Lyall v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
Plaintiff: Marta D Lyall
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Case Number: 2:2015cv01818
Filed: November 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying defendant's 29 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction; granting plaintiff's 36 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal; dismissing case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER ON REVIEW OF REFUSAL TO RECUSE re Plaintiff's 36 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: Plaintiff's 36 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily; motion referred to Chief Judge Ricardo S Martinez for review, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting plaintiff's 32 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Motion for Summary Judgment; defendant's 29 Motion to Dismiss is renoted for 9/1/2017, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CASE MANANGEMENT ORDER signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Defendant's dispositive motion due by 6/30/2017, Plaintiff's combined opposition and cross-motion for dispositive relief due by 7/21/2017, Defendant's combined reply and opposition due by 8/11/2017, Plaintiff's reply due by 8/25/2017. The dispositive cross-motions shall be noted on the Court's calendar for 8/25/2017. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 24 is DENIED as moot. (KERR)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REQUIRING SUBMISSION OF JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. All counsel and any pro se parties are directed to confer and provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report (the "Report") by 6/16/2017. (SWT)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (Attorney Brendan Wesley Donckers terminated.) (SWT) (cc Plaintiff via email through CM/ECF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyall v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marta D Lyall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?