Verdiyan v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Georgiy Verdiyan
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 2:2015cv01680
Filed: October 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's third declaration in support of an award of attorney fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act ("EAJA") (Dkt. No. 30 ). The Court previously granted Plaintiff's motion for attorney fees pursuant to EAJA. (Dkt. No. 29 ). However, the Court declined to include in its award the time spent by Plaintiff's counsel on its reply brief because Plaintiff provided conflicting information about the total number of hours exp ended. The Court then ordered Plaintiff to file detailed documentation of the hours expended. Based on the declaration, and consistent with its prior order granting Plaintiff's motion, the Court AWARDS Plaintiff attorney fees of $8,390.17 and expenses of $2.97. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting plaintiff's 21 Motion for Attorney Fees; Plaintiff is ORDERED to submit detailed documentation of the hours worked to prepare the reply brief for this motion within two weeks. Once those are submitted, the Court will award the full attorney fees amount requested by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 26 Motion for Extension of Time to File EAJA Reply Brief. Plaintiff's 21 MOTION for Attorney Fees for EAJA Fees and Expenses is RE-NOTED for 3/31/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (swt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verdiyan v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgiy Verdiyan
Represented By: Eitan Kassel Yanich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?