Stewart v. Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1
Plaintiff: Stewart and Cynthia Stewart
Defendant: Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1
Case Number: 2:2016cv00020
Filed: January 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER of USCA (17-35557, 17-35579 ) as to #78 Notice of Appeal, filed by Cynthia Stewart, #76 Notice of Appeal, filed by Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1 (CDA)
November 21, 2018 Filing 122 MANDATE of USCA as to #78 Notice of Appeal, filed by Cynthia Stewart, #76 Notice of Appeal, filed by Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1. The judgment of this Court, entered October 30, 2018, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Costs are taxed against the appellant in the amount of $172.90. AFFIRMED (CDA)
October 30, 2018 Filing 121 MEMORANDUM of USCA (NOT THE MANDATE 17-35557,17-35579 ) as to #78 Notice of Appeal, filed by Cynthia Stewart, #76 Notice of Appeal, filed by Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1. AFFIRMED (CDA)
February 9, 2018 Filing 120 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Suzanne Kelly Michael. Filed by Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1. (Michael, Suzanne) Modified Firm Association on 2/12/2018 (DS).
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER of USCA (17-35557, 17-35579) as to #78 Notice of Appeal, filed by Cynthia Stewart, #76 Notice of Appeal, filed by Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1 (CDA)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER of USCA (17-35557, 17-35579) as to #78 Notice of Appeal, filed by Cynthia Stewart, #76 Notice of Appeal, filed by Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1 (CDA)
November 10, 2017 Filing 117 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Cindy M. Lin for Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1. (Lin, Cindy)
November 9, 2017 Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kathleen A Kline on behalf of Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1. (Kline, Kathleen)
October 12, 2017 Filing 115 AMENDED Notice of Appeal as to #76 Notice of Appeal, #105 AMENDED Notice of Appeal by Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1. (cc: USCA) (Talmadge, Philip)
October 11, 2017 Filing 114 CORRECTED ORDER ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES re: Plaintiff's #106 Motion to correct order on attorney fees. The Court finds the lodestar-as presented by Stewart, but without a contingency multiplier-is reasonable. The Court otherwise overrules the PUD's objections to Stewart's fee request. The Court GRANTS IN PART Stewart's motion for fees #80 . The Court awards Stewart a total of $1,182,298.30, plus interest (see order for details). Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
September 11, 2017 Filing 113 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Bench trial, vol. 5 held on 5/12/2017 before Judge John C. Coughenour.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Nancy Bauer, nancy_bauer@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8506. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/11/2017, (NB)
September 8, 2017 Filing 112 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Bench trial, vol. 4 held on 5/11/2017 before Judge John C. Coughenour.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Nancy Bauer, nancy_bauer@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8506. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/7/2017, (NB)
September 8, 2017 Filing 111 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Bench trial, vol. 3 held on 5/10/2017 before Judge John C. Coughenour.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Nancy Bauer, nancy_bauer@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8506. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/7/2017, (NB)
September 8, 2017 Filing 110 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Bench trial, vol. 2 held on 5/9/2017 before Judge John C. Coughenour.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Nancy Bauer, nancy_bauer@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8506. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/7/2017, (NB)
September 8, 2017 Filing 109 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Bench trial, vol. 1 held on 5/8/2017 before Judge John C. Coughenour.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Nancy Bauer, nancy_bauer@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8506. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/7/2017, (NB)
August 31, 2017 Filing 108 STATEMENT of Plaintiff re #106 MOTION Correct Order on Motion for Attorney Fees (Dkt. 104) by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Chamberlain, Katherine)
August 24, 2017 Filing 107 MINUTE ORDER re Plaintiff's #106 MOTION to Correct Order on Motion for Attorney Fees (Dkt. 104). The Court directs Plaintiff to submit a more concise set of supporting documentation by Thursday, August 31, 2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
August 23, 2017 Filing 106 MOTION Correct Order on Motion for Attorney Fees (Dkt. 104) , filed by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/8/2017, (Chamberlain, Katherine)
August 22, 2017 Filing 105 AMENDED Notice of Appeal as to #76 Notice of Appeal, by Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1. (cc: USCA) (Talmadge, Philip)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER overruling the PUD's objections to Stewart's fee request; granting in part Stewart's #80 Motion for Attorney Fees signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
August 11, 2017 Filing 103 Second DECLARATION of Paul Torelli filed by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart re #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Tax Consequences, and Interest (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Paul Torelli)(Shaeffer, Joseph)
