Whotoo, Inc v. Dun & Bradstreet, Inc
Plaintiff: Whotoo, Inc.
Defendant: Dun & Bradstreet, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv01629
Filed: October 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting Defendant's 136 Motion to Seal; Show Cause Response due by 8/29/2017 re 144 Motion to Seal, signed by Judge Richard A Jones.(TH)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting in part and denying in part D&B's 129 Motion for Attorney Fees signed by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER within 14 days, D&B to file motion for attorneys' fees by Judge Richard A Jones. (RS)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER striking parties' 60 66 Motions for Summary Judgment; denying defendant's 103 Motion for Relief from Spoliation; ordering parties to comply with requirements outlined in order by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whotoo, Inc v. Dun & Bradstreet, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whotoo, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew N Sachs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dun & Bradstreet, Inc.
Represented By: Brian G Bodine
Represented By: Charles C Huber
Represented By: Adriane Michelle Scola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?