Katze v. Cauce et al
Plaintiff: Michael G Katze
Defendant: Ana Mari Cauce, Gerald J. Baldasty, Cheryl A. Cameron, Paul G. Ramsey, John T. Slattery and James J. Champoux
Case Number: 2:2015cv02035
Filed: December 31, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER. No Joint Status Report having been timely submitted, as required by 61 Minute Order, Court presumes that no issue remains for its determination, and this case is hereby DISMISSED. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)(cc: Plaintiff, Colleen Kinerk via USPS)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER LIFTING STAY; plaintiff is deemed to be proceeding pro se, and counsel for defendants may communicate directly with him; Joint Status Report due by 9/18/2017 indicating whether any issues remain for the Court's determination. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff, Colleen Kinerk via USPS)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER re 58 defendants' status report. This matter shall remain stayed until further order; deadline for plaintiff, if he wishes to be represented by counsel, to arrange for an attorney authorized to practice in this Court to file a not ice of appearance is EXTENDED to 7/31/2017; parties shall file a joint status report within fourteen (14) days after the conclusion of administrative proceedings or by 8/18/2017, whichever occurs earlier. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (cc: Plaintiff, Colleen Kinerk, via USPS)(SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Katze v. Cauce et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael G Katze
Represented By: Jon Howard Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Mari Cauce
Represented By: Laurie Lootens Chyz
Represented By: Mary E Crego
Represented By: Michael J Ewart
Represented By: Louis David Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald J. Baldasty
Represented By: Laurie Lootens Chyz
Represented By: Mary E Crego
Represented By: Michael J Ewart
Represented By: Louis David Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl A. Cameron
Represented By: Laurie Lootens Chyz
Represented By: Mary E Crego
Represented By: Michael J Ewart
Represented By: Louis David Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul G. Ramsey
Represented By: Laurie Lootens Chyz
Represented By: Mary E Crego
Represented By: Michael J Ewart
Represented By: Louis David Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T. Slattery
Represented By: Laurie Lootens Chyz
Represented By: Mary E Crego
Represented By: Michael J Ewart
Represented By: Louis David Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J. Champoux
Represented By: Laurie Lootens Chyz
Represented By: Mary E Crego
Represented By: Michael J Ewart
Represented By: Louis David Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?