August 11, 2017 Filing 102 DECLARATION of Terri Flink filed by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart re #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Tax Consequences, and Interest (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Terri Flink)(Shaeffer, Joseph)
August 11, 2017 Filing 101 DECLARATION of Katherine Chamberlain filed by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart re #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Tax Consequences, and Interest (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Katiherine Chamberlain)(Shaeffer, Joseph)
August 11, 2017 Filing 100 DECLARATION of Sam Kramer filed by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart re #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Tax Consequences, and Interest (Shaeffer, Joseph)
August 11, 2017 Filing 99 DECLARATION of Joe Shaeffer filed by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart re #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Tax Consequences, and Interest (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Joe Shaeffer)(Shaeffer, Joseph)
August 11, 2017 Filing 98 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart, TO RESPONSE to #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Tax Consequences, and Interest (Shaeffer, Joseph)
August 10, 2017 Filing 97 MINUTE ORDER overruling Plaintiff's #96 Objections to the notice of supersedeas bond. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
August 9, 2017 Filing 96 OBJECTIONS re #89 Notice-Other Plaintiff's Objection to Notice of Supersedeas by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart (Shaeffer, Joseph)
August 9, 2017 Filing 95 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1 for proceedings held on 05/08/2017,05/09/2017,05/10/2017,05/11/2017,05/12/2017, Requesting Attorney: Cindy M. Lin. (Lin, Cindy)
August 8, 2017 Filing 94 Proposed Findings of Fact by Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1 (Lin, Cindy)
August 7, 2017 Filing 93 DECLARATION of William Partin filed by Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1 re #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Tax Consequences, and Interest (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lin, Cindy)
August 7, 2017 Filing 92 DECLARATION of Kenneth Kagan filed by Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1 re #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Tax Consequences, and Interest (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lin, Cindy)
August 7, 2017 Filing 91 DECLARATION of Cindy M. Lin filed by Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1 re #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Tax Consequences, and Interest (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Lin, Cindy)
August 7, 2017 Filing 90 RESPONSE, by Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1, to #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Tax Consequences, and Interest. (Lin, Cindy)
July 31, 2017 Filing 89 NOTICE of Supersedeas ; filed by Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1. (Lin, Cindy)
July 31, 2017 Filing 88 Supplemental DECLARATION of Joe Shaeffer filed by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart re #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Tax Consequences, and Interest (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Shaeffer, Joseph)
July 21, 2017 Filing 87 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Tax Consequences, and Interest Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Re. Pltf's Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs, Adverse Tax Consequences, Interest (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Shaeffer, Joseph)
July 21, 2017 Filing 86 DECLARATION of Paul Torelli, PhD filed by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart re #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Tax Consequences, and Interest (Shaeffer, Joseph)
July 21, 2017 Filing 85 DECLARATION of Toby J. Marshall filed by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart re #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Tax Consequences, and Interest (Shaeffer, Joseph)
July 21, 2017 Filing 84 DECLARATION of Kathleen Phair Barnard filed by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart re #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Tax Consequences, and Interest (Shaeffer, Joseph)
July 21, 2017 Filing 83 DECLARATION of Sam Kramer filed by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart re #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Tax Consequences, and Interest (Shaeffer, Joseph)
July 21, 2017 Filing 82 DECLARATION of Katherine Chamberlain filed by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart re #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Tax Consequences, and Interest (Shaeffer, Joseph)
July 21, 2017 Filing 81 DECLARATION of Joe Shaeffer filed by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart re #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Tax Consequences, and Interest (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Shaeffer, Joseph)
July 21, 2017 Filing 80 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Tax Consequences, and Interest, filed by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart. Noting Date 8/11/2017, (Shaeffer, Joseph)
July 17, 2017 Filing 79 TIME SCHEDULE ORDER (17-35557, 17-35579) as to #78 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Cynthia Stewart, #76 Notice of Appeal, filed by Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1 (CDA)
July 17, 2017 Filing 78 NOTICE OF Cross APPEAL to Ninth Circuit (17-35579) by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart. Filing Fee $505, Receipt number 0981-4946613. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 and 2 to Notice of Cross-Appeal)(Shaeffer, Joseph) Modified on 7/17/2017 to add CCA #(CDA).
