Seattle Times Company v. LeatherCare, Inc.
Plaintiff: Seattle Times Company
Defendant: LeatherCare, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv01901
Filed: December 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9613
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 359 MINUTE ORDER: The United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit having issued its mandate in Nos. 18-35773, 18-35966, 19-35056, 19-35068, 19-35252, and 19-35433, and the Judgment entered on August 15, 2018, in Case No. C15-1901, docket no. 2 71, and the Supplemental Judgment entered on April 17, 2019, in Case No. C15-1901, docket no. 337, having been affirmed, the Court hereby ORDERS as follows: The request for an extension of time to tax costs made by Touchstone SLU LLC and TB T S/RELP LLC ("Touchstone"), in Case No. C15-1901, docket no. 281 , which was stayed pending Touchstone's unsuccessful appeal from the Minute Order entered October 16, 2018, in Case No. C15-1901, docket no. 288 , see Minute Order at 1(a) (C15-1901, docket no. 311 ), is DENIED. The parties in Case No. C15-1901 are DIRECTED to file a Joint Status Report within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Minute Order indicating why the stay of execution of the Judgment and Supplemental Judgment described above should not be lifted forthwith. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's 348 Motion for Stay of Execution, or Alternatively, Clarification of the Judgment; granting Seattle Times and Steven Ritt's 352 Stipulated Motion to Stay Execution of Supplemental Judgment Entered on April 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER granting LeatherCare, Inc.'s 339 Unopposed Motion to Stay of Execution of Judgment. LeatherCare, Inc. shall post bond within 21 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER striking in part (as to costs and/or litigation expenses), granting in part and denying in part plaintiff Steven Ritt's 321 Motion for Attorney Fees; awarding reasonable attorneys' fees as follows (See Order for details); directing Clerk to enter supplemental judgment consistent with 328 Order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER granting in part and denying in part third-party defendant Touchstone's 281 Motion for Attorneys' Fees; awarding Touchstone reasonable attorneys' fees as follows: (i) Seattle Times shall pay Touchstone reasonable attorneys 9; fees in the amount of $398,889.73; and (ii) LeatherCare shall pay Touchstone reasonable attorneys' fees in the amount of $446,746.53; directing Clerk to enter supplemental judgment consistent with this Order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 313 MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff Seattle Times Company's 286 Motion for designation as a prevailing party; granting in part and denying in part Defendants LeatherCare, Inc. and Ritt's 287 Motion for designation as a prevailing party. On or before February 14, 2019, Ritt shall file any motion for attorneys' fees. Any separate motion by Ritt to tax costs shall also be filed by February 14, 2019. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 311 MINUTE ORDER staying Touchstone's request for an extension of time to tax costs pending a decision in the US Court of Appeals in Case No. 19-35966; striking, without prejudice to refiling, Touchstone's 307 Motion for Bill of Costs. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: USCA, Deputy in Charge via ad hoc)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 288 MINUTE ORDER denying third-party defendants' 274 Motion for Clarification treated as a Motion to Amend Court's Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law; striking third-party defendant Touchstone's 281 Motion for Attorney Fees for Prejudgment Interest and Costs. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Ninth Circuit via ad hoc)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 273 MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff Seattle Times Company's and Third-Party Defendants Touchstone SLU LLC's and TB TS/RELP LLC's 272 Motion to Stay Deadline for Appeal. The Court LIFTS the stay and orders that the deadline for T ouchstone SLU LLC and TB TS/RELP LLC to file a motion for attorney's fees is October 12, 2018. The Court LIFTS the stay and orders that the deadline for Seattle Times Company and/or LeatherCare, Inc. to file any motion is October 12, 2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 270 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. The claim under CERCLA asserted by Seattle Times against LeatherCare is DISMISSED; The claims under CERCLA and MTCA asserted by Seattle Times against Steven Ritt and the marital community composed of Steve n Ritt and Laurie Rosen-Ritt are DISMISSED; The claim under MTCA asserted by Seattle Times against LeatherCare for recovery of costs ($348,087) associated with the soil vapor extraction system designed, installed, and operated by AECOM is DISMISSED; Directing the Clerk to enter judgment consistent with this Order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly (SWT)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 251 MINUTE ORDER. The Court OVERRULES defendants' objection and ADMITS for all purposes Exhibit No. 2 (Trial Ex. No. 199) to the deposition transcript of Lawrence Rowley, docket no. 145 . Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 PRETRIAL ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MINUTE ORDER granting defendants' 114 Unopposed Motion to Redact Transcript of the hearing held on October 12, 2017; The unredacted version of the transcript, docket no. 112 , shall remain under seal. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT) (cc: Court Reporter)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 100 Stipulation to Withdraw Jury Demand ; plaintiff's jury demand is STRICKEN, and this matter is set for a bench trial. The pretrial order and trial briefs remain due on October 23, 2017. In lieu of proposed voir dire and proposed jury instructions, the parties shall submit proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law by October 23, 2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTE ORDER authorized byJudge Thomas S. Zilly. Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment, docket no. 73 , is DENIED. Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment, docket no. 79 , is DENIED. The parties are directed to file briefs, not to exceed 5 pages in length, by October 11, 2017. (PM)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff Seattle Times Company's 53 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Defendant Steven Ritt's 59 Response/Cross-motion for Summary Judgment, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MINUTE ORDER extending the mediation deadline to October 5, 2017 ; SETTING an in-court status conference for October 12, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. Counsel shall be prepared to address all pending motions. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice parties' 69 Stipulated Motion to Amend the Case Schedule ; A telephonic scheduling conference is SET for Thursday, August 24, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. Counsel shall arrange a conference call among themselves and then contact the Court at (206) 370-8830. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiff's 55 Motion to Strike Rebuttal and Supplemental Report dated 6/9/2017 ; granting in part plaintiff's 55 Alternative Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Expert Reports. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 50 Stipulation on Liability Under CERCLA and MTCA between Leathercare and TB, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 44 Stipulation Extending Deadline for Expert Rebuttal Reports. The deadline for disclosing rebuttal expert testimony is EXTENDED to June 2, 2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 42 Stipulation Modifying Case Schedule; Discovery deadline EXTENDED to 7/17/2017, Expert Witness Disclosure deadline EXTENDED to 4/19/2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seattle Times Company v. LeatherCare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seattle Times Company
Represented By: Jessica K. Ferrell
Represented By: Jeffrey Barnes Kray
Represented By: Meline Grace MacCurdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LeatherCare, Inc.
Represented By: Jo M Flannery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?