schedule no later than 10/3/2016. (PM)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Vacating Class Certification Briefing Schedule by parties (Nusser, Erika)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Supplemental DECLARATION of Brian E. Spang filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc re #43 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Smith, Douglas)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 REPLY, filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc, TO RESPONSE to #43 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Smith, Douglas)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MOTION to Certify Question to the Washington Supreme Court by Plaintiffs Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/7/2016, (Nusser, Erika)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MOTION to Vacate Class Certification Briefing Schedule by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/30/2016, (Smith, Douglas)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 DECLARATION of Erika L. Nusser filed by Plaintiffs Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #43 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Nusser, Erika)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis, to #43 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Nusser, Erika)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 DECLARATION of Hardeep S. Rekhi filed by Plaintiffs Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #51 MOTION to Certify Class (Nusser, Erika)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 DECLARATION of Toby J. Marshall filed by Plaintiffs Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #51 MOTION to Certify Class (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part One, #2 Exhibit Part Two, #3 Exhibit Part Three, #4 Exhibit Part Four, #5 Exhibit Part Five, #6 Exhibit Part Six, #7 Exhibit Part Seven, #8 Exhibit Part Eight, #9 Exhibit Part Nine, #10 Exhibit Part Ten)(Nusser, Erika)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 DECLARATION of Travis J. McCollum filed by Plaintiffs Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #51 MOTION to Certify Class (Nusser, Erika)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 DECLARATION of Terry A. Garske filed by Plaintiffs Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #51 MOTION to Certify Class (Nusser, Erika)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 DECLARATION of Ryan Misner filed by Plaintiffs Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #51 MOTION to Certify Class (Nusser, Erika)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 DECLARATION of Ryan Currey filed by Plaintiffs Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #51 MOTION to Certify Class (Nusser, Erika)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 DECLARATION of Michael A. Mendiola filed by Plaintiffs Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #51 MOTION to Certify Class (Nusser, Erika)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 DECLARATION of Lance G. McMurray filed by Plaintiffs Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #51 MOTION to Certify Class (Nusser, Erika)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 DECLARATION of Jim Atkinson filed by Plaintiffs Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #51 MOTION to Certify Class (Nusser, Erika)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 DECLARATION of Gregory J. Moreno filed by Plaintiffs Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #51 MOTION to Certify Class (Nusser, Erika)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 DECLARATION of Gregory Bush filed by Plaintiffs Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #51 MOTION to Certify Class (Nusser, Erika)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 DECLARATION of Elexa Delia filed by Plaintiffs Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #51 MOTION to Certify Class (Nusser, Erika)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 DECLARATION of Edward J. Ash, III filed by Plaintiffs Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #51 MOTION to Certify Class (Nusser, Erika)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 DECLARATION of Darrell D. McBurney filed by Plaintiffs Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #51 MOTION to Certify Class (Nusser, Erika)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 DECLARATION of Clint Campagna filed by Plaintiffs Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #51 MOTION to Certify Class (Nusser, Erika)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 DECLARATION of Caleb Crockett filed by Plaintiffs Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #51 MOTION to Certify Class (Nusser, Erika)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 DECLARATION of Andrea Arbaugh filed by Plaintiffs Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #51 MOTION to Certify Class (Nusser, Erika)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 DECLARATION of Allen Brantner filed by Plaintiffs Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #51 MOTION to Certify Class (Nusser, Erika)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiffs Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 11/14/2016, (Nusser, Erika)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 DECLARATION of Erika L. Nusser filed by Plaintiffs Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis re #49 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint (Nusser, Erika)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint by Plaintiffs Michael Feola, Balapuwaduge Mendis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/7/2016, (Nusser, Erika)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 DECLARATION of Sonya Kwon filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc re #43 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Tabor, Kellie)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 DECLARATION of Jill M. Holley-Gauthier filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc re #43 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Tabor, Kellie)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 DECLARATION of Daniel L. Pierce filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc re #43 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Tabor, Kellie)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 DECLARATION of William Patrick Lilja filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc re #43 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Tabor, Kellie)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 DECLARATION of Brian Spang filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc re #43 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Tabor, Kellie)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting MSJ) Noting Date 9/23/2016, (Tabor, Kellie)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ANSWER to #39 Amended Complaint for Damages with JURY DEMAND by Schneider National Carriers Inc.(Smith, Douglas)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DECLINING TO IMPOSE SANCTIONS by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (RS)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc (Smith, Douglas)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Plaintiff Michael Feola added per amended complaint (RS)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Defendants, filed by Balapuwaduge Mendis.(Rekhi, Hardeep)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour granting Plaintiff's #31 Motion to amend complaint. Defendant is ordered to comply with Plaintiff's outstanding discovery requests #33 . Defendant is also ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why it should not have to pay Plaintiff's reasonable expenses in bringing the motion to compel. Show Cause Response due by 5/25/2016. (PM)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Balapuwaduge Mendis, TO RESPONSE to #31 MOTION to Amend Complaint (Nusser, Erika)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Supplemental DECLARATION of Erika L. Nusser in Support of LCR 37(a)(2) Joint Submission Regarding Plaintiff's Request for Class Member Contact Information filed by Plaintiff Balapuwaduge Mendis re #33 Joint MOTION LCR 37(a)(2) Joint Submission regarding Plaintiff's Request for Class Member Contact Information (Nusser, Erika)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 DECLARATION of Brian E. Spang in Opposition to Plaintiff's Request for Class Member Contact Information Made Pursuant to LCR 37(a)(2) Joint Submission filed by Plaintiff Balapuwaduge Mendis re #33 Joint MOTION LCR 37(a)(2) Joint Submission regarding Plaintiff's Request for Class Member Contact Information (Nusser, Erika)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 DECLARATION of Erika L. Nusser in Support of LCR 37(a)(2) Joint Submission Regarding Plaintiff's Request for Class Member Contact Information filed by Plaintiff Balapuwaduge Mendis re #33 Joint MOTION LCR 37(a)(2) Joint Submission regarding Plaintiff's Request for Class Member Contact Information (Nusser, Erika)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Joint MOTION LCR 37(a)(2) Joint Submission regarding Plaintiff's Request for Class Member Contact Information by Plaintiff Balapuwaduge Mendis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/4/2016, (Nusser, Erika)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 DECLARATION of Hardeep S. Rekhi in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Plaintiff Balapuwaduge Mendis re #31 MOTION to Amend Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rekhi, Hardeep)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Plaintiff Balapuwaduge Mendis. Noting Date 3/11/2016, (Wolk, Greg)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour directing Clerk to REOPEN case. Court grants parties' briefing schedule as follows: Plaintiffs' opening brief for its motion on class certification due 9/16/2016; Defendant's response due 10/14/2016; Plaintiffs' reply due 11/11/2016. (PM)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Balapuwaduge Mendis (Nusser, Erika)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Firm Name and Email Address Change ; filed by Plaintiff Balapuwaduge Mendis. (Nusser, Erika) Modified Firm Name on 11/5/2015 (DS).
