Bunger v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Chris Bunger
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2015cv01050
Filed: June 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff Chris Bunger against Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying Defendant's 53 Second Motion for Judgment; granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 47 Second Motion for Judgment under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 52. The parties shall meet and confer regarding the approp riate amount of benefits owed and any prejudgment interest, and jointly submit a proposed judgment within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff may also, within ten (10) days from the date of this Order, file a motion to recover any attorney's fees and costs sought. This matter is now CLOSED. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones.(PM)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting plaintiff's 39 Motion to Reopen Case by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion for Attorney Fees by Judge Richard A Jones. Defendant shall pay Plaintiff's attorney's fees in the amount of $72,500.00 and costs in the amount of $743.48. (SSM)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones denying Plaintiff's and Defendant's Cross Motions for Judgment Under FRCP 52 and Remanding to the Administrator. Plaintiff's 13 Motion for Judgment under FRCP 52 is DENIED; Defendant's 14 Motion for Judgment under FRCP 52 is DENIED; The Court REMANDS to Unum with instructions; This matter is now CLOSED. (AD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bunger v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Bunger
Represented By: Melton L Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Gabriel Baker
Represented By: D Michael Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?