Berry et al v. Transdev Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Howard Berry and David Berry
Defendant: Transdev Services, Inc. and Transdev North America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv01299
Filed: August 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 95 Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (PM)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 92 Motion to Seal Exhibits 18 and 19 and denying with leave to amend with respect to Exhibits 6, 22, 36, and 37, to allow First Transit to fully address the possibility of redaction as an alternative to filing under seal. Defendant Transdev's 133 Motion to Seal Exhibit 11 to the Declaration of Hamid Slim is also GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (PM)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 91 Motion for Leave to File; granting Defendants' 131 Motion for Leave to File; granting Defendant's 132 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TH)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 56 Motion for Leave to File and Amended Class Action Complaint; and granting Plaintiffs' 69 Motion to Continue Class Certification Briefing Deadlines. Plaintiffs shall file their proposed ame nded complaint, filed as Exhibit A to Docket No. 57 , within one week of the date of this order. Furthermore, the parties are ordered to submit proposed deadlines related to class certification briefing within one week. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (TH)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying First Transit's 26 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part First Transit's 30 Motion to Dismiss defendant Transdev's cross claim for failure to state a claim; denying as moot First Transit's 39 Motion for Protective Order by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berry et al v. Transdev Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Berry
Represented By: Toby James Marshall
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Represented By: Jeffrey Lowell Needle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Berry
Represented By: Toby James Marshall
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Represented By: Jeffrey Lowell Needle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transdev Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey B DeGroot
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Represented By: Austin M. Rainwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transdev North America, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey B DeGroot
Represented By: Stellman Keehnel
Represented By: Austin M. Rainwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?