Stohr v. Prime Texas Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Curtis Stohr
Defendant: Prime Texas Services, LLC, Alberto Saul Alaniz and Katy Pheelan
Case Number: 2:2016cv00064
Filed: January 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DIRECTING ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS ALANIZ AND PHEELAN a/k/a PHELAN granting Plaintiff's 31 Motion for order, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM) Modified on 11/23/2016: cc to Defendants Alaniz and Pheelan via the U.S. Mail (PM).
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (AD) cc: pro se defendants via US mail
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Robert S. Lasnik granting Plaintiff's 23 Motion for Summary Judgment. Clerk directed to enter judgment in favor of plaintiff and against defendants Alaniz and Phelan as stated in the Order. (AD) Modified on 8/18/2016 cc: Alaniz and Phelan via US mail(AD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stohr v. Prime Texas Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Texas Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberto Saul Alaniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katy Pheelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Stohr
Represented By: Andrew David Shafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?