Barrowman et al v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alan Barrowman and Jessica Robertson
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Inc, RTI Surgery Inc and Regeneration Technologies Inc
Case Number: 2:2015cv00717
Filed: May 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 44 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 34 Motion for relief from the scheduling order and leave to amend; denying as moot Plaintiffs' 36 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying parties' stipulated motion to extend the trial date and remaining pretrial deadlines by Judge James L. Robart. (RS)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR RULE 35 EXAMINATIONS OF PLAINTIFFS by Judge James L. Robart granting 26 Stipulated Motion. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrowman et al v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Barrowman
Represented By: Aaron D Bigby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Robertson
Represented By: Aaron D Bigby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Inc
Represented By: Nancy M Erfle
Represented By: Steffanie Moxon Fain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RTI Surgery Inc
Represented By: Pamela Marie Andrews
Represented By: Jennifer Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regeneration Technologies Inc
Represented By: Pamela Marie Andrews
Represented By: Jennifer Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?