Talking Rain Beverage Company Inc v. DS Services of America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Talking Rain Beverage Company Inc
Defendant: DS Services of America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv01804
Filed: November 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting 145 Stipulated Motion to file documents under seal signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting defendant's 117 Supplemental Motion to seal certain documents; The Clerk SHALL unseal Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 97 which shall remain noted for consideration on July 28, 2017, and shall replace the redacted version of the motion at dkt 96 ; no later than 3 days, plaintiff shall file an unredacted version of the Decl of Christopher Hall and publically file exhibits 1-7,16-19 and 41 signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendant's 105 Motion to file documents under seal; Exhibit E to the Decl of A. Grady shall remain under seal; plaintiff to file a supplemental motion to seal, noted for the same day filed and no response shall be filed signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting 87 Stipulated Motion to modify revised order setting trial date and related dates by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting Defendant's 82 Motion to File Under Seal; DS Services is permitted to file under seal Defendant's Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting defendant's 70 Motion to Compel; granting defendant's 72 Motion for Relief from Deadline by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Talking Rain Beverage Company Inc v. DS Services of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Talking Rain Beverage Company Inc
Represented By: William C Rava
Represented By: Robert J Shaughnessy(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Holly Marie Simpkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DS Services of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?