Rische v United States
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Alan Rische
Defendant: United States, United States Treasury Department and United States Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 2:2016cv00339
Filed: March 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting Government's 30 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying Plaintiff's 31 Motion for Summary Judgment, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 AMENDED ORDER Granting Joint 38 Motion For Continuance, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. The trial date and related pretrial filing deadlines are continued until resolution of the parties' motions for summary judgment. The Court will issue a revised scheduling order in the future if it's necessary.(SWT)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting Joint 38 Motion For Continuance, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. The trial date and related pretrial filing deadlines are continued until resolution of the parties' motions for summary judgment. The Court will issue a revised scheduling order in the future if it's necessary. (KERR)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING PLAINITIFF'S 33 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM DEADLINE, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Plaintiff's 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment , and defendant's 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment are RENOTED for 3/3/2017. (KERR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rische v United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Alan Rische
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Treasury Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?