July 11, 2017 Attorney Philip A Talmadge added for Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1 per #75 Notice of Attorney Association. (PM)
July 10, 2017 Filing 77 TIME SCHEDULE ORDER (17-35557) as to #76 Notice of Appeal filed by Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1 (CDA)
July 10, 2017 Filing 76 NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit (17-35557) re #73 Judgment by Court, #72 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1. Filing Fee $505, Receipt number 0981-4936362. (Tribe, Sidney) Modified on 7/10/2017 to add CCA # (CDA).
July 10, 2017 Filing 75 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Philip Talmadge and Sidney Charlotte Tribe on behalf of Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1. (Tribe, Sidney) Modified on 7/11/2017 to add Philip Talmadge (PM).
July 10, 2017 Filing 74 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Sidney Charlotte Tribe on behalf of Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1. (Tribe, Sidney)
June 21, 2017 Filing 73 JUDGMENT BY COURT in Stewart's favor on the WLAD claims and in the PUD's favor on the FMLA/WFLA claims. On the WLAD claims, the Court awards $1,805,953.78 in economic damages and $10,000.00 in emotional damages, for a total of $1,815,953.78. Within 30 days of entry of judgment, Stewart may move for recovery of any tax consequences of this award as well as an award of pre- and post-judgment interest and reasonable attorney fees and costs (RS)
June 21, 2017 Filing 72 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (RS)
May 26, 2017 Filing 71 Proposed Findings of Fact by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart (Chamberlain, Katherine)
May 26, 2017 Filing 70 TRIAL BRIEF (POST-TRIAL) by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart. (Chamberlain, Katherine)
May 26, 2017 Filing 69 Proposed Findings of Fact by Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Michael, Suzanne)
May 26, 2017 Filing 68 TRIAL BRIEF in Closing by Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1. (Michael, Suzanne)
May 12, 2017 Filing 67 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour; CRD: Paul Pierson; Plaintiff's Counsel: Joseph Schaeffer, Kate Chamberlain & Sam Kramer; Defense Counsel: Suzanne Michael & Cindy Lin; Court Reporter: Nancy Bauer; Time of Hearing: 10:00 a.m.; Courtroom: 16206;Court Trial - DAY 5 was held and concluded on 5/12/2017. Witness Dr. Paul Torelli was called, sworn and testified. Exhibits #56, #57, #58 & #59 were identified and admitted into evidence. Both parties rest. The Court directed counsel to file their respective proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law in 2 weeks and advised the parties that an Order will issue thereafter. (PP)
May 11, 2017 Filing 66 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour; CRD: Paul Pierson; Plaintiff's Counsel: Joseph Schaeffer, Kate Chamberlain & Sam Kramer; Defense Counsel: Suzanne Michael & Cindy Lin; CR: Nancy Bauer; Time of Hearing: 9:00 am; Courtroom: 16206;Bench Trial was held on 5/11/2017 - DAY 4. Witnesses called, sworn and testified: Suzette Nielson & Cynthia Stewart. Exhibit identified and admitted into evidence: 52. The Court ordered parties to return for further proceedings on 5/12/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
May 10, 2017 Filing 65 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour; CRD: Paul Pierson; Plaintiff's Counsel: Joseph Schaeffer, Kate Chamberlain & Sam Kramer; Defense Counsel: Suzanne Michael & Cindy Lin; CR: Nancy Bauer; Time of Hearing: 9:00 am; Courtroom: 16206;Court Trial was held on 5/10/2017 - DAY 3. Witnesses called, sworn and testified: Dr. Phillip Smith, Dr. Lawrence Murphy, Dr. Daniel Krashin, Cyndy Nance and Cynthia Stewart. Exhibits identified and admitted into evidence: 53, A9, A28, A30 & A129. The Court ordered parties to return for further proceedings on 5/11/2017 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
May 9, 2017 Filing 64 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour; CRD: Paul Pierson; Plaintiff's Counsel: Joseph Schaeffer, Kate Chamberlain & Sam Kramer; Defense Counsel: Suzanne Michael & Cindy Lin; CR: Nancy Bauer; Time of Hearing: 10:30 am - 4:00 pm; Courtroom: 16206;Court Trial was held on 5/9/2017 - DAY 2. Witnesses called, sworn and testified: Brad Kime, Kristi Treckeme, Neil Bennett, Sarah Scott, Derek Hermann, Amy Murray and Lynne Wheeler. Exhibits identified and admitted into evidence: 62, 63, 66, A2, A4, A5, A6, A14, A15 & A29. The Court ordered parties to return at 10:00 a.m. on 5/10/17 for further court trial proceedings. (PP) Modified on 5/11/2017 (PP).
