Mutschler v. United States of America
Petitioner: Richard Thayne Mutschler
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2016cv00281
Filed: February 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER on Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255). Petitioner's amended § 2255 motion, docket no. 18 , is DENIED. Petitioner's alternative request for a certificate of appealability, docket no. 18 , is also DENIED. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER granting petitioner's 26 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time; RENOTING petitioner's 18 Amended MOTION to Vacate : Noting Date 10/30/2017, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Declaring Petitioner's Attorney-Client Privilege Waived as to Issues Raised in his Amended Motion under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 re Respondent's 20 Second Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Court has reviewed defendants "Mandatory Judicial Notice," which was filed pro se. (See Case No. CR14-328, docket no. 78.) The Court will take no further action with respect to such "Mandatory Judicial Notice." (SWT)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER granting Petitioner's 17 Motion to Extend Deadline ; Petitioner's 18 § 2255 motion shall be noted for 9/1/2017 ; Any response shall be filed by 8/18/2017 ; Any reply shall be filed by the noting date. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER striking without prejudice Respondent's 9 Motion for Protective Order ; striking as moot Respondent's 14 Stipulated Motion to Continue ; granting Respondent's 15 Amended Motion to Continue ; striking 1 Noting date for Petitioner's motion under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 ; Petitioner shall file any amended § 2255 motion by 7/7/2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER granting Petitioner's 2 Motion to Appoint Counsel, CJA Administrator is DIRECTED to appoint counsel; RE-NOTING to 5/26/2017 9 Motion for Protective Order; RE-NOTING to 7/7/2017 1 Motion to Vacate. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: CJA Administrator and J. Gregory Lockwood via email, Petitioner via USPS)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER renoting respondent's 9 MOTION for Protective Order : Noting Date 3/31/2017. Directing clerk to send copies of documents/docket sheet to petitioner at updated address. Directing clerk to copy attorneys William Brobert and J Gregory Lockwood in case CR14-328TSZ. Extending respondent's answer to 2255 motion. Renoting petitioner's 2255 motion and motion for appointment of counsel to 5/12/17 by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (RS) cc petitioner with documents/docket sheet to updated address; emailed Minute Order to attys Broberg and Lockwood
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER lifting stay in this matter. Answer due within 45 days; Petitioner's 1 2255 Motion is noted for 3/24/2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM) cc: petitioner via the USPS
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mutschler v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Thayne Mutschler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Nicholas Arnold Manheim(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?