Garcia v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Plaintiff: Juanita Garcia
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv01808
Filed: November 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT re: Plaintiff's 109 MOTION for final approval of class action settlement; re: Plaintiff's 103 MOTION for award of attorneys' fees, expenses, and incentive award. The settlement consideration prov ided under the Settlement Agreement of $3,875,000 constitutes fair value given to in exchange for the release of the Released Claims against the Released Persons. The Court finds that the Attorneys Fees of $968,750 and Expenses of $16 ,383.53 awarded to Class Counsel identified in order is fair and reasonable under both a common fund approach and a lodestar approach. Judgment is hereby ENTERED for purposes of Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 58 and 79, and the time period for filing any notice of appeal shall commence on the date of entry of this Final Order and Judgment. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (See order for details) (PM)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STIPULATION AND ORDER to File Over-Length Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees re parties' 102 Stipulation, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MINUTE ORDER pursuant to parties' 100 Stipulated Motion; modifying the Court's 99 Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; continuing Final Approval Hearing to 10/17/2018 at 10:00 AM. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 92 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Certifying Class for Settlement Purposes, Directing the Issuance of Class Notice, and Scheduling a Final Approval Hearing, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 96 Stipulation; RENOTING Plaintiff's 92 MOTION for preliminary approval of class certification and class action settlement : Noting Date 4/9/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MINUTE ORDER deferring and RENOTING Plaintiff's 92 MOTION for Preliminary Class Certification and Class Action Settlement: Noting Date 3/30/2018, Parties are DIRECTED to file on or before the new noting date one supplemental brief not to ex ceed twenty (20) pages ; striking as moot Plaintiff's 91 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; administratively striking Plaintiff's 49 SEALED MOTION for Class Certification. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 89 Joint Status Report and Stipulated Request to Extend Stay of Case: The stay of this case is EXTENDED to 12/11/2017; plaintiff's 49 SEALED MOTION to for Class Certification is RENOTED to 12/11/2017; On or before 12/11/2017, the parties shall file a motion for preliminary approval. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MINUTE ORDER extending the STAY of this case to November 27, 2017; RENOTING plaintiff's 49 SEALED MOTION to for Class Certification : Noting Date 11/27/2017; On or before November 27, 2017, the parties shall inform the Court whether settlement has been finalized. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 84 Stipulation ; the stay of this matter be extended through November 13, 2017 to allow the parties to finalize settlement documentation; RENOTING Plaintiff's 49 SEALED MOTION to for Class Certification : Noting Date 11/13/2017, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MINUTE ORDER extending the stay of this case to 10/13/2017; Plaintiff's 49 SEALED MOTION to for Class Certification is RENOTED to 10/13/2017; On or before 10/13/2017, the parties shall inform the Court whether settlement has been finalized, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 80 Motion to Continue Stay/Joint Status Report ; the stay of this case is EXTENDED to September 22, 2017, to allow the parties time to finalize settlement; RENOTING 49 SEALED MOTION to for Class Certification : Noting Date 9/22/2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Stay; RENOTING 49 SEALED MOTION for Class Certification, Noting Date 7/25/2017; On or before 7/25/2017, the Parties shall inform the Court of the outcome of the mediation and, if the case is not resolved, shall submit a joint status report including a proposed trial date and pretrial schedule for the timely completion of this action, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Garcia
Represented By: Clifford A Cantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?