February 14, 2023 |
Filing
219
ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 212 Third Motion for Contempt. The Court ORDERS Defendants to continue to file monthly status reports regarding USCIS's compliance with the 30-day timeline to adjudicate class members' initial EAD applications through December 2023. These status reports shall be filed no later than five (5) days after the end of each month. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
|
February 7, 2023 |
Filing
217
MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' third motion for civil contempt and to enforce the permanent injunction in this case (Dkt. # 215 ) does not include the certification required by Local Civil Rule 7(e)(6). Nevertheless, the court will accept the filing. The court DIRECTS the parties to carefully review the current version of the Local Civil Rules on the court's website at https://www.wawd.uscourts.gov/local-rules-and-orders. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
|
September 27, 2022 |
Filing
207
ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 196 Second Motion for Contempt and to Enforce Permanent Injunction. The court ORDERS Defendants to file monthly status reports regarding USCIS's compliance with the 30-day timeline to adjudicate class members&# 039; initial EAD applications for September 2022, October 2022, November 2022, December 2022, January 2023, and February 2023. These status reports shall be filed no later than five (5) days after the end of each month. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
|
August 31, 2022 |
Filing
200
STIPULATION AND ORDER re Parties' 199 Stipulation. The Government will file its response to Plaintiffs' 196 Motion for Civil Contempt on 9/12/2022, and that Plaintiffs will file their reply by 9/16/2022. The Clerk is directed to renote Plaintiffs' motion for contempt and to enforce permanent injunction (Dkt. # 196 ) on 9/16/2022. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
|
April 29, 2022 |
Filing
193
ORDER granting Defendants' 192 Unopposed Motion to Modify the Court's 137 Order Adopting Parties' Partial Implementation Plan. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
|
May 28, 2021 |
Filing
184
ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CIVIL CONTEMPT: The court DENIES without prejudice Plaintiffs' motion for civil contempt (Dkt. # 171). The court ORDERS Defendants to file monthly status reports for the months of May, June, July, and Augu st 2021, regarding Defendants' rate of compliance with the 30-day timeline to adjudicate class members' EAD applications. The court DIRECTS the parties to continue conferring regarding USCIS's processes for accepting, receipting, an d dispute resolution. The court DIRECTS the parties to file a joint status report within ten (10) days of the district court's issuance of its order on the pending motion for permanent injunction in CASA de Maryland, Inc. v. Mayorkas, No. 8:20-cv-02118-PX (D. Md.). Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
|
April 2, 2021 |
Filing
178
ORDER re parties' 177 requests an extension of the deadlines re Plaintiffs' 171 Motion for Civil Contempt and to Enforce Permanent Injunction. Government's respone due 4/12/021; Plaintiffs' reply due 4/16/2021. Plaintiffs' 171 Motion is renoted for 4/16/2021. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
|
October 1, 2020 |
Filing
169
ORDER granting Parties' 168 Joint Stipulation of Settlement Re: Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
|
September 4, 2020 |
Filing
166
STIPULATION AND ORDER re-noting Plaintiffs' 155 MOTION for Attorney Fees - skeletal - under EAJA for 11/6/2020. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
|
July 13, 2020 |
Filing
160
ORDER granting Parties' 159 Stipulated Motion to Modify Order Appointing Class Counsel. The Court hereby appoints Matt Adams of the Northwest Immigrant Rights Project as class counsel and substitute his appointment for that of Christopher Strawn, who has withdrawn from this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart.(LH)
|
June 3, 2020 |
Filing
156
ORDER granting the Parties' 152 Stipulated Motion to File a Skeletal Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Should the parties not settle the matter, Plaintiffs may file a renewed motion with full argument and supporting documentation by September 2, 2020. Signed by Judge James L. Robart.(PM)
|
March 20, 2019 |
Filing
145
ORDER concerning parties' letter briefs (Dkts. 137 , 138 ). The court (1) declines to require full compliance with its injunction by a date certain, and (2) declines to require individuals who seek to compel Defendants to adjudicate a specific EAD application to file their action in this court. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
|
November 15, 2018 |
Filing
140
ORDER Directing the Parties to File Responsive Letter Briefs. The parties shall file their responsive letter briefs no later than Tuesday, November 27, 2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
