Lopez et al v. United States Secret Service
Plaintiff: Raul Lopez, Jr and Carol J Shilling
Defendant: United States Secret Service
Case Number: 2:2015cv00243
Filed: February 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting defendant's 46 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: Raul Lopez, Jr. via USPS)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER re 43 Joint Status Report. Until Ms. Johnson appears as counsel of record pursuant to LCR 83.2(a), documents filed by her on plaintiff's behalf will not be considered. A case management order based on defense counsel's representations in the joint status report will be issued. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: Donna Johnston ad hoc; NEF regenerated)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying United States' 34 Motion to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service; Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this Order to serve the Attorney General and to file proof of service in the docket, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting Plaintiffs Raul Lopez, Jr, Carol J Shilling's 21 Motion to Reopen Case, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Plaintiffs shall have 90 days from the date of this Order to serve defendants and to file proof of service in the docket. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez et al v. United States Secret Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Lopez, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol J Shilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Secret Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?