Money Mailer, LLC v. Wade Brewer
Plaintiff: Money Mailer, LLC
Defendant: Wade G Brewer
Case Number: 2:2015cv01215
Filed: July 31, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MW)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER DISMISSINGCOUNTERCLAIMS: Money Mailer's 257 Motion for Summary Judgment on Brewer's counterclaims is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER: Plaintiff in the above-captioned matter was ordered to show cause, on or before 8/17/2020, why its transferee should not be substituted as the named plaintiff in the litigation or to voluntarily dismiss the claims asserted. Dkt. # 303 . It opted to voluntarily dismiss its claims against defendant Wade G. Brewer, but requests that the dismissal be without prejudice. Dkt. # 305 . Brewer filed a timely objection, arguing that the dismissal should be with prejudice. Dkt. # 308 . Plaintiff is invited to file a reply to Brewer's objection, not to exceed five pages in length, on or before 8/27/2020. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER denying as moot Defendant's 267 Motion for Adequate Security. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(LH)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Money Mailer shall, within fourteen days of the date of this Order, serve copies of Brewer's response memorandum (Dkt. # 299 ) and this Order on MM 2018 and the Assignee pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Money Mailer and/or its transferee shall show cause on or before 8/17/2020, why the transferee should not be substituted as the named plaintiff in this litigation. In the alternative, Money Mailer may, on or before that date, voluntarily dismiss the claims it has asserted against Brewer. The Clerk of Court is directed to note this Order to Show Cause on the Court'scalendar for Friday, 8/21/2020. Brewer may file a response on or before the note date. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MW)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER denying Defendant's 247 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER re Plaintiff's 259 Motion for Attorney Fees: Daniel Brown of Williams, Kastner & Gibbs PLLC, as the attorney filing the motion for protective order on behalf of Maresse, shall pay to Money Mailer $9,821.50 in fees and $594. 00 in costs. Brewer, as the party moving to compel, shall pay to Money Mailer $12,474.00 in fees related to that motion. In light of the outstanding issues regarding Money Mailer's continuing right to pursue this litigation and ability to secure a potential fee/cost award if Brewer prevails, these amounts will be included in the judgment, either as an amount due or as an offset. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 295 SECOND ORDER FOR FURTHER BRIEFING: The Clerk of Court is directed to renote Brewer's motion for adequate security (Dkt. # 267 ) on the Court's calendar for Friday, 7/3/2020. Within five days of the date of this Order, Money Mailer shall provide additional briefing (not to exceed six pages) and evidence regarding (a) its right to pursue this litigation in light of the alleged sale of all of its assets, (b) its assets, liabilities, and income following the transfer to the Assignee, (c) its projections or forecasts regarding income it anticipates receiving through any reversionary provision in the assignment agreements, related contracts, or governing statutes, and (d) the costs of obtaining a bond in the amount of $640,000. Brewer may file a response of no more than six pages within seven days of Money Mailer's filing. Money Mailer may file a reply of no more than three pages on or before the note date. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MW)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 240 Motion to Compel Discovery. Money Mailer's request for an award of attorney's fees is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's 205 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER re Defendant's 163 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses: Brewer's motion to compel is DENIED with the exception that Money Mailer shall notify Brewer when it ceases its formal efforts to locate responsive materials and has comple ted its anticipated production. Money Mailer is entitled to an award of reasonable expenses incurred in opposing the motion. Money Mailer shall, within fourteen days of the date of this Order, submit a properly supported statement of fees and costs, which shall be noted on the Court's calendar for the third Friday after filing. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER denying Third Party's 179 Motion for Protective Order: Plaintiff's request for an award of reasonable expenses incurred as a result of Ms. Marrese's failure to appear for deposition and the attorney's fees associated with responding to defendant's motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall, within fourteen days of the date of this Order, submit a properly supported statement of fees and costs. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER granting Defendant's 245 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER: The parties shall meet and confer regarding the need to resolve the each of the motions listed above (Dkt. # 163 , 179 , 187 , 190 , 194 , 198 , 205 , 215 , and 218 and an orderly schedule for their consideration. The parties shall submit a Joint Status Report regarding the outstanding motions within fourteen days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MW)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER: Because there is a genuine issue of disputed fact regarding the fairness and reasonableness of the prices charged Brewer for printing services, Brewer's motion for summary judgment regarding a violation of RCW 19.100.180(2)(d) (Dkt. # 105 ) is DENIED. An amended case management schedule will be issued. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MW)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER Certifying Questions to the State Supreme Court. Money Mailer's request for reconsideration or certification for interlocutory appeal to the Ninth Circuit (Dkt. # 180 ) is DENIED. This matter is hereby certified to the Supreme Court of the State of Washington for consideration of the local law issues. The Clerk of Court is directed to submit to the Supreme Court of Washington certified copies of this Order, a copy of the docket in this matter, and Dkt. # 9 , 12 , 139 , 105 -06, 109 -12, 147 , 123 , 148 , 125 -26, 131 -32, 177 , 180 -82, 186 , and 193 . The federal action is STAYED pending resolution of the certified issues. The parties shall, within fourteen days of the Washington Supreme Court's resolution of the certified issues submit a Joint Status Report setting forth the parties' recommendations for a new trial date, other scheduling deadlines, and consideration of pending motions (Dkt. # 163 , 179 , 187 , 190 , 194 , 198 , 205 , 215 , and 218 ). Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH) (cc: USCA; WA Supreme Court via electronic filing system)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting in part defendant/counter-claimant Wade G Brewer's 105 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER granting defendant/counter claimant Wade Brewer's 157 Motion for a Brief Continuance of Trial Date and Related Dates. A revised case management order will issue. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Counterclaim Defendants' 140 Motion to Dismiss; and granting leave to amend. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Discovery re parties' 149 Stipulation : Discovery completed by 6/29/2018, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 5/31/2018, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 7/2/2018, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting Defendant Wade G Brewer's 128 Motion to Seal ; Dkt. 131 and Dkt. 132 shall remain under seal ; Redacted version of those documents are available for public viewing at Dkt. 129 and Dkt. 130 , signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting Defendant Wade G Brewer's 117 Motion to Amend Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel re parties' 113 Stipultaed Motion to Substitute, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (Attorney Erik R Lied and James Derek Little terminated)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER denying Money Mailer Franchise Corp's 81 Motion for Summary Judgment or to Compel Arbitration and to Stay, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting Defendant Wade G Brewer's 92 Motion to Seal; directing Clerk to seal Exhibits A through H to the Declaration of Wade G. Brewer in support of Wade G. Brewers Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 94 ), by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Denying 20 Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying 29 Motion to Compel Arbitration, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Money Mailer, LLC v. Wade Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Money Mailer, LLC
Represented By: Erik R Lied
Represented By: James Derek Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wade G Brewer
Represented By: Daniel Andrew Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?