Bezuidenhout et al v. Ultimate Franchises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jean Roux Bezuidenhout and Nelia Bezuidenhout
Defendant: Ultimate Franchises Inc, Brigitte Love, W. Scott Griffiths and Ron Love
Case Number: 2:2015cv01082
Filed: July 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF DISMISSAL by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (RS)
September 24, 2015 Filing 11 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal with Prejudice by parties (Huck, Christopher)
August 3, 2015 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER staying case pending arbitration; all deadlines and status conf are stricken by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (RS)
July 31, 2015 Filing 9 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration by parties (Huck, Christopher)
July 17, 2015 Filing 8 NOTIFICATION REGARDING PROPOSED VIDEO RECORDING. At least one party or the presiding judge has opposed the request to video record, or a party has failed to respond. The Status Conference on 8/11/2015 at 9:00 a.m. will NOT be video recorded. (PP)
July 10, 2015 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION OF CAMERAS IN THE COURTROOM. The Western District of Washington is participating in the Judiciary's Pilot Project on #Cameras in the Courtroom. The project is a 3-year study to evaluate the effects of cameras in the courtrooms. This case is eligible to have proceedings video recorded and made available to the public via the U.S. Court's and Western District of Washington's web sites. Please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk for United States District Judge John C. Coughenour to indicate whether or not you agree to participate in the pilot project. If you should desire to participate, the court will require formal consent for the recording of each scheduled proceeding. Please contact the Courtroom Deputy at: paul_pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov. Do not e-file your response. (PP)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
July 10, 2015 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Ultimate Brands, Inc. for Ultimate Franchises Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Ultimate Franchises Inc (Huck, Christopher)
July 9, 2015 Filing 4 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. The nature of the case; 2. The status of matters which are presently set before the Court, e.g., hearings, motions, etc.; 3. The status of discovery and a time schedule for its completion; 4. A statement of any legal issues about which motions are contemplated and a possible briefing schedule; 5. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 6. Whether the case is jury or non-jury; 7. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 8. Settlement probabilities; and 9. Whether the parties consent to proceed to trial before an assigned magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, arrangements may be made to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at (206) 370-8805 at least TEN (10) days prior to the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk, as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 8/11/2015 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
July 8, 2015 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendants W. Scott Griffiths, Brigitte Love, Ron Love, Ultimate Franchises Inc. (Huck, Christopher)
July 8, 2015 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
July 8, 2015 NOTICE TO FILER: CIVIL COVER SHEET MISSING:Please post the Civil Cover Sheet using the event Civil Cover Sheet found in Other Documents and relate back to the Complaint. Thank you. (RE)
July 8, 2015 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) Ultimate Franchises, Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/15/2015. (RE)
July 8, 2015 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (RE)
July 6, 2015 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 15-2-08280-9 SEA; (Receipt # 0981-4076488), filed by Ultimate Franchises, Inc., W. Scott Griffiths, Ron Love, Brigitte Love. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2)(Riojas, Rogelio) Modified on 7/8/2015 to add Exhibit title. (RE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bezuidenhout et al v. Ultimate Franchises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Roux Bezuidenhout
Represented By: Howard E. Bundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelia Bezuidenhout
Represented By: Howard E. Bundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ultimate Franchises Inc
Represented By: Rogelio Omar Riojas
Represented By: Christopher M Huck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brigitte Love
Represented By: Rogelio Omar Riojas
Represented By: Christopher M Huck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Scott Griffiths
Represented By: Rogelio Omar Riojas
Represented By: Christopher M Huck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Love
Represented By: Rogelio Omar Riojas
Represented By: Christopher M Huck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?