|
October 3, 2018 |
Filing
137
STIPULATED ORDER re: parties' 134 Stipulated Motion. The parties are directed to file three-page letter briefs on their positions regarding: (1) whether the Court should specify specific rates of compliance for employment authorization docume nt (EAD) adjudication as part of an implementation order and what those rates should be; (2) the appropriate venue for filing any Federal District Court action where an EAD application is not adjudicated in compliance with this Court's order, after the individual has complied withthe steps set forth in the implementation plan. The letter briefs of the parties are due within 7 days after the date of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
|
September 10, 2018 |
Filing
133
MINUTE ORDER re parties' 132 Joint Statement. The court ORDERS the parties to jointly file a statement in accordance with Court's order of July 26, 2018 (Dkt. No. 127 ) by Friday, September 14, 2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
|
June 15, 2018 |
Filing
121
STIPULATION AND ORDER re: parties' 120 Stipulated Motion Modifying Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule. Any Opposition to the 118 119 Motions for Summary Judgment due 7/2/2018; Replies due 7/16/2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
|
April 19, 2018 |
Filing
115
STIPULATION AND ORDER Amending Scheduling Order re parties 114 Stipulation. Any motion for summary judgment is due May 17, 2018; Any opposition to a motion for summary judgment is due June 18, 2018; Any optional reply is due July 2, 2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
|
April 17, 2018 |
Filing
113
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 103 Motion to supplement the administrative record; granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' 104 Cross Motion to supplement the administrative record. Clerk is directed to substitute L. Francis Cissna for former Acting Director of USCIS James McCament and Kirstjen Nielsen for former Secretary of DHS John Kelly. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
|
February 23, 2018 |
Filing
112
ORDER MODIFYING ORDER APPOINTING CLASS COUNSEL re: 111 Stipulated Motion. The Court hereby appoints Trina Realmuto as class counsel and substitutes her appointment for that of Melissa Crow, who has withdrawn from this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
|
October 17, 2017 |
Filing
102
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge James L. Robart. Defendants' Motion to Supplement the Record due 10/20/2017; Plaintiffs' Opposition and any Cross-Motion due 11/24/2017; Defendants' Reply and any Opposition to the Cross-Motion due 12/8/2017; Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of the Cross-Motion, if any, due 12/22/2017; Discovery completed by 4/2/2018; Any Motion for Summary Judgment is due 30 days after discovery is completed, and no later than 5/1/2018; Any Opposition to the Motion for Summary Judgment due 6/1/2018; Any optional Reply due 6/15/2018. (PM)
|
August 30, 2017 |
Filing
100
STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to File Combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan and Exchange Initial Disclosures. Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/20/2017, Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 9/28/2017, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
|
July 28, 2017 |
Filing
97
ORDER granting 96 Stipulated Motion to Appoint Class Counsel signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
|
July 18, 2017 |
Filing
95
ORDER signed by Judge James L. Robart. The court GRANTS Defendants' motion to dismiss the 90-Day Plaintiffs' and 90-Day Subclass's claims (Dkt. # 88 ), DISMISSES those claims as moot, and GRANTS in part and DENIES in part 30-Day Pl aintiffs' motion for class certification (Dkt. # 82 ). The court APPOINTS A.A., Mr. Machic Yac, and W.H. as class representatives and DIRECTS the parties to review Rule 23(g), meet and confer, and brief the appointment of class counsel in the manner described above. Finally, the court DIRECTS the Clerk to update the docket to reflect substitution of government officials sued in their official capacities. (PM)
|
July 10, 2017 |
Filing
93
MINUTE ORDER directing counsel to be prepared to address topics identified in this minute order at the oral argument set for 7/13/2017 at 10:00 a.m. re Plaintiff's 82 motion for class certification and Defendants' 88 partial motion to dismiss. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
|
October 5, 2016 |
Filing
80
ORDER by Judge James L. Robart GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Defendants' 69 Motion to dismiss; DENYING without prejudice Individual Plaintiffs' 59 Motion for class certification and GRANTING Individual Plaintiffs leave to renew their motion for class certification within 30 days of the date of this order. (PM)
|