Toering v. EAN Holdings LLC
Plaintiff: Bruce Toering
Defendant: EAN Holdings LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv02016
Filed: December 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 69 Stipulated Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE ORDER vacating jury trial and all related deadlines. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour granting preliminary approval of class action settlement and attorney fees 64 . The Court appoints Analytics, LLC as the Settlement Administrator. Settlement Hearing set for 8/1/2017 at 09:00 AM before U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour granting Plaintiff's 41 Motion for Class Certification. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toering v. EAN Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAN Holdings LLC
Represented By: Harry James Franklyn Korrell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Toering
Represented By: Adam J Berger
Represented By: Carson Flora
Represented By: Martin S Garfinkel
Represented By: Dmitri Iglitzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?