Teras Chartering, LLC v. Hyupjin Shipping Co., Ltd
Plaintiff: Teras Chartering, LLC
Defendant: Hyupjin Shipping Co., Ltd
Case Number: 2:2016cv00188
Filed: February 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting Defendant's 104 Motion for Entry of Judgment signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting Defendant's 94 Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Defendant Hyupjin Shipping Co., Ltd. is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $254,316.00. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER DIRECTING VERDICT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. For the reasons set forth on the record, the Court has GRANTED Defendant's oral Motion for Directed Verdict, and hereby directs the Clerk to enter Judgment in favor of Defendant, dismissing all of Plaintiff's claims against it. (PM)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting in part, denying in part and reserving in part Defendant's 73 Motions In Limine; denying Plaintiff's 75 Motion In Limine. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 PRETRIAL ORDER by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER denying 63 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(SSM)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE ORDER RE-NOTING 63 MOTION for Reconsideration re 62 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment ; Noting Date 9/1/2017; plaintiff to file a response by 9/1/17 by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting in additional part and denying in part defendant's 22 Motion for Summary Judgment; JSR due within 7 business days signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Chief Judge Ricardo S. Martinez denying 24 Motion for Relief from Discovery Motion Deadline; denying 36 Motion for Security Costs; granting in part and deferring in part 22 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant's Supplementa l Brief due by 6/16/2017, Plaintiff's Supplemental Responsive Brief due by 6/30/2017. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment has been RE-NOTED for 6/30/2017. Motions terminated: 52 MOTIONS IN LIMINE filed by Hyupjin S hipping Co., Ltd, 54 MOTIONS IN LIMINE filed by Teras Chartering, LLC. The trial date and remaining pre-trial deadlines, including the deadline for motions in limine, have been STRICKEN, and will be reset, if necessary, after Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment has been further considered. (SSM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teras Chartering, LLC v. Hyupjin Shipping Co., Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teras Chartering, LLC
Represented By: Timothy R Lord
Represented By: Mark K. de Langis(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyupjin Shipping Co., Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?