Williams v. Amazon.com Inc et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Williams
Defendant: SMX LLC, Staff Management Solutions LLC and Amazon.com Inc
Case Number: 2:2015cv00542
Filed: April 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Change Venue; withdrawing #20 Motion to Dismiss; granting #21 Motion to Transfer Case; case transferred to Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
August 18, 2015 Case sent to District of Illinois, Northern, Eastern Division by electronic case transfer (RS)
August 18, 2015 Case transferred from Washington Western has been opened in Northern District of Illinois - CM/ECF LIVE, Ver 6,1 as case 1:15-cv-07256, filed 08/18/2015.(RS)
August 14, 2015 Filing 30 Stipulated MOTION to Change Venue Noting Date 8/14/2015, (Green, Christopher)
July 17, 2015 Filing 29 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. The Court, on its own motion and in the interest of judicial economy, hereby orders the Status Conference continued to 10/20/2015 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour.(PP)
June 23, 2015 Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour Denying Plaintiff's #25 Motion for Extension of Time as Moot. Motions #21 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division, and #20 Joint MOTION to Dismiss are renoted to 9/11/2015. (LMK)
June 22, 2015 Filing 27 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Gregory Williams, to #21 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division. (Green, Christopher)
June 22, 2015 Filing 26 Stipulated MOTION REGARDING LIMITED DISCOVERY PERTAINING TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by Plaintiff Gregory Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/22/2015, (Green, Christopher)
June 18, 2015 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time To Oppose Motion By Defendants To Transfer Venue by Plaintiff Gregory Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/26/2015, (Green, Christopher)
June 12, 2015 Filing 24 REPLY, filed by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, Staff Management Solutions LLC, TO RESPONSE to #20 Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Culbert, Regina)
June 5, 2015 Filing 23 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Gregory Williams, to #20 Joint MOTION to Dismiss . (Green, Christopher)
June 4, 2015 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Juan Maxinez filed by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, Staff Management Solutions LLC re #21 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division (Culbert, Regina)
June 4, 2015 Filing 21 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, Staff Management Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/26/2015, (Culbert, Regina)
May 20, 2015 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, Staff Management Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/12/2015, (Culbert, Regina)
May 19, 2015 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney David R Ongaro. Filed by Defendant Staff Management Solutions LLC. (Ongaro, David) Modified Address on 5/20/2015 (DS).
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #15 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Melissa A Siebert for Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, and for Staff Management Solutions LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Joel C Griswold for Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, and for Staff Management Solutions LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David R Ongaro for Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, and for Staff Management Solutions LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
May 18, 2015 Filing 15 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Melissa A. Siebert FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, Staff Management Solutions LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4020948 (Culbert, Regina)
May 18, 2015 Filing 14 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Joel C. Griswold FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, Staff Management Solutions LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4020937 (Culbert, Regina)
May 18, 2015 Filing 13 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David R. Ongaro FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, Staff Management Solutions LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4020923 (Culbert, Regina)
May 8, 2015 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER granting Parties' #11 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants have until May 20, 2015 to respond to the complaint, by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(TM) Text Modified on 5/12/2015 (TM).
May 6, 2015 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, Staff Management Solutions LLC. Noting Date 5/6/2015, (Culbert, Regina)
May 6, 2015 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Regina Vogel Culbert on behalf of Defendants Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC, Staff Management Solutions LLC. (Culbert, Regina)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John Soumilas for Gregory Williams, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney James A Francis for Gregory Williams, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
April 21, 2015 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John Soumilas FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Gregory Williams (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3988337 (Green, Christopher)
April 21, 2015 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jim Francis FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Gregory Williams (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3988336 (Green, Christopher)
April 8, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION OF CAMERAS IN THE COURTROOM. The Western District of Washington is participating in the Judiciary's Pilot Project on #Cameras in the Courtroom. The project is a 3-year study to evaluate the effects of cameras in the courtrooms. This case is eligible to have proceedings video recorded and made available to the public via the U.S. Court's and Western District of Washington's web sites. Please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk for United States District Judge John C. Coughenour to indicate whether or not you agree to participate in the pilot project. If you should desire to participate, the court will require formal consent for the recording of each scheduled proceeding. Please contact the Courtroom Deputy at: paul_pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov. Please do not e-file your response. (PP)
April 8, 2015 Filing 4 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. The nature of the case; 2. The status of matters which are presently set before the Court, e.g., hearings, motions, etc.; 3. The status of discovery and a time schedule for its completion; 4. A statement of any legal issues about which motions are contemplated and a possible briefing schedule; 5. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 6. Whether the case is jury or non-jury; 7. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 8. Settlement probabilities; and 9. Whether the parties consent to proceed to trial before an assigned magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, arrangements may be made to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at (206) 370-8805 at least TEN (10) days prior to the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk, as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 8/11/2015 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
April 7, 2015 Filing 2 Summons electronically issued as to defendant(s) Amazon.com Inc, SMX LLC and Staff Management Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ST)
April 7, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Class Action against defendant(s) Amazon.com Inc, SMX, LLC, Staff Management Solutions, LLC (Receipt # 0981-3970448) Attorney Christopher E Green added to party Gregory Williams(pty:pla), filed by Gregory Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Staff Management Solutions LLC, #3 Summons Amazon.com Inc, #4 Summons SMX LLC)(Green, Christopher)
April 7, 2015 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Amazon.com Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMX LLC
Represented By: David R Ongaro
Represented By: Joel C Griswold
Represented By: Regina Vogel Culbert
Represented By: Melissa A Siebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staff Management Solutions LLC
Represented By: David R Ongaro
Represented By: Joel C Griswold
Represented By: Regina Vogel Culbert
Represented By: Melissa A Siebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: David R Ongaro
Represented By: Joel C Griswold
Represented By: Regina Vogel Culbert
Represented By: Melissa A Siebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Williams
Represented By: James A Francis
Represented By: John Soumilas
Represented By: Christopher E Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?