National Products, Inc v. Arkon Resources, Inc
Plaintiff: National Products Inc
Defendant: Arkon Resources, Inc
Counter_claimant: Arkon Resources, Inc
Counter_defendant: National Products Inc
Case Number: 2:2015cv01984
Filed: December 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER directing NPI and iBolt to SHOW CAUSE within 10 days of the filing of this order why the court should not transfer the non-patent claims along with the patent claim; GRANTING Defendants Arkon's and High Gear's 107 109 Rule 12 ven ue Motions and transfers NPI's patent case against Arkon to the Central District of California and NPI's patent case against High Gear to the Middle District of Florida. The court also GRANTS iBolt's Rule 12 venue motion (Dkt. # 111 ) but defers transferring NPI's patent claim against iBolt to the Central District of California until the court receives iBolt's and NPI's responses to the court's order to show cause. The court ORDERS iBolt to file its response to the court's order to show cause in docket number C15-2024JLR. Further, the court ORDERS the parties in NPI's two remaining cases against iBolt and Bracketron, Inc. (Bracketron) to file any further submissions under each case's orig inal filing number. Specifically, the parties in the iBolt matter should file any new submissions under docket number C15-2024JLR and the parties in the Bracketron matter should file any new submissions under docket number C16-0109JLR. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting 125 Stipulated Motion for Revised Discovery Schedule. Noting date for all motions related to discovery pursuant to LCR 7(d)(3) or LCR 37(a) (2) is 5/11/2018; Discovery to be completed by 5/18/2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) (Main Document 126 replaced on 3/2/2018) (PM). Modified on 3/2/2018: Order replaced due to missing pages. Re-sent to counsel. (PM).
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting 104 Stipulated Motion for Revised Schedule. Document Production and Written Fact Discovery Deadlines due 1/9/2018, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 2/2/2018, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 2/23/2018, Discovery Motions due by 3/29/2018, Discovery completed by 4/6/2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting Defendants Arkon Resources, Inc., High Gear Specialties, Inc., Wireless Accessory Solutions, LLC, and Bracketron, Inc.'s 101 Motion for Leave Amend their Non-Infringement and Invalidity Contention. Amended infringement contentions to be served by 11/10/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 97 Motion for Leave to Amend Its Infringement Contentions. National Products Inc. shall serve Defendants with its amended infringement contentions within 14 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER signed by Judge James L. Robart. (see order for details) (PM)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 77 Stipulated Motion for withdrawal and substitution of counsel for Defendant High Gear Specialties, Inc. Attorneys Daniel Velloth, Thomas Kautz and Rodney L Umberger, Jr. withdrawing and James Erik Breitenbucher substituting. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 73 Stipulated Motion for Revised Schedule as follows: Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement (LPR 132) due 7/10/2017, Simultaneous Opening Markman Briefs (LPR 134) due 7/20/2017, Simultaneous Responsive Markman Briefs (LP R 134) due 8/10/2017, Markman Hearing set for 9/19/2017 at 9:00 a.m., Reports from expert witnesses under FRCP 26(a)(2) due 12/1/2017, Rebuttal expert reports due 12/22/2017, Discovery Motions due by 1/26/2018, Discovery completed by 2/1/2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER setting Markman Hearing for 9/19/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge James L. Robart. Discovery to be completed by 2/1/2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (swt)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER STAYING CASES PENDING INTER PARTES REVIEW PROCEEDINGS by Judge James L. Robart. The court GRANTS Defendants' motion (Dkt. # 54 ), STAYS the cases pending the decision on Defendants' IPR petition, VACATES all case deadlines after 9/30/2016, and ORDERS the parties to file a joint status report regarding the status of Defendants' IPR petition upon receiving a decision from the PTO or on 3/1/2017, whichever occurs first. (AD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Products, Inc v. Arkon Resources, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Products Inc
Represented By: David K Tellekson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkon Resources, Inc
Represented By: James Erik Breitenbucher
Represented By: Marc A Karish(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Jayson W Sowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Arkon Resources, Inc
Represented By: James Erik Breitenbucher
Represented By: Marc A Karish(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Jayson W Sowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: National Products Inc
Represented By: David K Tellekson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?