Tulalip Tribes et al v. Smith et al

Plaintiff: Tulalip Tribes and Consolidated Borough Quil Ceda Village
Defendant: Vikki Smith, Kirke Sievers, Cindy Portman and Snohomish County
Case Number: 2:2015cv00940
Filed: June 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 263 Motion for Relief from Deadline and Stay of Defendants' Motions (Docs. 260 , 262 ) for Costs and Attorneys' Fees. The Court hereby directs Plaintiffs to file any response to the Motions on or before December 14, 2018. Defendants shall file any replies on or before December 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 258 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. The Court hereby finds in favor of Defendants on all claims, and dismisses this case. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(SWT)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER granting State Defendants' 244 Motion to Seal. Exhibit T-1002 245 shall be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (PM)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER RE: JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT 185 186 187 . Parties are directed to file an amended Joint Pretrial Statement by 4/27/2018; The parties are further directed to provide the Court, no later than 4/27/2018, with electronic copies of the dis puted exhibits so that the Court may evaluate their admissibility, to the extent possible, before trial; In light of the excessive number of pretrial issues that remain unresolved, the Court hereby schedules a second day on which to continue the Pretrial Conference, if it becomes necessary, for May 10, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (PM)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' AND DEFENDANTS' DAUBERT MOTIONS re: 146 150 , 151 , 154 , 156 , 157 and 158 . Furthermore, having reviewed the proposed content of witness Ian Smith as presented in plaintiffs' briefing, the Court is of the opinion that his testimony would best be proffered in written format not to exceed 20 pages. Any reply should not exceed 20 pages. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (PM) (PM)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. Bench Trial (10 Days) is continued to 5/14/2018-5/25/2018 before Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. Daubert motions due 8/25/2017 and noted for 9/15/2017, Daubert Responses due 9/11/2017, Daubert Reply briefs due 9/15/2017, Plaintiffs Pretrial Statement due by 1/31/2018, Defendants Pretrial Statement due by 2/28/2018, Motions in Limine due by 4/3/2018, Conference of Attorneys per LCR 16(k) completed by 4/4/2018, Final Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/13/2018 Final Pretrial Conference is 5/4/2018. (PM)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 72 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Plaintiffs' 74 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying Plaintiff-Intervenor's 77 Motion for Order Regarding Government Services. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 72 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Plaintiffs' 74 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying Plaintiff-Intervenor's 77 Motion for Order Regarding Government Services. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (PM)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting 44 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(HR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tulalip Tribes et al v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tulalip Tribes
Represented By: Cory J Albright
Represented By: Phillip Evan Katzen
Represented By: Lisa M Koop
Represented By: Jane Garrett Steadman
Represented By: Michael E. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consolidated Borough Quil Ceda Village
Represented By: Cory J Albright
Represented By: Phillip Evan Katzen
Represented By: Lisa M Koop
Represented By: Jane Garrett Steadman
Represented By: Michael E. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vikki Smith
Represented By: David Mark Hankins
Represented By: Heidi A. Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirke Sievers
Represented By: Rebecca E.L. Wendling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Portman
Represented By: Rebecca E.L. Wendling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snohomish County
Represented By: Rebecca E.L. Wendling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?