IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co v. Fellows
Plaintiff: IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co
Defendant: Charles H Fellows
Counter_claimant: Charles H Fellows
Counter_defendant: IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co
Case Number: 2:2015cv02031
Filed: December 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 214 Motion for New Trial; striking as moot Plaintiff's 231 Motion to Stay Execution on the Judgment, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MINUTE ORDER re-noting Defendant Charles H. Fellows's 206 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs (Noting Date RESET for 5/19/2017); striking as moot Plaintiff's 216 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Defendant's Motion for Attorney Fees; granting Plaintiff's 219 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER re 201 Jury Verdict; directing Clerk to enter judgment and close case. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER committing the jury in this case to the custody of a duly sworn bailiff or bailiffs; directing the Clerk to pay for the meals of said jurors, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 196 COURTS JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (Main Document 196 replaced on 4/4/2017) (SWT).
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MINUTE ORDER addressing plaintiff's designations and defendant's cross-designations by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MINUTE ORDER denying in part and deferring in part plaintiff's 156 MOTION to Seal ; Noting Date 3/27/2017. The motion is renoted for first day of trial, 3/27/17; response due 3/26/17; no reply by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS)cc Morgan Mentzer by email
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (swt)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting in part, denying in part and deferring in part defendant's 128 Motion in Limine by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(RS)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's 135 Supplemental Motion in Limine. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MINUTE ORDER denying plaintiff's 116 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying dft Charles Fellow's 118 Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 124 Stipulated Motion for referral to a settlement judge by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(RS)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MINUTE ORDER granting 114 stipulated motion to extend dispositive motions deadline; Dispositive motions due by 1/30/2017 and noted for 2/6/2017; Response due 2/6/2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY 73 75 78 99 MOTIONS by Hon. James P. Donohue.(TF)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting in part and denying in part dft's 50 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying pltf's 60 Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court directs pltf to make a coverage decision and provide written notice to dft within 21 days by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co v. Fellows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co
Represented By: Daniel E Thenell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles H Fellows
Represented By: Ian S Birk
Represented By: William Candler Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Charles H Fellows
Represented By: Ian S Birk
Represented By: William Candler Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: IDS Property Casualty Insurance Co
Represented By: Daniel E Thenell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?