Soderlind v. Haigh et al
Plaintiff: Guy Robert Soderlind, Jr.
Defendant: Ursula J. Haigh, Terence S. Haigh, Christine Annette Barton, Cynthia Sue Hart, City of Burien, King County, John C. Holland, Jane Doe Holland, Erin M. Garza, John Doe Garza, John Doe Mansanaerez, Jane Doe Mansanaerez and John Does 1 through 20
Case Number: 2:2015cv01655
Filed: October 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER denying plaintiff's 155 Motion to Amend Judgment, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting defendants Terence S. Haigh, Ursula J. Haigh, Rehberg Law Group, PLLC's 81 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting defendant Christine Annette Barton's 83 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claims seeking a declaration of state law are REMANDED to King County Superior Court. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Per LCR 3(I), case will be remanded 14 days from the date of this Order, on 5/25/2018. (SWT)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting parties' 64 Stipulated Motion For Withdrawal and Substitution fo Counsel; Attorneys Andrew J. Kinstler and Matthew V Pierce substitute Attorneys Theresa A Goetz and Charles A Lyman for Christine Annette Barton. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 55 Stipulated Motion for Plaintiff to file his Third Amended Complaint by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. The City of Burien's motion for partial summary judgment (Dkt. # 26 ), in which plaintiff joins (Dkt. # 28 ), is GRANTED. (AD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soderlind v. Haigh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy Robert Soderlind, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Gregory Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ursula J. Haigh
Represented By: Theresa A Goetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terence S. Haigh
Represented By: Theresa A Goetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Annette Barton
Represented By: Theresa A Goetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Sue Hart
Represented By: Theresa A Goetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Burien
Represented By: Kimberly Y. Frederick
Represented By: Soojin E Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County
Represented By: Kimberly Y. Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C. Holland
Represented By: Kimberly Y. Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Holland
Represented By: Kimberly Y. Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin M. Garza
Represented By: Kimberly Y. Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Garza
Represented By: Kimberly Y. Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Mansanaerez
Represented By: Kimberly Y. Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Mansanaerez
Represented By: Kimberly Y. Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?