Bazzell et al v. Body Contour Centers, LLC
Plaintiff: Jamie Bazzell and Carissa Alioto
Defendant: Body Contour Centers, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00202
Filed: February 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge James L. Robart. All claims by the Settling Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety with prejudice. (PM)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting Defendant Body Contour Centers, LLC's 60 Motion to Seal; directing Clerk to seal the Agreement and Exhibits A and B (Dtk. 61 ), by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 62 Stipulated Motion for Approval of FLSA Collective Action Settlement. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 58 stipulated motion to extend the page limits with respect to briefing the Stipulated Motion for Settlement Approval. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' 20 MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION, NOTICE, AND OTHER ISSUES by Judge James L. Robart. (AD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bazzell et al v. Body Contour Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Bazzell
Represented By: Erika L. Nusser
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carissa Alioto
Represented By: Paul J Lukas(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Erika L. Nusser
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Body Contour Centers, LLC
Represented By: Tracy M Miller
Represented By: Richard J. Omata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?