Block v. Washington State Bar Association et al
Plaintiff: Anne K Block
Defendant: Washington State Bar Association, Linda Eide, Mark Plivilech, Julie Shankland, Kathryn Berger, Allison Sato, Stephanie Bloomfield, Marcia Lynn Damerow Fischer, Marc Silverman, Stephania Camp Denton, Michele Nina Carney, Sara Andeen, Todd R Startzel, S Nia Renei Cottrell, Michael Jon Myers, William Earl Davis, Keith Mason Black, Kevin Bank, Joseph Nappi Jr, John Doe, William McGillin, Doug Ende, Ronald Schaps, Seth Fine, G Geoffrey Gibbs, King County, Cary Coblantz, Port of Seattle, Kali Matuska, Julie Tanga, Sean Gillebo, James Tuttle, City of Duvall, Lori Batiot, Snohomish County, Linda Loen, Crystal Hill Pennington, John Pennington, Kenyon Disend, Michael Kenyon, Ann Marie Soto, Sandra Sullivan, Margaret King, Mark Roe, Sean Reay, Sara DiVittorio, Brian Lewis, Joe Beavers, Sky Valley Media Group LLC, Ronald Fejfar, Lin O'Dell and John Lovick
Case Number: 2:2015cv02018
Filed: December 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER DECLINING TO ISSUE INDICATIVE RULING UNDER RULE 62.1 re Plaintiff's 249 Motion. The Court hereby finds and ORDERS that Plaintiff Anne Block's Motion to Issue Indicative Ruling on a Motion for Relief That is Barred by a Pending Appeal Pursuantto FRCP 62.1 (Dkt. # 249 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) Modified on 3/30/2021: cc to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals (PM).
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 239 Motion to Set Aside Final Decision in This Case. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER REIMPOSING VEXATIOUS LITIGANT PRE-FILING ORDER. The Court finds and orders that any pro se complaint submitted for filing in this District in which Anne Block is a named Plaintiff or purports to act as party representative shall be fi led under the miscellaneous case number, 2:19-mc-163 RSM, and shall be reviewed by the Court prior to the issuance of summons or service of process. Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time (Dkt. # 229 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) cc Intake team
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 227 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 226 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall respond to the Court's Order to Show Cause (Dkt. # 219 ) no later than September 17, 2019. No additional extensions will be granted. Authorized by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MINUTE ORDER denying Defendants' 222 Motion for Reconsideration Regarding Minute Order Granting Extension of Time. Authorized by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 220 Notice of Unavailability and Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiff shall respond to the Court's Order to Show Cause (Dkt. # 219 ) nolater than 8/31/2019. Authorized by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (TH)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE within thirty (30) days of this Order why the Court should not reimpose the vexatious litigant prefiling order vacated by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting Defendants' 205 Motion to Substitute Attorney; withdrawing attorney Paul M. Bintinger for Defendants Port of Seattle, Kali Matuska, Julia Tanga, Sean Gillebo and James Tuttle, and substituting attorney Shannon M. Ragonesi. Signed signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER GRANTING IN PART GOLD BAR DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR FEES AND COSTS by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. Plaintiff shall pay to Gold Bar Defendants' (defense counsel Keating, Bucklin & McCormack, Inc., P.S.) fees in the amount of $16,311.00 and costs in the amount of $17.40, for a total of $16,328.40. (AD)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER denying as moot plaintiff's 85 Motion for TRO; granting John Lovick's 145 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Mr Lovick to submit a supplemental Declaration within 10 days re attorneys' fees by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting 130 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and granting 135 Motion to Dismiss by Chief Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(SSM)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER re 87 Plaintiff's Second MOTION to Disqualify all WSBA members and Martinez filed by Anne K Block. Upon review of Order 134 Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Judge Martinez is DENIED and Judge Martinez's Order Declining to Recuse 134 is AFFIRMED; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 5/3/2016 (DN). (copies emailed to Judge Martinez and chambers staff)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER ON FEES by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff shall pay to Kenyon Disend Defendants fees in the amount of $24,852.75 and costs in the amount of $1084.44, for a total of $25,937.19. (AD)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER denying 93 Motion to Set Aside by Chief Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(SSM)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER denying 100 Motion to Stay by Chief Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(SSM)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting King County dfts' 39 Motion to Dismiss; granting Mark Plivilech's 45 Motion to Dismiss Party; granting Kenyon Disend's 47 Motion for Sanctions, Kenyon Disend dfts shall submit a supplemental declaration; granting WSBA defendants' 51 Motion to Dismiss. Any pro se complaint filed by Anne Block shall be subject to review by the court by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS) cc pro se parties, Intake
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting 23 Motion to Dismiss; granting 28 Motion to Dismiss; granting 30 Motion to Dismiss; granting 35 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Chief Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. cc: Mark Plivilech, William Scheidler, Brandia Taamu and Christy Diemond via U.S. Mail.(SSM)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER re 9 Second MOTION to Disqualify Ricardo Martinez filed by Anne K Block, 25 Order Referring Motion to Disqualify; Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Judge Martinez is DENIED and Judge Martinez's Order Declining to Recuse is AFFIRMED; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying 27 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Recuse; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 3/3/2016 (DN). (cc to Fejfar)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Block v. Washington State Bar Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne K Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Bar Association
Represented By: David W Silke
Represented By: Brittany F Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Eide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Plivilech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Shankland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Sato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Bloomfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia Lynn Damerow Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephania Camp Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Nina Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Andeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd R Startzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Nia Renei Cottrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Jon Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Earl Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Mason Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Nappi Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William McGillin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Ende
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Schaps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Fine
Represented By: Mikolaj T. Tempski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Geoffrey Gibbs
Represented By: Mikolaj T. Tempski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County
Represented By: Geoffrey M Grindeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cary Coblantz
Represented By: Geoffrey M Grindeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Port of Seattle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kali Matuska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Tanga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Gillebo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Tuttle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Duvall
Represented By: Thomas P Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Batiot
Represented By: Thomas P Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snohomish County
Represented By: Mikolaj T. Tempski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Loen
Represented By: Amanda Gabrielle Butler
Represented By: Shannon M Ragonesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Hill Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Pennington
Represented By: Mikolaj T. Tempski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenyon Disend
Represented By: Michael R Kenyon
Represented By: Ann Marie Josephine Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kenyon
Represented By: Michael R Kenyon
Represented By: Ann Marie Josephine Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Marie Soto
Represented By: Michael R Kenyon
Represented By: Ann Marie Josephine Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Sullivan
Represented By: Michael R Kenyon
Represented By: Ann Marie Josephine Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret King
Represented By: Michael R Kenyon
Represented By: Ann Marie Josephine Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Roe
Represented By: Mikolaj T. Tempski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Reay
Represented By: Mikolaj T. Tempski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara DiVittorio
Represented By: Mikolaj T. Tempski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Lewis
Represented By: Mikolaj T. Tempski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Beavers
Represented By: Amanda Gabrielle Butler
Represented By: Shannon M Ragonesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sky Valley Media Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Fejfar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lin O'Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Lovick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?