May 9, 2017 ** Court Trial is continued to 5/10/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour **(PP)
May 8, 2017 Filing 63 PRETRIAL ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (RS)
May 8, 2017 Filing 62 DEPOSITION/EXHIBIT RECEIPT admitted (RS)
May 8, 2017 Filing 61 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour; CRD: Paul Pierson; Plaintiff's Counsel: Joseph Schaeffer, Kate Chamberlain & Sam Kramer; Defense Counsel: Suzanne Michael & Cindy Lin; CR: Nancy Bauer; Time of Hearing: 10:00 a.m. - 3:45 p.m.; Courtroom: 16206;Court Trial began on 5/8/2017 - DAY 1. Court granted counsel's oral motion to admit all of the stipulated exhibits: 1-5, 8, 11, 12, 14-28, 30-33, 35-44, 46-48, 50, 51, 54, 60, 64, 65, A10-A13, A41, A16 & A17. Counsel presented their opening statements. Witnesses called, sworn and testified: Sara Kurtz, David Underwood, Aaron Janisko & John Gregory. Exhibits identified and admitted: 10, 29, 34, 49 & A1. Court ordered parties to return for further court trial proceedings at 9:30 a.m. on 5/9/17. (PP) Modified on 5/11/2017 (PP).
May 8, 2017 ** Court Trial is set for 5/9/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour ** (PP)
May 3, 2017 Filing 60 DECLARATION of Cindy M. Lin re #59 Brief - Responsive by Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1 (Michael, Suzanne)
May 3, 2017 Filing 59 RESPONSIVE BRIEF re #55 Trial Brief by Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1. (Michael, Suzanne)
May 2, 2017 Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER allowing litigants to bring food and drink into the courthouse for the duration of the trial, which begins on 5/8/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
May 1, 2017 Filing 57 TRIAL BRIEF by Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1. (Michael, Suzanne)
May 1, 2017 Filing 56 Proposed Pretrial Order by Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit James West Designations Counterdesignations and Objections)(Lin, Cindy)
May 1, 2017 Filing 55 TRIAL BRIEF of Plaintiff by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart. (Kramer, Samuel)
March 3, 2017 Filing 54 MINUTE ORDER: The Bench Trial is continued to 5/8/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. Motions in Limine due by 5/1/2017, Proposed pretrial order due by 5/1/2017, Trial briefs to be submitted by 5/1/2017. Objections or responses due 5/3/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (RM)
February 13, 2017 Filing 53 SEALED ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour granting in part and denying in part Stewart's #24 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment; denying PUD's #26 MOTION for Summary Judgment and granting in part and denying in part the #20 MOTION to Quash. (PM) cc: order emailed to counsel
January 11, 2017 Filing 52 MINUTE ORDER directing parties to deliver paper copies of their summary judgment materials to the Clerk's Office no later than Tuesday, January 17, 2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
January 10, 2017 Filing 51 REDACTION to #39 Declaration, of Sam Kramer, Exhibits 47, 48, and 50 by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart (Kramer, Samuel)
January 9, 2017 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #39 Declaration: SEALED Exhibits 36-54 to Declaration (Attachment #4) per phone call from counsel. Redacted exhibits to be filed. (PM)
January 6, 2017 Filing 50 DECLARATION of Cindy M. Lin filed by Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1 re #26 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Michael, Suzanne)
January 6, 2017 Filing 49 REPLY, filed by Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1, TO RESPONSE to #26 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Michael, Suzanne)
January 6, 2017 Filing 48 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart, TO RESPONSE to #24 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Shaeffer, Joseph)
January 6, 2017 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Joe Shaeffer filed by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart re #20 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena (Shaeffer, Joseph)
January 6, 2017 Filing 46 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart, TO RESPONSE to #20 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena (Shaeffer, Joseph)
January 5, 2017 Filing 45 PRAECIPE re #44 Praecipe-Other by Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1 (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Michael, Suzanne)
January 5, 2017 Filing 44 PRAECIPE re #35 Response to Motion, #26 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1 (Michael, Suzanne)
January 3, 2017 Filing 43 RESPONSE, by Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1, to #24 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Michael, Suzanne)
January 3, 2017 Filing 42 DECLARATION of Brad Kime filed by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart re #26 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Kramer, Samuel)
January 3, 2017 Filing 41 DECLARATION of Dr. Dan Krashin filed by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart re #26 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Kramer, Samuel)
January 3, 2017 Filing 40 DECLARATION of Cynthia Stewart filed by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart re #26 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Kramer, Samuel)
January 3, 2017 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Sam Kramer filed by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart re #26 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21 to 23, #2 Exhibit 24, #3 Exhibit 25 to 35, #4SEALED Exhibit 36 to 54)(Kramer, Samuel) Modified on 1/9/2017 to seal per phone call from counsel. Redacted exhibits to be filed(PM).
