Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. City of Seattle et al
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: City of Seattle and Core Design, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv01039
Filed: June 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MINUTE ORDER dismissing all claims in this action with prejudice and without costs to any party, with each party to bear its own attorney fees and other litigation expenses, authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MINUTE ORDER clarifying previous 109 order setting pretrial deadlines. To allow the Court adequate time to review the filings before trial, any responses or objections to the pretrial filings shall be due by Wednesday, March 14, 2018. The Court shall orally rule on any motions in limine or pretrial motions on the first morning of trial. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MINUTE ORDER Discovery completed by 10/15/2017, Dispositive motions due by 12/15/2017, Motions in Limine due by 3/12/2018, Pretrial Order due by 3/9/2018, Trial briefs to be submitted by 3/12/2018, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 3/12/2018, by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (RS)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting 101 Joint Motion to continue the discovery cutoff deadline. Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 3/19/2018 at 09:30 AM before U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour, Discovery completed by 10/15/2017, Dispositive motions due by 12/15/2017. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting Defendant Ground Support, PLLC's 83 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying motion for sanctions. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour denying Defendant Ground Support's 57 Motion for summary judgment. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. City of Seattle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Lisa C Neal
Represented By: John Michael Silk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Seattle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Core Design, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?