G3 Genuine Guide Gear, Inc. v. Marker Deutschland GmbH
Plaintiff: G3 Genuine Guide Gear Inc
Defendant: Marker Deutschland GmbH
Case Number: 2:2015cv00561
Filed: April 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James P. Donohue
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: This case is DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs. The trial date of September 5, 2017, all remaining related dates and deadlines, and the pending motions, docket nos. 67 and 68 , are STRICKEN.In the event settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen and trial will be scheduled, provided such motion is filed within 60 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 83 Stipulated Motion to Seal ; plaintiff's unredacted response brief, docket no. 81 , and unredacted declaration, docket no. 82 , shall remain under seal, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' stipulation 74 ; renoting defendants' 67 MOTION for Denial of Permanent Injunction and Imposition of Ongoing Royalty ; Noting Date 8/28/2017. Pretrial Conference rescheduled for 8/29/2017 at 01:30 PM; parties' request to extend the deadline for filing motions in limine is denied by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Assertion of Claims 35 and 37 of U.S. Pat. No. 8,746,728 re parties' 69 Stipulation, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. For the foregoing reasons, with regard to whether Claims 1 and 37 of the 728 Patent were anticipated by the Durfort/Brard Patent, defendants' motion for summary judgment, docket no. 35 , was denied, and plaintiff's cross-motion for partial summary judgment, docket no. 49 , as sua sponte expanded by the Court, was granted. (SWT)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER denying defendants' 35 Motion for summary judgment and granting plaintiff's 49 Cross motion for partial summary judgment. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER granting 58 Stipulated Motion to Seal by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(RS)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER granting 37 stipulated motion to extend reply brief deadline. Plaintiff's reply brief in support of its discovery motion, as corrected, docket nos. 38 and 39 , will be considered timely filed. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER the Court declines to further construe the disputed claim terms. The Court makes no ruling concerning whether the independent and/or dependent claims of the 728 Patent read on the allegedly infringing devices by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G3 Genuine Guide Gear, Inc. v. Marker Deutschland GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G3 Genuine Guide Gear Inc
Represented By: Paul T Meiklejohn
Represented By: Ryan Blair Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marker Deutschland GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?