Kische USA LLC v Simsek et al
Plaintiff: Kische USA LLC
Defendant: Ali Simsek, Jane Doe Simsek, Diane Walker, JD Stellar LLC, Kevin Costanza, Jane Doe Costanza and John Doe Walker
Case Number: 2:2016cv00168
Filed: February 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED with prejudice an d without costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 60 days of the date of this order. Any trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 116 Motion for sanctions and evidentiary inference at trial regarding spoliation of evidence. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 101 Second Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER per Plaintiff's request for a discovery conference, the court directs the parties to file statements by 10/31/2017 at 5:00 p.m. In-court Hearing set for Thursday, 11/2/2017, at 09:00 AM before Judge James L. Robart. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting 105 Stipulated Motion for a continuance of deadline for expert witness disclosure pursuant to FRCP 26(A). Expert Witness Disclosure deadline continued to by 11/13/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER striking Plaintiff's 96 second motion for partial summary judgment and directing Kische to refile the motion in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 82 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge James L. Robart. The court having been notified of the settlement of the Cross Claimants JD Stellar, Ali Simsek, and Diane Walker's (collectively, "Cross Claimants") cross claim against Cross Defendants Kev in Constanza and Jane Doe Costanza in this matter and it appearing that no issue regarding the cross claim remains for the court's determination: IT IS ORDERED that the cross claim asserted by Cross Claimants is DISMISSED with prejudice and wit hout costs to any party. In the event settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the cross claim, provided such motion is filed within 15 days of the entry of this order. The pending motion for summary judgment filed by Cross Defendant Kevin Costanza (Dkt. # 85 ) is STRICKEN as moot. (AD)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATED AND AGRRED ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE re 76 Stipulated Motion. The trial date will be placed at the end of the Court's trial calendar, and the Court will issue a corresponding new scheduling order for the expert disclosure deadline and all remaining pretrial deadlines. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 66 Motion to amend its complaint; amended complaint due within 7 days of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE ORDER directing Kische to file a proposed second amended complaint by 2/7/17 at 12pm by Judge James L. Robart.(RS) Text Modified on 2/3/2017 (RS).
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS; granting Mr. Costanza's 54 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part Stellar defendants' 56 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; the court grants Kische leave to amend its complaint by 1/3/17 by Judge James L. Robart.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kische USA LLC v Simsek et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kische USA LLC
Represented By: Dubs Ari Tanner Herschlip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali Simsek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Simsek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JD Stellar LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Costanza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Costanza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?