Bank of New York Mellon v. Stafne et al
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon
Defendant: Scott Stafne, Todd Stafne and Real Time Resolutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00077
Filed: January 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MINUTE ORDER lifting the stay of this matter and returning this case to the active docket; denying in part and granting in part plaintiff's 120 Motion to Amend Judgment; directing the Clerk to enter an amended partial judgment in the form approved by the Court. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals in reference to No. 16-36032 via ad hoc)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MINUTE ORDER staying this case until further order. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Court of Appeals)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MINUTE ORDER pursuant to parties' 161 Stipulation ; Court shall postpone ruling re Plaintiff's 120 MOTION to Amend Judgment ; parties shall file any such proposed amended judgment - or if agreement cannot be reached, a Joint Status Report informing the Court of the status of the parties settlement discussions - within sixty (60) days of the date of this Minute Order. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 146 Motion to Substitute Mayumi Ohata Stafne as Administrator of the Estate of Todd Stafne ; On or before Friday, August 25, 2017, defendant Mayumi Ohata Stafne may file objections to plaintiffs proposed a mended judgment, docket no. 126 ; The Clerk is directed to update the docket to reflect that Mayumi Ohata Stafne, as Administrator of the Estate of Todd Stafne, is substituted for defendant Todd Stafne, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)(Mayumi Ohata added. Todd Stafne terminated. ) (cc: Bruce Galloway via email and USPS)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MINUTE ORDER re parties' responses to 140 Minute Order. Court will abstain from ruling on plaintiff's motion to amend the judgment until after substitution of the administrator of Todd Stafne's estate has been effected. Once Letters of Administration have been issued naming an administrator of Todd Stafne's estate, a motion for substitution, which may be made by any party, should be filed promptly. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MINUTE ORDER re Plaintiff's 126 Proposed Amended Judgment. The parties are DIRECTED to submit supplemental briefing addressing discrepancy on or before 6/13/2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER ON REVIEW OF REQUEST TO RECUSE affirming Judge Zilly's denial of defendant's 134 Motion for Recusal by Chief Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER re defendant Scott Stafne's 134 MOTION for Recusal; Court declines to voluntarily recuse; Clerk is directed to refer motion to Chief Judge Ricardo S. Martinez, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MINUTE ORDER per remand 124 Order of USCA, plaintiff is directed to file by 5/12/2017 a proposed amended judgment together with an affidavit in support thereof, that includes the judgment summary information identified by RCW 4.64.030 and is consistent with this Court's indicative ruling under Fed. R. Civ. P. 62.1. Defendants' Objections due 5/19/2017; Plaintiff's response, if any, due 5/26/2016. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting plaintiff's 63 Motion for Summary Judgment against Todd Stafne and Todd Stafne's counterclaims are dismissed with prejudice; clerk directed to enter partial judgment foreclosing the property encumbered by the deed of trust ; denying without prejudice plaintiff's 73 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's 81 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot plaintiff's 110 Motion for Relief from Deadline by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of New York Mellon v. Stafne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Zana Bugaighis
Represented By: Fred B Burnside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Stafne
Represented By: Scott E Stafne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Stafne
Represented By: Jocelynne Rose Fallgatter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Time Resolutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?