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER directing Clerk to statistically close matter pending parties' completion of mediation by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER staying all case scheduled deadlines by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (RS)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Stay of Deadlines to Pursue Mediation by parties (Nusser, Erika)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PROTECTIVE ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (RS)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER (Protective Order) by parties (Nusser, Erika)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER re: Parties' #21 Stipulation Regarding Class Certification Briefing Deadlines. Plaintiff's Opening Brief due by 10/9/2015, Defendant's Responsive Brief due by 11/6/2015, Plaintiff's Reply Brief due by 12/4/2015, by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TM)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Class Certification Briefing Deadlines by parties (Nusser, Erika)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour; CRD: Paul Pierson; Plaintiff's Counsel: Erika Nusser and Hardeep Rekhi; Defense Counsel: Douglas Smith and Michael Phillips; Court Reporter: Andrea Ramirez; Time of Hearing: 9:00 a.m.; Courtroom: 16206.Status Conference was held on 5/12/2015. The Court and counsel briefly confer concerning further proceedings. The Court directs counsel to file a Stipulation and Proposed Order for a briefing schedule on the issue of class action. Further proceedings will be scheduled in a separate written order to follow after a ruling on the class action certification has been issued. (PP)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. The Court, at the joint request of counsel, hereby orders the Status Conference RESET to 5/12/2015 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour.(PP)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE. The Court hereby orders the deadlines established in the Joint Status Report Order Form for Magistrate Judges #6 VACATED in light of this matter getting reassigned to U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. New case management deadlines will be set at the Status Conference on 4/7/15 at 9:00 a.m. (PP)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION OF CAMERAS IN THE COURTROOM. The Western District of Washington is participating in the Judiciary's Pilot Project on #Cameras in the Courtroom. The project is a 3-year study to evaluate the effects of cameras in the courtrooms. This case is eligible to have proceedings video recorded and made available to the public via the U.S. Court's and Western District of Washington's web sites. Please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk for United States District Judge John C. Coughenour to indicate whether or not you agree to participate in the pilot project. If you should desire to participate, the court will require formal consent for the recording of each scheduled proceeding. Please contact the Courtroom Deputy at: paul_pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov. Do not e-file your response. (PP)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. The nature of the case; 2. The status of matters which are presently set before the Court, e.g., hearings, motions, etc.; 3. The status of discovery and a time schedule for its completion; 4. A statement of any legal issues about which motions are contemplated and a possible briefing schedule; 5. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 6. Whether the case is jury or non-jury; 7. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 8. Settlement probabilities; and 9. Whether the parties consent to proceed to trial before an assigned magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, arrangements may be made to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at (206) 370-8805 at least TEN (10) days prior to the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk, as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 4/7/2015 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by William M. McCool. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour for all further proceedings. Hon. Mary Alice Theiler no longer assigned to case. Cc to JCC. (BB)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael R Phillips for Schneider National Carriers Inc, by William M. McCool. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d)). (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Joel H Spitz for Schneider National Carriers Inc, by William M. McCool. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d)). (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brian E. Spang for Schneider National Carriers Inc, by William M. McCool. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d)). (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael R Phillips FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3914715 (Smith, Douglas)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Joel H. Spitz FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3914712 (Smith, Douglas)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brian E. Spang FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Schneider National Carriers Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3914699 (Smith, Douglas)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by Schneider National Carriers Inc.(Smith, Douglas)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler: Joint Status Report due by 3/25/2015, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/11/2015, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/18/2015. (BB)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Schneider National Carriers Inc (Smith, Douglas)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (ST)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT OR DECLINE FORM. If consent or decline, return the executed form by 3/13/2015. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (ST)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Smith, Douglas)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1 Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 2/6/2015. (ST)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (ST)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 14-2-34534-8 SEA; (Receipt # 0981-3892226), filed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 State Court Documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendis v. Schneider National Carriers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider National Carriers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider National Carriers Inc
Represented By: Brian E. Spang
Represented By: Douglas Edward Smith
Represented By: Joel H Spitz
Represented By: Kellie Anne Tabor
Represented By: Matthew C Kane
Represented By: Michael R Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mendis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Balapuwaduge Mendis
Represented By: Erika L. Nusser
Represented By: Greg Alan Wolk
Represented By: Hardeep S Rekhi
Represented By: Toby James Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Feola
Represented By: Erika L. Nusser
Represented By: Greg Alan Wolk
Represented By: Hardeep S Rekhi
Represented By: Toby James Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Arbaugh
Represented By: Erika L. Nusser
Represented By: Greg Alan Wolk
Represented By: Hardeep S Rekhi
Represented By: Toby James Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Ash
Represented By: Erika L. Nusser
Represented By: Greg Alan Wolk
Represented By: Hardeep S Rekhi
Represented By: Toby James Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Washington State Department of Labor & Industries
Represented By: Anastasia Sandstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Washington State Attorney General's Office
Represented By: Anastasia Sandstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?