Bennett et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: George Bennett and Martha Bennett
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2016cv00091
Filed: January 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Whatcom
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER STRIKING Plaintiffs' 24 MOTION for Order to Set Date for Payment of Settlement. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER RE-NOTING Plaintiffs' 24 MOTION for Order to Set Date for Payment of Settlement ; Noting Date 9/8/2017, by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER dismissing case with prejudice per FRCP 41(a)(1)(A) and 22 Stipulation. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting Defendant's 15 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. To the extent Plaintiffs seek to recover damages associated with Bennett's gallstone pancreatitis, that claim is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 19 Motion for new trial date. Bench Trial is CONTINUED to 7/31/2017 at 09:30 AM before U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. Proposed Pretrial Order, Motions in Limine and Trial briefs to be submitted by 7/24/2017. Responses or objections due 7/26/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Bennett
Represented By: James A. Sturdevant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Bennett
Represented By: James A. Sturdevant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?