ServiceLink NLS, LLC et al v. Rebhuhn et al
Plaintiff: ServiceLink NLS, LLC and ServiceLink Agency Sales & Posting, LLC
Defendant: Chris Rebhuhn, Meredith Rebhuhn, Nicholas Lavandier and Aleta Lavandier
Case Number: 2:2015cv00173
Filed: February 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER granting 186 Agreed Motion to Dismiss and Abate Proceedings by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(RS)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal of Defendants James L. DeLoach and Deborah L. Kaufman with Prejudice; re parties' 184 Stipulation, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (James L. DeLoach and Deborah L. Kaufman terminated.) (SWT)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 182 Stipulation of Dismissal of Clayton Russell Slappey, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part parties' 180 Stipulated Motion To Extend Deadline for Disclosure of Expert Testimony. The expert disclosure deadline is EXTENDED to June 2, 2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (swt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ServiceLink NLS, LLC et al v. Rebhuhn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ServiceLink NLS, LLC
Represented By: Elliot C Copenhaver
Represented By: Jason M Kettrick
Represented By: James D. Miller(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ServiceLink Agency Sales & Posting, LLC
Represented By: Elliot C Copenhaver
Represented By: Jason M Kettrick
Represented By: James D. Miller(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Rebhuhn
Represented By: Nicholas Peter Gellert
Represented By: John Stuart Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meredith Rebhuhn
Represented By: Nicholas Peter Gellert
Represented By: John Stuart Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Lavandier
Represented By: Nicholas Peter Gellert
Represented By: John Stuart Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aleta Lavandier
Represented By: Nicholas Peter Gellert
Represented By: John Stuart Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?