Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Trans Ocean Seafoods, Inc.
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Trans Ocean Seafoods Inc
Case Number: 2:2015cv01563
Filed: September 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting Plaintiffs-Intervenors' 260 Motion to Quash Attorney Lien. The Court ORDERS that the attorney lien filed Rocke Law Group, PLLC is quashed in relation to any funds owed by Trans Ocean Seafoods, Inc. to Plaintiffs-Intervenors, including, but not limited to, funds in the form of damages, costs, and attorney fees. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (TH)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER Approving Consent Decree re parties' 259 Stipulated Motion. This lawsuit is hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs or attorneys' fees. The Court retains jurisdiction of this matter for purposes of enforcing the Consent Decree approved herein. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (TH)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiffs' 234 Motion for New Trial and for Pretrial Conference; JSR due within 7 days signed by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs-Intervenors' 223 Motion for Leave to File Over-Length Brief in Motion for a New Trial, signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (SWT)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER granting counsel for Trans Ocean's 182 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, consistent with counsel's statements in their Reply Brief, the Court ORDERS that counsel continue representing Trans Ocean throughout the duration of post-trial motions practice; granting Trans Ocean's 225 Motion to Seal. The court will unseal counsel's suppl brief 227 at the conclusion of these proceedings signed by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER denying Defendant Trans Ocean Seafoods, Inc.'s 180 Motion for Attorney Fees, signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (SWT)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 221 JUDGMENT BY JURY TRIAL entered in favor of defendant Trans Ocean Seafoods; court declares a MISTRIAL on EEOC's federal sexual harassment claims seeking relief for Serapia Matamoros and Plaintiff-Intervenor Serapia Matamoros' federal and state sexual harassment claims by Judge Richard A Jones. (RS)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER denying dft Trans Ocean's 91 Motion for Protective Order; denying dft Trans Ocean's 93 Motion for relief from deadline for pretrial order by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS) Modified on 3/8/2017/cc Martinez (RS).
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge Richard A. Jones GRANTING Plaintiffs' 40 Joint MOTION to Compel Rule 34(a)(2) Site Inspection; DENYING Defendant's 49 MOTION to Continue Trial Date, Discovery Cutoff, and Related Deadlines; DENYING Defendant's 52 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Defendant; DENYING Plaintiffs' 55 Motion for Sanctions; DENYING Plaintiffs' 61 Motion to Strike; and GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendant's 68 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and for Sanctions. (VE)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Trans Ocean Seafoods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Carmen Flores
Represented By: Jonathan T Peck
Represented By: Rebecca S. Stith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Ocean Seafoods Inc
Represented By: Kenneth J Diamond
Represented By: Jamie L Stoops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?