January 3, 2017 Filing 38 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart, to #26 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Oral Argument Requested. (Kramer, Samuel)
December 15, 2016 Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER renoting Plaintiff's #20 MOTION to Quash Subpoena for 1/6/2016, the same date as the motion for summary judgment #26 . This will allow the Court to determine whether the subpoena issue is still live after the summary judgment resolution. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
December 14, 2016 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Cindy M. Lin filed by Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1 re #20 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena (Michael, Suzanne)
December 14, 2016 Filing 35 RESPONSE, by Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1, to #20 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Michael, Suzanne)
December 14, 2016 Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER granting #28 Stipulated Motion to seal. Docket Numbers 29 through 33 shall REMAIN sealed. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
December 13, 2016 Filing 33 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1 re #28 Stipulated MOTION to Seal , #27 Declaration (Michael, Suzanne)
December 13, 2016 Filing 32 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1 re #28 Stipulated MOTION to Seal , #27 Declaration (Michael, Suzanne)
December 13, 2016 Filing 31 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1 re #28 Stipulated MOTION to Seal , #27 Declaration (Michael, Suzanne)
December 13, 2016 Filing 30 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1 re #28 Stipulated MOTION to Seal , #27 Declaration (Michael, Suzanne)
December 13, 2016 Filing 29 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1 re #28 Stipulated MOTION to Seal , #27 Declaration (Michael, Suzanne)
December 13, 2016 Filing 28 Stipulated MOTION to Seal by Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/23/2016, (Michael, Suzanne)
December 13, 2016 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Cindy M. Lin filed by Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1 re #26 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Michael, Suzanne)
December 13, 2016 Filing 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/6/2017, (Michael, Suzanne)
December 13, 2016 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Sam Kramer filed by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart re #24 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Sam Kramer, #2 Exhibit 2 to 8 to Declaration of Sam Kramer, #3 Exhibit 9 to 15 to Declaration of Sam Kramer, #4 Exhibit 16 to 20 to Declaration of Sam Kramer)(Kramer, Samuel)
December 13, 2016 Filing 24 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/6/2017, (Kramer, Samuel)
December 9, 2016 Filing 23 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Joseph R Shaeffer for Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart from December 19, 2016 to January 2, 2017. (Shaeffer, Joseph)
December 8, 2016 Filing 22 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #20 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena (Shaeffer, Joseph)
December 8, 2016 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Joe Shaeffer filed by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart re #20 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena (Shaeffer, Joseph)
December 8, 2016 Filing 20 MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart. Noting Date 12/16/2016, (Shaeffer, Joseph)
December 1, 2016 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Samuel John Lunde Kramer on behalf of Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart. (Kramer, Samuel)
October 19, 2016 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour granting #17 Stipulated Motion to continue discovery deadlines for the purposes of conducting depositions and, if necessary, motions practice. Deadline extended to 12/13/2016. (PM)
October 18, 2016 Filing 17 Stipulated MOTION to Continue Certain Discovery Deadlines by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart. Noting Date 10/19/2016, (Shaeffer, Joseph)
June 22, 2016 Filing 16 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Joseph R Shaeffer for Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart from July 16 - July 31, 2016. (Shaeffer, Joseph)
April 12, 2016 Filing 15 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE held before United States District Judge John C. Coughenour; Courtroom Deputy Clerk Paul Pierson; Court Reporter Andrea Ramirez; Plaintiff(s) Counsel Joseph Shaeffer & Katie Chamberlain; Defendant(s) Counsel Cindy Lin. The case was called and counsel made their appearance. The Court inquires of counsel concerning their desired trial date and time estimate for trial. Note that all depositions, discovery and perpetuation, must be completed before the discovery completion date. Counsel are advised that this case is one of several cases set for the week described below. Counsel shall be prepared to commence trial as scheduled, but understand that the trial may have to be continued. Counsel are directed to contact the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at paul_pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov 2-4 weeks in advance of the trial date regarding the Court`s trial calendar. Case management dates are established as follows: 5 day estimate for a COURT TRIAL set on 3/13/2017 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour; Proposed Pretrial Order is due by 3/3/2017; Pleading amendment/3rd pty action is/are due by 9/2/2016; 39.1 mediation shall be completed by 9/2/2016; Trial briefs will be submitted by 3/8/2017; discovery cutoff is 120 days before trial, and the dispositive motion filing deadline is 90 days before trial.Counsel shall attend Courtroom Technology Training at least 1 month in advance of the trial date in order to become familiar utilizing the A/V equipment now available in the courtroom. Training is held at 3:00 p.m. on the 1st and 3rd Wednesday of each month in Courtroom 18B.(PP)
