iShow.com Inc. v. Lennar Corporation et al
Plaintiff: iShow.com Inc
Defendant: Lennar Corporation and Lennar Pacific Properties Management Inc
Case Number: 2:2015cv01550
Filed: September 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER denying Defendants' 96 Motion to Exclude Testimony from James Brown, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendants' 70 , 82 Motions in Limine ; granting defendants' 62 Motion for Leave Over-length Memorandum ; granting defendants' 66 Motion for Leave to Dismiss its Counterclaims; signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (iShow.com Inc (as counter defendant), Lennar Corporation and Lennar Pacific Properties Management Inc (as counter claimants) terminated.)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 64 Motions in Limine to Exclude Evidence, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER denying defendants' 83 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File 12(c) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Regarding Plaintiff's Second Cause of Action for Common Law Trademark Infringement, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting in part defendants' 59 Motion for Case Management Conference, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying defendants' 41 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' 7 MOTION TO DISMISS, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: iShow.com Inc. v. Lennar Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: iShow.com Inc
Represented By: Mark P Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lennar Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lennar Pacific Properties Management Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?