Rockin Artwork, LLC v. Bravado, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Rockin Artwork, LLC
Defendant: Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc., Authentic Hendrix, LLC and Experience Hendrix, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv01492
Filed: September 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 151 Motion for relief from enforcement of judgment. However, should Rockin post a supersedeas bond in the amount of $91,043.00, future enforcement of the judgment will be tolled pending appeal. Defendants' 158 Motion to Seal is granted. Docket Number 156-3 shall REMAIN sealed. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting Defendant Bravado International Group MerchandisingServices, Inc.'s 146 Motion for order allowing registration of judgment. The Court ORDERS that Defendants shall be allowed to register the Court's judgment in any other jurisdictions where Rockin's assets may be found, including California and Nevada. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER directing Rockin and its counsel, Eric T. Krening and Thomas T. Osinski, to pay $5,000.00 to Bravado and $5,000.00 to the Hendrix Defendants, for a total of $10,000.00 in sanctions. Awards to be paid within 14 days of this order. Clerk directed to terminating Dkt. No.'s 130 and 132 Motions for Attorney Fees. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER OF DISMISSAL by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour granting Plaintiff Rockin's 125 motion to dismiss claims; the Hendrix Defendants' 122 motion is granted as to their request for sanctions and otherwise dismissed as moot; d enying Rockin's 127 motion for relief from deadline; and dismissing as moot Rockin's 126 motion to stay. All remaining claims in this case are DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to statistically close this case. Upon resolution of all Defendants' fees and costs, this case will be closed. (PM)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour granting Defendant Bravado's 73 Motion for Summary Judgment and 76 Motion for Sanctions. Rockin's claims against Bravado are DISMISSED with prejudice. These claims are also DISMISSED with prejudice as to the Hendrix Defendants to the extent that their liability is based on an agent-principal relationship. (PM)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's 62 Motion to for leave to amend complaint; granting Defendants' 65 , 67 Motions to Compel. Clerk directed to lift the stay on Rockin's 50 MOTION for Extension of Time and 52 MOTION to Compel and to renote these motions for 12/23/2016. Responses due 12/19/2016. Clerk also directed to renote the 73 MOTION for Summary Judgment and the 76 MOTION for Sanctions for 12/23/2016 as well. Rockin may file an additional response to the summary judgment motion by Monday, 12/19/2016. Bravado's reply briefs due 12/23/2016. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rockin Artwork, LLC v. Bravado, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rockin Artwork, LLC
Represented By: Eric T Krening
Represented By: Thomas T Osinski, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Authentic Hendrix, LLC
Represented By: John D. Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experience Hendrix, LLC
Represented By: John D. Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?