March 4, 2024 |
Filing
134
ORDER denying Defendant's 129 Motion to Stay. The Court DIRECTS the parties to meet, confer, and provide the Court with updated discovery deadlines in a Joint Status Report by no later than 3/29/2024. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SB)
|
November 3, 2023 |
Filing
124
ORDER denying Defendant's 111 MOTION to Vacate 9 Order on Motion to Arrest Vessel under SAR E(4)(f) and LAR 115(D). The Court DIRECTS the parties to meet, confer, and provide the Court with updated discovery deadlines in a Joint Status Report by no later than 1/31/2024. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SB)
|
October 27, 2023 |
Filing
122
MINUTE ORDER: The Court sets a telephonic hearing on Friday, 11/3/2023 at 8:30 a.m. PST, regarding Defendants' motion to vacate warrants of arrest and writs of attachment. See Dkt. # 111 . Pursuant to Supplemental Admiralty Rule ("SAR" ) E(4)(f), Plaintiff shall be prepared "to show why the arrest or attachment" at issue "should not be vacated or other relief granted consistent with these rules." Considering the parties have already briefed the issue, see Dkt. ## 111 , 114 , 120 , 121 , the parties will be limited to ten (10) minutes per side. Plaintiff will proceed first and may reserve time for rebuttal. Authorized by Judge John H. Chun. (SB)
|
September 11, 2023 |
Filing
119
ORDER re: Briefing on Motion. Defendant's motion to vacate at Dkt. # 111 is noted for 10/13/2023. Dkt. # 118 . Plaintiff's opposition brief is due by 10/2/2023, and shall not exceed 8,400 words. Defendant's reply is due by 10/13/2023, and shall not exceed 8,400 words. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SB)
|
August 18, 2023 |
Filing
109
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 100 Motion to Dismiss. The Court GRANTS the motion to dismiss in part as to the maritime lien claim but DENIES it in part as to all other claims. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SS)
|
June 16, 2023 |
Filing
108
ORDER granting Parties' 107 Joint MOTION to Vacate Pending Deadlines. All case deadlines are vacated, including current deadlines imposed by Aegean's pending discovery, pending this Court's decision on CSSL's Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint (Dkt. # 100 ). Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SB)
|
March 9, 2023 |
Filing
105
ORDER re Parties' 104 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. Discovery to be completed by 7/28/2023, Dispositive motions and motions challenging expert witness testimony including Daubert-specific challenges due by 9/1/2023. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SB)
|
December 16, 2022 |
Filing
98
ORDER granting Defendant's 82 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. The Court grants Aegean leave to file a second amended complaint. The Court grants Aegean twenty-one (21) days to file this amended complaint. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SB)
|
December 14, 2022 |
Filing
97
ORDER granting Parties' 96 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/3/2023, Discovery completed by 5/26/2023, Dispositive motions and motions challenging expert witness testimony due by 6/30/2023. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SB)
|
August 26, 2022 |
Filing
91
ORDER granting Parties' 90 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. The date for disclosure of expert testimony shall be extended to Friday, 9/30/2022. All other deadlines set forth in the 1/14/2022 Scheduling Order (Dkt. 73 ) and further 7/5/2022 Order (Dkt. 89 ) remain the same. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SB)
|
July 5, 2022 |
Filing
89
ORDER granting Parties' 88 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadlines. The date for disclosure of expert testimony shall be extended to Friday, 9/9/2022, the date for the parties to complete discovery shall be extended to 12/2/2022, and the deadline for filing dispositive motions shall be extended to 1/20/2023. All other deadlines set forth in the 1/14/2022 Scheduling Order (Dkt. 73 ) remain the same. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SB)
|
May 3, 2022 |
Filing
87
ORDER re Parties' 86 Joint Motion to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadline. The date for disclosure of expert testimony shall be extended to Friday, 7/8/2022, and all other deadlines set forth in the 1/14/2022 Scheduling Order (Dkt. # 73 ) remain the same. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SB)
|
March 9, 2016 |
Filing
54
ORDER granting plaintiff's 49 Motion for leave to file response to additional authorities; granting in part and denying in part defendants' 34 Motion to dismiss, transfer or stay; This matter will be stayed and removed from the cour t's active caseload until further order of the court. The parties shall file a status report in 90 days that updates the court on any relevant developments in any related case pending in the Southern District of New York. Should there be any significant developments prior to the expiration of 90 days, the parties are permitted to file a motion to lift the stay on that basis by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
|