VHT, Inc. v. Zillow Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: VHT, Inc.
Defendant: Zillow Group, Inc. and Zillow, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv01096
Filed: July 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER re parties' 348 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Deadline for Joint Statement re 347 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Cross Motion. The Court extends the current deadline one week, from, Friday, May 22, 2020, to next Friday, May 29, 2020. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER denying Defendant Zillow Group, Inc., and Zillow, Inc.'s 339 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting VHT, Inc.'s 343 Cross-Motion for partial summary judgment. The court further ORDERS the parties to submit a joint statement and proposed amended judgment as specified in Section III.D of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 328 STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT pending resolution of appeal. The Zillow defendants are not required to post a supersedeas bond at this time. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER denying VHT prejudgment interest on the statutory damages-eligible images and directing the Clerk to enter judgment pursuant to the parties' proposal; adopting Zillow's proposed language regarding prejudgment interest. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 317 MINUTE ORDER by Judge James L. Robart. The court has received the parties' statement regarding case status and subsequent proceedings. (Stmt. (Dkt. # 316 ).) In light of the representations therein, the court STRIKES the June 30, 2017, status conference and ORDERS the parties to instead submit a proposed judgment for the court's consideration no later than Friday, July 7, 2017. If the parties cannot agree on language for a proposed judgment, they may each submit proposed judgments and brief statements in support of their respective submissions. (AD)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant Zillow's 301 Motion for judgment notwithstanding the verdict or a new trial; denying Plaintiff's 300 Motion to Amend Judgment; Status Conference set for 6/30/2017 at 10:00 AM befo re Judge James L. Robart. The parties are directed to meet and confer regarding this order and the status of the case. Parties to jointly file a statement by 6/28/2017, at 12:00 p.m. indicating the matters one or both parties intend to raise at the status conference. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER granting 311 Stipulated Motion to extend dft Zillow's deadline to 4/28/17 to file surreply by Judge James L. Robart.(RS)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER granting 305 Stipulated Motion to Extend the Deadline to Reply to Post-Verdict Motions. The parties may file reply post-trial briefs not to exceed fifteen (15) pages no later than April 17, 2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER granting parties' 297 Stipulated Motion re Procedure for Post-Verdict Motions. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER directing parties to meet and confer and submit a joint statement of parties' positions by 2/21/17. If parties disagree they must file opening briefs by 2/24/17 and responses by 3/1/17 by Judge James L. Robart. (RS)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 249 MINUTE ORDER directing parties to submit amended proposed verdict forms by 1/30/2017, at 12:00 p.m. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 244 PRETRIAL ORDER by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart denying Plaintiff VHT's 212 Motion for reconsideration; granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff VHT's renewed 215 Motion for partial summary judgment; denying without prejudice Defendant Zillow's 219 Motion to exclude evidence of the operations of the HDPs. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VHT, Inc. v. Zillow Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHT, Inc.
Represented By: Yonatan Berkovits(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Max Bamberger Hensley
Represented By: Jonathan M. Lloyd
Represented By: Marcia Beth Paul(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zillow Group, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew L Deutsch(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Andrew Ramiro Escobar
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Represented By: Melissa A Reinckens(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zillow, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew L Deutsch(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Andrew Ramiro Escobar
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Represented By: Melissa A Reinckens(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?