Moussouris v. Microsoft Corporation
Plaintiff: Katherine Moussouris
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Case Number: 2:2015cv01483
Filed: September 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 535 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding voluntary dismissal of Katherine Moussouris's claims re parties' 534 Stipulation. (Katherine Moussouris terminated) Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 529 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding voluntary dismissal of Holly Muenchow's claims re parties' 528 Stipulation, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (Holly Muenchow terminated.) (LH)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 520 ORDER withdrawing Michelle Peterson's appointment as special master in this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (Special Master Michelle Peterson terminated)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 519 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding voluntary dismissal of Dana Piermarini's claims re parties' 518 Stipulation, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (Dana Piermarini terminated.)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 517 ORDER Withdrawing Special Master Appointment. The court intends to withdraw Ms. Peterson's appointment as special master in this case on 2/15/2019. The court ORDERS any party that wishes to respond to the court's plan to file a brief not to exceed three pages no later than 2/11/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 513 STIPULATION AND ORDER sealing the 510 Order granting in part and denying in part Defendant's motion for summary judgment 403 489 as reflected in the redacted copy of the Order attached to the Parties' Stipulation 512 . Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER ADOPTING 491 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The court INSTRUCTS the parties to unseal and revise, as necessary, the redactions on the documents identified by the report and recommendation within ten (10) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 458 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Rebuttal Report. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 463 filed by Special Master Michelle Peterson. The court INSTRUCTS the parties to unseal and revise, as necessary, the redactions on the documents identified by the report and recommendation within ten (10) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 472 MINUTE ORDER directing Clerk to unseal Court's 467 Provisionally Sealed Order on Motions to Exclude. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 470 ORDER adopting the 468 supplemental report and recommendation in its entirety. The parties are INSTRUCTED to unseal and revise, as necessary, the redactions on any documents identified by the supplemental report and recommendation as well as the original report and recommendation. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
April 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 462 filed by Special Master Michelle Peterson. The court directs parties to jointly submit within 10 days of the entry of this order, a stipulated reference sheet that details-by title and docket number-the documents that the parties rely on for the Motion for Class Certification (Dkt. ## 228 (sealed), 232 (redacted)) and the Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. # 418 ). Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 449 MINUTE ORDER requesting the Special Master assist with the additional Plaintiffs' 435 MOTION to Seal. Objections to be filed no later than Friday, April 6, 2018, by noon. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 423 MINUTE ORDER requesting the Special Master assist with five motions to seal: 366 , 375 , 393 , 414 , 421 . Parties may file objections no later than 3/21/2018. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 351 in its entirety and GRANTS in part and DENIES in part the three motions to seal (Dkt. ## 227 , 283 , 333 ), as detailed in Ms. Peterson's report and recommendation. The court additionally GRA NTS in part and DENIES in part Microsoft's motion to seal the corrected expert report of Dr. Saad (Dkt. # 353 ) on the same grounds as Ms. Peterson articulated in her recommendations regarding Dr. Saad's original export report. The par ties and the Clerk are INSTRUCTED to unseal and revise the documents identified by the report and recommendation. The parties are further ORDERED to file revised redacted versions of the motion for class certification and the opposition within ten (10) days of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 350 MINUTE ORDER requesting the Special Master assist with the third and fourth motions to seal (Dkt No. 333 , 339 ); parties may file their objections no later than Monday, February 19, 2018, at noon. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 324 MINUTE ORDER requesting Special Master to assist with Microsoft's second 283 MOTION to Seal. Objections to request due 1/11/2018 at 5:00 pm. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 282 MINUTE ORDER requesting the Special Master assist with the parties' 227 MOTION to Seal; parties may file their objections no later than Friday, January 5, 2018, at 5:00 p.m. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 275 STIPULATION AND ORDER to RENOTE plaintiffs' 227 MOTION to Seal : Noting Date 12/15/2017; re parties' 274 Stipulation, by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 226 JOINT STATEMENT AND ORDER RE CLASS DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND REDACTIONS TO THE COURT'S ORDER re 223 Order Preliminarily Filed Under Seal. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 198 STIPULATION AND ORDER re briefing schedule for objections to the Special Master's 196 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiffs' limited objections due 7/6/2017; Defendant's response due 7/12/2017; Plaintiffs' reply due 7/14/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND EXPERT WITNESSES granting 149 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Parties to jointly submit a proposed schedule within three business days after the Court rules on the motion to compel. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 RULE 502(D) ORDER REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE OF PRIVILEGED AND PROTECTED INFORMATION by Judge James L. Robart granting 139 Joint Motion. (PM)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting parties leave to file their letter 137 in the form of a joint motion and proposed order; while the motion is pending the court suspends the 2/10/17 deadline for plaintiffs' brief re pre-class certification privilege log challenges by Judge James L. Robart. (RS)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart re parties' 135 joint motion to modify case schedule. The court VACATES the class certification and expert witness briefing schedule and orders parties to propose a briefing schedule on class certification and expert witnesses by 3/3/2017. The court intends to appoint a special master to oversee selected discovery issues. Parties opposing appointment are to file a brief by 12/28/2016. (PM)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart. The court DENIES Microsoft's 62 motion to dismiss, GRANTS Microsoft's 121 motion to establish that the potential liability period under Washington law begins on 9/16/2012, DENIES Plaintiffs' 122 motion to establish that the potential liability period under Washington law begins on 5/14/2011, and ORDERS that in subsequent proceedings, the parties treat 9/16/2012, as the operative date to define the putative class under the WLAD. (AD)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart re 106 Joint Submission regarding the class briefing schedule and Defendant Microsoft's privilege logs. The court adopts the parties' proposed class briefing schedule and extends until 9/2/2016 the deadline for the parties to resolve or submit to the court any privilege log dispute. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moussouris v. Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Moussouris
Represented By: Kelly M Dermody(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Sharon M Lee
Represented By: Anne B. Shaver(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?