Hirsi v. The Hertz Corporation
Plaintiff: Hassan Hirsi
Defendant: The Hertz Corporation
Case Number: 2:2016cv00333
Filed: March 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 50 Motion for Attorney's Fees, Costs and Class Representatives Incentive Award. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER rescheduling Final Hearing to 12/4/2018 at 10:45 AM. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting parties' 47 Stipulated Motion for Certification of Settlement Class and Preliminarily Approving Class Action Settlement. Final Hearing set for 12/5/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15106. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER vacating 44 Order to Show Cause. The parties shall, pursuant to their representation (Dkt. # 45 at 2), move on a stipulated basis for preliminary approval of their settlement, certification of the settlement class, and appointment of class representative and class counsel on or before July 11, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE on or before 6/15/2018, why the Court should not sua sponte issue a case management schedule with a December 2018 trial date and/or impose monetary sanctions against both parties for failure to comply with the Court's orders. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting parties' 41 Stipulated Motion to Extend Temporary Stay for 30 days. Parties shall file a status report within 30 days of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting parties' 39 Stipulated Motion to Extend Temporary Stay for 30 days, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting parties' 37 Stipulated Motion; All litigation in this matter is temporarily stayed for 15 days from entry of this Order; Joint Status Report due within 15 days of the date of this Order, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting parties' 35 Stipulated Motion to Extend Temporary Stay for 30 days; Joint Status Report due within 30 days of entry of this Order, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why the case should not be dismissed for their failure to comply with the Order of June 27, 2017; Show Cause Response due by 12/7/2017, Joint Status Report due by 11/7/2017, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting parties' 29 Stipulated Motion to Extend Temporary Stay for 45 days ; all litigation in this action is temporarily stayed for 45 days from the entry of this order ; trial date and all other deadlines in this matter are hereby vacated, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 27 Stipulated Motion to extend temporary stay for 60 days by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hirsi v. The Hertz Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hassan Hirsi
Represented By: Cleveland Stockmeyer
Represented By: Duncan Calvert Turner
Represented By: Daniel R Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hertz Corporation
Represented By: Mark Stephen Filipini
Represented By: Daniel P Hurley
Represented By: Patrick M Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?