March 23, 2016 Filing 14 PROTECTIVE ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (CDA)
March 22, 2016 Filing 13 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order by parties (Michael, Suzanne)
February 8, 2016 Filing 12 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint for Damages by Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1.(Michael, Suzanne)
January 28, 2016 Attorney Cindy M. Lin added for Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1 per #11 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
January 28, 2016 NOTICE to Filer re #11 Notice of Appearance: ATTORNEY NOT ADMITTED TO PRACTICE:Counsel, KATHLEEN KLINE is not admitted to practice in the U.S. District Court, Western District of Washington. Counsel must file an Attorney Admission Petition form and register for ECF. These forms can be found under the Attorneys tab/Attorney Admissions on our courts website - wawd.uscourts.gov. If you have any questions about e-filing, registration or training, please call the ECF Support Desk at 1-866-232-9293. After you have been admitted to practice before this court, please promptly file a notice of appearance in this case pursuant to LCR 83.2 to ensure that you are added to the docket as an attorney of record and receive notice of case filings. Thank you. (PM)
January 27, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Suzanne Kelly Michael on behalf of Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1. (Michael, Suzanne)
January 26, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #7 Notice of Appearance filed on 1/25/2016 was improperly signed by Cindy M. Lin and Kathleen A. Kline. As such, one or more attorneys were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Pursuant to FRCP Rule 11 and LCR 83.2(a), signatures must comply with Section III(L) of the Electronic Filing Procedures, which states, "An electronically filed pleading or other document which requires an attorney's signature must have the signors' names printed or typed on the line and under all signature lines." (PM)
January 25, 2016 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages against defendant(s) Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1, filed by Cynthia Stewart.(Shaeffer, Joseph)
January 25, 2016 Filing 8 PRAECIPE by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart (Shaeffer, Joseph)
January 25, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Suzanne Kelly Michael on behalf of Defendant Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1. (Michael, Suzanne)
January 20, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of State Law CLAIMS Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) ; filed by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart. (Shaeffer, Joseph)
January 14, 2016 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Ann Spangler on 1/13/2016, filed by Plaintiff Cynthia Stewart. (Shaeffer, Joseph)
January 8, 2016 Filing 4 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. The nature of the case; 2. The status of matters which are presently set before the Court, e.g., hearings, motions, etc.; 3. The status of discovery and a time schedule for its completion; 4. A statement of any legal issues about which motions are contemplated and a possible briefing schedule; 5. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 6. Whether the case is jury or non-jury; 7. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 8. Settlement probabilities; and 9. Whether the parties consent to proceed to trial before an assigned magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, arrangements may be made to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at (206) 370-8805 at least TEN (10) days prior to the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk, as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is hereby set for 4/12/2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
January 7, 2016 Filing 2 Summons electronically issued as to defendant(s) Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1. (DJ)
January 7, 2016 U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (DJ)
January 6, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against defendant(s) Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1 (Receipt # 0981-4290142), filed by Cynthia Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Shaeffer, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snohomish County Public Utility District No. 1
Represented By: Cindy M. Lin
Represented By: Kathleen A Kline
Represented By: Suzanne Kelly Michael
Represented By: Philip A Talmadge
Represented By: Sidney Charlotte Tribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Stewart
Represented By: Samuel John Lunde Kramer
Represented By: Joseph R Shaeffer
Represented By: Katherine C. Chamberlain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?